Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 22:28:29 (UTC).

JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND VS. CASA LOMA HOTEL ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CASA LOMA HOTEL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD E. KAHN, TERI L. JACKSON, RICHARD B. ULMER and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8598

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

HAROLD E. KAHN

TERI L. JACKSON

RICHARD B. ULMER

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Marysville, CA 95901

Defendants

BAY BRIDGE INN

SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE

COUNTRY HEARTH INN

SAN FRANCISCO INN

DOES 1 TO 100

CASA LOMA HOTEL

SOMA PARK INN

GREENWICH INN

ABVI SOMA

THE SENTIENT SF

ABVI GOLDEN GATE

HOTEL UTAH INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA THE UTAH INN

NINTH STREET LODGING LLC (DBA SAN FRANCISCO INN)

MISSION INN

PONTIAC HOTEL

ALEXANDER INN, LLC DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE

THE UTAH INN

CIVIC CENTER INN

GIAMPAOLO BOSCHETTI ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN SUED AS AIDA PLAZA HOTEL

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

ORLICK, MARTIN HARRY

Attorney at JEFFER, MANGELS, BUTLER & MITCHELL LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 5Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 941113813

LAROCCA, LEO MARIO

Attorney at NIVEN & SMITH LLP

505 Sansome Street, Suite 450

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

STILLMAN, PHILIP H.

Attorney at STILLMAN & ASSOCIATES

300 South Pointe Drive, Suite 4206

Miami Beach, FL 33139

HUSTER, THOMAS

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF THOMAS HUSTER

240 Stockton Street, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94108

HEATH, MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL HEATH

3251 Steiner Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AS TO DEFENDANT ABVI SOMA DEFAULT OF JUL-27-2017 SET ASIDE AS TO ABOVE-NAMED PARTIES ONLY

DEFENDANT GRANT HOTEL, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61223380) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANT HOTEL, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "GRANT HOTEL") HEARING SET FOR NOV-07-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO INN DEFAULT OF JUL-27-2017 SET ASIDE AS TO ABOVE-NAMED PARTIES ONLY

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT HILLARY INVESTMENTS, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS CASA LOMA HOTEL ALEXANDER INN, LLC DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE MANGAL, INC. DBA INN AT GOLDEN GATE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COUNTRY HEARTH INN HOTEL UTAH INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA THE UTAH INN NINTH STREET LODGING LLC (DBA SAN FRANCISCO INN) LINTEDGE, LLC, DBA ABVI SOMA SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61394594) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANT HOTEL, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "GRANT HOTEL")

DECLARATION OF THOMAS HUSTER REGARDING DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT GRANT HOT

DECLARATION OF THOMAS HUSTER REGARDING DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT GRANT HOTEL, INC. TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [CCP 430.41] (TRANSACTION ID # 61394594) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANT HOTEL, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "GRANT HOTEL")

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100026532) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILLARY INVESTMENTS, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS CASA LOMA HOTEL ALEXANDER INN, LLC DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE MANGAL, INC. DBA INN AT GOLDEN GATE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COUNTRY HEARTH INN HOTEL UTAH INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA THE UTAH INN NINTH STREET LODGING LLC (DBA SAN FRANCISCO INN) LINTEDGE, LLC, DBA ABVI SOMA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF GRANT HOTEL (TRANSACTION ID # 61303873) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANT HOTEL, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS "GRANT HOTEL")

Opposition to Motions of Defendant LINTEDGE, LLC, DBA ABVI SOMA

OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS OF DEFENDANT LINTEDGE, LLC, DBA ABVI SOMA (TRANSACTION ID # 100025029) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Portion of Plaintiff Jonath

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF PLAINTIFF JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANTS HILLARY INVESTMENTS, INC. DBA CASA LOMA HOTEL, AND ALEXANDER INN, LLC DBA SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE (TRANSACTION ID # 100024528) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILLARY INVESTMENTS, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS CASA LOMA HOTEL ALEXANDER INN, LLC DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE

Reply and Joinder to Defendant Wharf Inns Reply Brief in Support of De

REPLY AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT WHARF INNS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND BY DEFENDANTS HILLARY INVESTMENTS, INC. DBA CASA LOMA HOTEL, AND ALEXANDER INN, LLC DBA SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE (TRANSACTION ID # 100024528) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILLARY INVESTMENTS, INC. DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS CASA LOMA HOTEL ALEXANDER INN, LLC DOING BUSINESS AS AND SUED AS SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE

Reply and Joinder to Defendant Wharf Inns Reply Brief in Support of De

REPLY AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT WHARF INNS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND BY DEFENDANTS MANGAL, INC. DBA INN AT GOLDEN GATE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COUNTRY HEARTH INN AND HOTEL UTAH INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA THE UTAH INN (TRANSACTION ID # 100024520) FILED BY DEFENDANT MANGAL, INC. DBA INN AT GOLDEN GATE, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS COUNTRY HEARTH INN HOTEL UTAH INVESTMENTS, LLC DBA THE UTAH INN

Proof of Electronic Service

PROOF OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100024204) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Stipulation to Set Aside Entry of Default of Defendant Lintedge, LLC,

STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT (TRANSACTION ID # 100023742) FILED BY LINTEDGE, LLC, DBA ABVI SOMA

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer and Demurr

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF (TRANSACTION ID # 100022388) FILED BY DEFENDANT NINTH STREET LODGING LLC (DBA SAN FRANCISCO INN)

Proof of Service of Summons (on Civic Center Inn)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018188), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED JUN-15-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-16-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CIVIC CENTER INN

Proof of Service of Summons (on AIDA PLAZA HOTEL)

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018188), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED JUN-08-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-14-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT AIDA PLAZA HOTEL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JAN-08-2019 AT 10:30 AM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 68608(B). THE COURT FINDS NO GOOD CAUSE OR SUBSTANTIAL JUSTIFICATION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE PREVIOUS COURT ORDERS. A LESS SEVERE SANCTION WOULD NOT BE EFFECTIVE DUE TO THE HISTORY OF LACK OF COMPLIANCE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JAN-08-2019 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jan-10-2019 Dismissal MINI MINUTES: No appearance by plaintiff in pro per. Notice having been given and there being no appearance or objection filed, the Court ordered the case dismissed pursuant to Government Code Section 68608(b). The court finds no good cause or substantial justification for failure to comply with the previous court orders. Judge: TERI L. JACKSON; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Proceedings not reported.; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-02-2018 CONTINUED TO JAN-08-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. ***NOTICE: THE COURT INTENDS TO DISMISS THIS CASE PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68608(B) IF THERE IS NO APPEARANCE AT THE NEXT HEARING AND COMPLIANCE.*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: OCT-02-2018, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE OCT-18-2018. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR OCT-02-2018 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Oct-03-2018 Continued To Jan-08-19 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610 MINI MINUTES: No appearance. Self-represented plaintiff is sanctioned $400.00 for failure to appear. The Order To Show Cause is re-set to Jan-08-2019 at 10:30 am in Department 610. ** The court intends to dismiss the case pursuant to Government Code 68608(b) if there is no appearance or compliance at the next hearing.** Judge: TERI L. JACKSON; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Proceedings not reported.; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-03-2018 CONTINUED TO OCT-02-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST JONATHAN ASSELIN-NORMAND FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JUL-03-2018, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE JUL-20-2018. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUL-03-2018 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
220 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018188), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED JUN-08-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-12-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CITY CENTER INN AND SUITES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018188), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED JUN-11-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-15-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT CASA LOMA HOTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018188), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED JUN-08-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-14-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT AIDA PLAZA HOTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100018188), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED JUN-07-2017, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE JUN-15-2017 AS TO DEFENDANT ABVI SOMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketFEE PAID ON: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE (TRANSACTION ID # 100018187) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100016901) AS TO DEFENDANT GREAT HIGHWAY INN SOMA PARK INN 1906 MISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP ; Receipt Number : W0817503F015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ASSELIN-NORMAND, JONATHAN ON BEHALF OF HIMSEL AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS TO DEFENDANT CASA LOMA HOTEL GREAT HIGHWAY INN LOMBARD PLAZA MOTEL GRANT HOTEL MISSION INN BAY BRIDGE INN SOMA PARK INN ABVI SOMA COUNTRY HEARTH INN CITY CENTER INN AND SUITES CHELSEA MOTOR INN COVENTRY MOTOR INN SAN FRANCISCO INN THE UTAH INN GREENWICH INN ABVI GOLDEN GATE THE SENTIENT SF WHARF INN SUPER 8 UNION SQUARE REGENCY INN PONTIAC HOTEL CIVIC CENTER INN AIDA PLAZA HOTEL 1906 MISSION DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-04-2017 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-03-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-11-2017 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEATH, MICHAEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STILLMAN PHILIP H.