This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 11:28:00 (UTC).

JORDEN HARRIS ET AL VS. ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 JORDEN HARRIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, SAMUEL K. FENG and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6134

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

SAMUEL K. FENG

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS, JORDEN

LEIHY, LAURIE

Defendants

ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHARDSON, RICHARD L

Attorney at SIEGAL & RICHARDSON LLP

436 14Th Street, Suite 1106

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

BOODROOKAS, NICK ANTHONY

Attorney at STEYER LOWENTHAL BOODROOKAS ALVAREZ & SMITH LLP

235 Pine Street, 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, JORDEN LEIHY, LAURIE AS TO DEFENDANT ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-13-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-13-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-21-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF HARRIS, JORDEN LEIHY, LAURIE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66147011) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66208201) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100119887) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, JORDEN LEIHY, LAURIE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-09-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-13-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE

DEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 66232377) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR JAN-13-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

Order Rescheduling Hearing

THE JAN-13-2021 OBJECTION HEARING IS RESCHEDULED TO JAN-20-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR FEB-28-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIP

TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF JILL K. COHOE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CON

DECLARATION OF JILL K. COHOE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

DECLARATION OF BARRY THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CO

DECLARATION OF BARRY THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Sep-03-2021 Continued To Jun-13-22 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-28-2022 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ON JUN-13-2022 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206 PER STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 9/3/21. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • FinancialPayment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : H2321902E008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF BARRY THORNTON IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JILL K. COHOE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTO CONTINUE TRIAL FOR GOOD CAUSE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66900814) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT?S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO TRIAL DATE (TRANSACTION ID # 66232377) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR JAN-13-2021 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-09-2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JAN-13-2021 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100119887) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, JORDEN LEIHY, LAURIE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 66208201) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2220C07F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66147011) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO A CORPORATION SOLE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF HARRIS, JORDEN LEIHY, LAURIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1120821F020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HARRIS, JORDEN LEIHY, LAURIE AS TO DEFENDANT ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-13-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-13-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-21-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESE OF SAN FRANCISCO, A CALIFORNIA RELIGIOUS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP OF SAN FRANCISCO, A RELIGIOUS CORPORATION SOLE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOODROOKAS NICK ANTHONY