This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/13/2019 at 11:02:30 (UTC).

JONATHAN WOODARD VS. CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 a Other case was filed by JONATHAN WOODARD against CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4335

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOODARD, JONATHAN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC.

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER SETTING ASIDE THE DEFAULT

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-03-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100046945)

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WOODARD, JONATHAN AS TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Request for Entry of Default

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 100035630) AS TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - UNCONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100046249) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WOODARD, JONATHAN

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033770), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WOODARD, JONATHAN SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-27-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041362) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

Stipulation of the Parties to Set Aside Entry of Default

FEE PAID ON STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037220) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-03-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PARTIES TO FILE ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5618515F005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018214F019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-03-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100046945)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT - UNCONDITIONAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100046249) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WOODARD, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-29-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-03-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING ASIDE THE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041362) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR PARTIES TO FILE ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FEE PAID ON STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT (TRANSACTION ID # 100037220) FILED BY DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 100035630) AS TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033770), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WOODARD, JONATHAN SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-27-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WOODARD, JONATHAN AS TO DEFENDANT CORPORATE SECURITY SERVICE, INC. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.