This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 13:27:32 (UTC).

JOHN VARDAKASTANIS VS. ALFRED MENG et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2010 JOHN VARDAKASTANIS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against ALFRED MENG. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6648

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARDAKASTANIS, JOHN

Defendants

ZHAO, MICHAEL

MENG, HELEN ,AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST

DOES 1-20

MENG, ALFRED ,AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST

ABE, DAVID M.

Oakland, CA 94607

MARTIN, PATRICK PAUL DBA PORTFOLIO REALTY & FUNDING GROUP (SUED AS PORTFOLIO REALTY)

PORTFOLIO REALTY

MAXIMA MORTGAGE

ABE, DAVID ,AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID AB E TRUST

MAXIMA REALTY INVESTMENT GROUP

REALTY WORLD MAXIMA GROUP DBA MAXIMA MORTGAGE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS MAXIMA MORTGAGE, MAXIMA REALTY INVESTMENT GROUP)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCLOSKEY, MICHAEL

819 Eddy St

San Francisco, CA 94109

HALLINAN, BRENDAN VINCENT-JOHN

819 Eddy Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant Attorney

CARLSON, MARK C.

Attorney at CARLSON LAW GROUP INC.

21031 Ventura Blvd Ste 1100

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ABE, DAVID M. (Fee:370.00)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-20-2010 CONTINUED TO OCT-08-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE AND SERVE ORDERS RE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-08-2010 CONTINUED TO NOV-24-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE AND SERVE ORDERS RE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE. NOTE: DEFENDANT TO ADDRESS PROPOSED ORDERS TO DEPT. 302 AND JUDGE WOOLARD. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF, PURSUANT TO CCP 581(F)(2) AND CRC 3.1320(H) OF DEFENDANTS.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-10-2011 CONTINUED TO MAR-07-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) ALFRED MENG AND HELEN MENG AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-07-2011 CONTINUED TO MAY-09-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) ALFRED MENG AND HELEN MENG AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST. THE MAR-07-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-09-2011 CONTINUED TO AUG-08-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) ALFRED MENG AND HELEN MENG, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST. THE MAY-09-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST BRENDAN V. HALLINAN, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: AUG-08-2011, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE AUG-23-2011. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-08-2011 CONTINUED TO OCT-11-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S), OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) ALFRED MENG, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST, AND HELEN MENG, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED MOTION TO RELIEVE PLAINITFF FROM DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT MENG, ALFRED ,AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST MENG, HELEN ,AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST ABE, DAVID ,AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID AB E TRUST REALTY WORLD MAXIMA GROUP DBA MAXIMA MORTGAGE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS MAXIMA MORTGAGE, MAXIMA REALTY INVESTMENT GROUP) MARTIN, PATRICK PAUL DBA PORTFOLIO REALTY & FUNDING GROUP (SUED AS PORTFOLIO REALTY)

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-30-2012 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) ALFRED MENG, AND HELEN MENG, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Defendants Alfred Meng, Helen Meng, David Abe, as Tru

CASE DISMISSED AS TO DEFENDANTS ALFRED MENG, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST, AND HELEN MENG, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST, AND DAVID ABE, AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST, AND DOES 1-20 BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAY-14-2012 AT 2:00PM. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-24-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. THE JUN-15-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00 AGAINST BRENDAN VINCENT-JOHN HALLINAN, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JUL-24-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE AUG-08-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $700.00 AGAINST MICHAEL MCCLOSKEY PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE OCT-01-2012. THE SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY LEVIED AGAINST BRENDAN VINCENT-JOHN HALLINAN, ESQ. ON AUG-08-2011 AND JAN-30-2012 FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARINGS ARE VACATED AND RE-ISSUED TO MICHAEL MCCLOSKEY, ESQ. AT THE REQUEST OF MR. MCCLOSKEY. THE $500.00 SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON JUL-25-2012 FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JUL-24-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ARE VACATED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-11-2012 CONTINUED TO NOV-13-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WAS ORDERED TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS BY CLOSE OF BUSINESS OCT-01-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Balance of Case

ORDER DISMISSING BALANCE OF CASE BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-13-2012 AT 2:00 PM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DISMISSING BALANCE OF CASE BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-13-2012 AT 2:00 PM. THIS DISMISSAL IS PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-13-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • SANCTION PAYMENT DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF VARDAKASTANIS, JOHN (Fee:700.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-11-2012 CONTINUED TO NOV-13-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL WAS ORDERED TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS BY CLOSE OF BUSINESS OCT-01-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $700.00 AGAINST MICHAEL MCCLOSKEY PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE OCT-01-2012. THE SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY LEVIED AGAINST BRENDAN VINCENT-JOHN HALLINAN, ESQ. ON AUG-08-2011 AND JAN-30-2012 FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARINGS ARE VACATED AND RE-ISSUED TO MICHAEL MCCLOSKEY, ESQ. AT THE REQUEST OF MR. MCCLOSKEY. THE $500.00 SANCTIONS IMPOSED ON JUL-25-2012 FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE JUL-24-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ARE VACATED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-11-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-24-2012 CONTINUED TO SEP-11-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. ***NOTICE OF IMPENDING REFERRAL TO THE STATE BAR AS REQUIRED BY BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6086.7 (A) (3).*** NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00 AGAINST BRENDAN VINCENT-JOHN HALLINAN, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JUL-24-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE AUG-08-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-24-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-24-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. THE JUN-15-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2010
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ABE, DAVID M. HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE (JOINDER) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABE, DAVID M. HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT MENG, ALFRED ZHAO, MICHAEL REALTY WORLD MAXIMA GROUP DBA MAXIMA MORTGAGE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS MAXIMA MORTGAGE, MAXIMA REALTY INVESTMENT GROUP) HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT MENG, ALFRED ZHAO, MICHAEL REALTY WORLD MAXIMA GROUP DBA MAXIMA MORTGAGE (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HERIN AS MAXIMA MORTGAGE, MAXIMA REALTY INVESTMENT GROUP) HEARING SET FOR MAY-04-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ABE, DAVID M. (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF VARDAKASTANIS, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT ABE, DAVID ,AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID AB E TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARDAKASTANIS, JOHN SERVED FEB-05-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ABE, DAVID M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARDAKASTANIS, JOHN ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARDAKASTANIS, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT MENG, ALFRED ZHAO, MICHAEL ABE, DAVID M. MAXIMA MORTGAGE MAXIMA REALTY INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO REALTY MENG, ALFRED ,AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST MENG, HELEN ,AS TRUSTEES OF THE MENG FAMILY TRUST ABE, DAVID ,AS TRUSTEE OF THE DAVID AB E TRUST DOES 1-20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-09-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-24-2010 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less