This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/27/2023 at 02:01:21 (UTC).

JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA VS. NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC., A CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other lawsuit against NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0506

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION

NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC., A CORPORATION

NEXSTAR MEDIA GROUP, INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC.

NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOUW, NICHOLAS JAMES

Defendant Attorney

KOZLOW, ANDREW J.

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-26-2023 CONTINUED TO OCT-25-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CLASS CERTIFICATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100196571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100183719) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-30-2022 CONTINUED TO APR-26-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100175775) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL SERVED AUG-22-2022, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE SEP-12-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100175775) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL SERVED AUG-22-2022, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE SEP-12-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC., A CORPORATION

Representative Action Complaint

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67786400) REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT FORVCIVIL PENALTIES PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL AS TO DEFENDANT NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC., A CORPORATION NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-30-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-30-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-07-2022

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-25-2023 CONTINUED TO JAN-24-2024 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CONSOLIDATION AND FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100215561) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100215561) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100212912) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100196571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68391477) FILED BY DEFENDANT NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC. NEXSTAR MEDIA GROUP, INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 8.0 DAYS

Plaintiffs Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100182199) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Defendants Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68244851) FILED BY DEFENDANT NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC. NEXSTAR MEDIA GROUP, INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC.

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67786400) TO PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67786400) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/24/2024

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Oct-12-2023 Continued To Jan-24-24 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-25-2023 CONTINUED TO JAN-24-2024 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CONSOLIDATION AND FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

FinancialPayment: REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount: $20; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C5023A11S012

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100215561) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100215561) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100212912) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFEE FOR JOINT STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE PLAINTIFF FIRST AMENDED CLASS AND REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100212912) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL; Fee: $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Apr-13-2023 Continued To Oct-25-23 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-26-2023 CONTINUED TO OCT-25-2023 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF CLASS CERTIFICATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100182199) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $870; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2122B02F001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68244851) FILED BY DEFENDANT NEXSTAR MEDIA INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC. NEXSTAR MEDIA GROUP, INC. F/K/A NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC.; Fee: $870.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100175775) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL SERVED AUG-22-2022, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE SEP-12-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100175775) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL SERVED AUG-22-2022, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE SEP-12-2022 AS TO DEFENDANT NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC., A CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67786400) TO PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122705F004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67786400) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67786400) REPRESENTATIVE ACTION COMPLAINT FORVCIVIL PENALTIES PURSUANT TO LABOR CODE FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN WHEELER, ON BEHALF OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA , AS A PRIVATE ATTORNEY GENERAL AS TO DEFENDANT NEXSTAR BROADCASTING, INC., A CORPORATION NEXSTAR BROADCASTING GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOV-30-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-30-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-07-2022; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less