This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 11:43:31 (UTC).

JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2014 JOHN WONG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NICK LANHAM. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9292

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WONG, JOHN

Defendants

BARCINILLA, JESSICA

BERRY, JASON

DOES 1 TO 35, INCLUSIVE

KOMM, JENNIFER

KOSTER, ED

LANHAM, NICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BORNSTEIN, JONATHAN H

Attorney at BORNSTEIN & BORNSTEIN

507 Polk St Ste 410

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorneys

BRUN, DAVID SHANE

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

JENNINGS, NOAH

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

THOMPSON, PATRICK S

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster,and Jennifer Komms Opposition to Pla

OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS NICK LANHAM, ED KOSTER,AND JENNIFER KOMMS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JOHN WONGS MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FOM INTERROGATORIES (TRANSACTION ID # 15252071) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

DEFENDANT NICK LANHAMS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15180083) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK

Notice of Errata with Attachment A of Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koste

NOTICE OF ERRATA WITH ATTACHMENT A OF DEFENDANTS NICK LANHAM, ED KOSTER AND JENNIFER KOMM (TRANSACTION ID # 15096124) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK BERRY, JASON KOSTER, ED BARCINILLA, JESSICA KOMM, JENNIFER DOES 1 TO 35, INCLUSIVE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-23-2015 CONTINUED TO MAR-02-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST JONATHAN H BORNSTEIN FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: APR-12-2016, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE APR-28-2016. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Supplemental Proof of Service

SUPPLEMENTAL PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15253036) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

Notice of Appearance of Attorney on Behalf of Nick Lanham, Ed Koster a

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY ON BEHALF OF NICK LANHAM, ED KOSTER AND JENNIFER KOMM (TRANSACTION ID # 15088142) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster and Jennifer Komms Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55645579) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER HEARING SET FOR SEP-10-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-12-2016 CONTINUED TO JUL-12-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JASON BERRY, AND JESSICA BARCINILLA AS TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST JONATHAN H BORNSTEIN FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: APR-12-2016, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE APR-28-2016. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-12-2016 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16061080) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-12-2016 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) JASON BERRY, AND JESSICA BARCINILLA AS TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE MAR-02-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16035077) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16026054) AS TO DEFENDANT KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ED KOSTER AND JENNIFER KOMM'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16021055) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ED KOSTER AND JENNIFER KOMM'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DEPT. 501: COURT ADOPTS TENTATIVE RULING. DEFENDANT NICK LANHAM, ED KOSTER, JENNIFER KOMM'S DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. PLAINTIFF FAILS TO ALLEGE FACTS TO SUPPORT THE CAUSES OF ACTION AGAINST THE MOVING DEFENDANTS. THE COURT NOTES THAT OPPOSITION WAS FILED 3 COURTS DAYS LATE, I.E. 1 COURT DAY BEFORE THE REPLY WAS DUE). THE COURT ALSO NOTES THAT OPPOSITION TO THE DEMURRER TOT EH SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WAS ALSO LATE. PREVAILING PARTY TO PREPARE ORDER IN COMPLIANCE WITH CRC 3.1312. JUDGE: RONALD EVANS QUIDACHAY; CLERK J. RIOS MERIDA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WONG, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK BERRY, JASON KOSTER, ED BARCINILLA, JESSICA KOMM, JENNIFER DOES 1 TO 35, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • REPLY MEMO OF P&A IN SUPP OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55645579) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55645579) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 55645579) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 55645579) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55645579) FILED BY DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK KOSTER, ED KOMM, JENNIFER HEARING SET FOR SEP-10-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT LANHAM, NICK BERRY, JASON KOSTER, ED BARCINILLA, JESSICA KOMM, JENNIFER DOES 1 TO 35, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-15-2014 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-14-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-22-2014 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:APR-07-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, April 7, 2015, line 3.DEFENDANTs NICK LANHAM, ED KOSTER and JENNIFER KOMM's DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINTCONTINUED to Wednesday, April 22. Moving party failed to provide a courtesy copy of the First Amended Complaint, in violation of Local Rule 2.6B. The Demurrer will be taken off calendar if a courtesy copy of the operative complaint is not received by April 10, 2015. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:AUG-04-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, August 04, 2015 line 2.DEFENDANTS ED KOSTER and JENNIFER KOMM's DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT continued to September 4, 2015. Moving party is ordered to comply with SFLR 2.6B and provide courtesy copy of the operative complaint to department 501 no later than August 14, 2015 with a cover letter reflecting new hearing date. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:SEP-04-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law & Motion Calendar for Friday, September 4, 2015, line 4.DEFENDANTs ED KOSTER and JENNIFER KOMM's DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINTSUSTAINED with final leave to amend for Plaintiff to allege facts giving rise to conspiracy/agency liability (allegations in paragraph 4 are not sufficient; reference of San Jose/Santa Clara is unclear) or allege facts to support each cause of action as to each defendant without reliance on agency/conspiracy. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:SEP-23-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice And Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, September 23, 2015 line 1.PLAINTIFF JOHN WONG's Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctionstransferred to department 301 to be heard at 9:00 a.m. on October 9, 2015. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:OCT-09-2015 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff John Wong'S Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Friday, October 9, 2015, Line 2. Plaintiff John Wong's Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge David McDonald, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Motion granted as to Defendant Nick Lanham. Responses to be served no later than October 19, 2015. Sanctions of $400 awarded to Plaintiff.As to Defendants Ed Koster and Jennifer Komm, the motion is granted but given that the Court has repeatedly sustained Defendants' demurrers, and there currently is no operative complaint as to these Defendants, the responses shall not be due until 15 days after any demurrer is overruled or the filing of a complaint that Defendants Koster and Komm are obligated to or choose to answer. Sanctions denied. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to davidmcdonald@prodigy.net, a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:OCT-26-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff John Wong'S Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Monday, October 26, 2015, line 4.Plaintiff John Wong'S Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctionscontinued to November 2, 2015 per stipulation and order. = (501/RBU)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:NOV-02-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff John Wong'S Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Monday November 2, 2015, line 5.Plaintiff John Wong'S Motion For Order Compelling Defendants Nick Lanham, Ed Koster, And Jennifer Komm To Respond To Form Interrogatories, And Imposing Monetary SanctionsGRANTED. Absent a stay (as in Terminals Equip., 221 CA3d 234, cited by defendants), pendency of a demurrer is not grounds for failing to respond to discovery. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories is therefore GRANTED as to defendants Lanham, Koster and Komm. Per CCP 2030.290, all objections are waived. No sanctions.= (501/RBU)


Case Number:*******9292
Case Title:JOHN WONG VS. NICK LANHAM et al
Court Date:JAN-11-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Motion Calendar for Monday, January 11, 2016, Line 4.DEFENDANT NICK LANHAM, ED KOSTER, JENNIFER KOMM DEMURRER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINTis SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiff fails to allege facts to support the causes of action against the moving defendants. The Court notes that opposition was filed 3 courts days late, i.e. 1 court day before the reply was due). The Court also notes that opposition to the demurrer tot eh Second Amended Complaint was also late. =(501/REQ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Patrick Shaun

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENNINGS, NOAH