This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/07/2022 at 06:20:54 (UTC).

JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2012 JOHN PERNIZ filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, SUZANNE R. BOLANOS, ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO, JAMES J. MCBRIDE and LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5988

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

MIDSTATE MECHANICAL, INC.

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

A C P, INC.

ROCHE PALO ALTO LLC

BUTTNER CORP.

HOBUND, INC.

SUGDEN ENGINEERING CO.

BAY CITIES MECHANICAL COMPANY

DURO DYNE CORPORATION

WESTERN ALLIED CORPORATION

GIAMPOLINI & CO.

CARL W. OLSON & SONS CO.

GEO M. ROBINSON & CO

RAINBOW WATERPROOFING & RESTORATION CO.

AYOOB & PEERY PLUMBING CO., INC.

ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.

CAL-AIR INC.

TUCKNOTT ELECTRIC

UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS INC., INDIVIDUALLY SUED AS DOE 1067 AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO E.H. MORRILL COMPANY, SUED AS DOE 1028

183 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue, P.O. Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610

BISHOP, CHARLES STEWART

Attorney at CONNOR & BISHOP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 1750

San Francisco, CA 94104

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 945963759

Other Attorneys

SKEBE, HOWARD P

Attorney at COOLEY MANION JONES KUROWSKI LLP

201 Spear Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at HUGO PARKER, LLP

240 Stockton Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery St., Ste 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 949486169

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 941051126

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BROSE, CHRISTOPHER ALLEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER A. BROSE

840 Hinckley Rd., Ste. 220

Burlingame, CA 94010

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SNR DENTON US LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 941052708

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 945963759

BURESH, JOHN SCOTT

Attorney at BURESH, KAPLAN, JANG, FELLER, AUSTIN

2298 Durant Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94704

GILLESPIE, JEFFREY S.

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

JUBELIRER, ELIOT STEVEN

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

BOVARNICK, STEVEN HOWARD

Attorney at LELAND, PARACHINI, STEINBERG, MATZGER & MELNICK, LLP

199 Fremont St 21St Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

54 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DEVCON CONSTRUCTION INCORPORATED?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEVCON?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEVCONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52828264) FILED BY DEFENDANT DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Monterey Mechanical Companys Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANYS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS (TRANSACTION ID # 52830214) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANY

DEFENDANT GEORGE H. WILSON, INC.?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52830185) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGE H. WILSON, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52832286) FILED BY DEFENDANT FISCHBACH AND MOORE, INCORPORATED N/K/A EX-FM, INC., SUED ERRONEOUSLY HEREIN AS EX-FM, INC. (FKA FISCHBACH AND MOORE ELECTRIC, INC.)

DEFENDANT ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 52832753) FILED BY DEFENDANT ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD.

DEFENDANT N.V. HEATHORN, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52830001) FILED BY DEFENDANT N.V. HEATHORN, INC.

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HEWLETT PACKARD CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HEWLETT PACKARD CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 52711269) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN PERNIZ, MARY BETH

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 52711269) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN PERNIZ, MARY BETH

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 52711269) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN PERNIZ, MARY BETH

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 67269663) AS TO DEFENDANT BUTTNER CORP.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 67269663) AS TO DEFENDANT BUTTNER CORP.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 67246228)

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 67246228)

PROOF OF SERVICE DFOR REPLY IN SUPPORT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION W

PROOF OF SERVICE DFOR REPLY IN SUPPORT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT CANTLEY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED

OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT CANTLEY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INS

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS INSURERS OF G.J

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. TIMELY FILED AND SERVED

DECLARATION OF SHAWNA MAHONEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANC

DECLARATION OF SHAWNA MAHONEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. TIMELY FILED AND SERVED (TRANSACTION ID # 67170034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN PERNIZ, MARY BETH

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INS

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. TIMELY FILED AND SERVED (TRANSACTION ID # 67170034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN PERNIZ, MARY BETH

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS I

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. TIMELY FILED AND SERVED (TRANSACTION ID # 67170034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN PERNIZ, MARY BETH

2,731 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 67269663) AS TO DEFENDANT BUTTNER CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 67246228)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION, 503, INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS OFF CALENDAR FOR FAILURE TO LODGE COURTESY COPIES OF THE MOVING PAPERS WITH THE COURT. (LOCAL RULE 2.7B.) JUDGE: CYNTHIA MING-MEI LEE, CLERK: A. MOK. NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR DEC-23-2021 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Off Calendar Dec-23-2021 Off Calendar MINI MINUTES: APPEARANCES Via CourtCall: Kimberly J. Chu of BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP (415-898-1555), appearing for plaintiffs and opposing parties John Perniz and Mary Beth Perniz. RULING: Not contested and tentative ruling adopted: Intervenors Employers insurance of Wausau and Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment is off calendar for failure to lodge courtesy copies of the moving papers with the Court. (Local Rule 2.7B.) Judge: Cynthia Ming-mei Lee, Clerk: A. Mok. Not reported. (503\/CML); Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE DFOR REPLY IN SUPPORT TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ROBERT CANTLEY IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67173716) FILED BY INTERVENOR WAUSAU INSURANCE COMPANY EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC., A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC DEEMING PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY INTERVENORS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE OF WAUSAU AND WAUSAU UNDERWRITERS INSURANCE COMPANY, AS INSURERS OF G.J. YAMAS COMPANY, INC. TIMELY FILED AND SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
3,531 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43593265) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION; Fee: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43586097) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY; Fee: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $410; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B4912404F003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43481131) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION; Fee: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $410; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B4912328F019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43358629) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION; Fee: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $410; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1012202F018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PERNIZ, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC. AIR SYSTEMS MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR ALADDIN HEATING CORPORATION ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD. BAYER CROPSCIENCE INC. CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CERTAINTEED CORPORATION CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. COAST DRYWALL, INC. COLLINS INSULATION, INC. COLUMBIA MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC. CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC. CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL, INC. CSK AUTO, INC. D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC. D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1-8500 DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. DPR CONSTRUCTION EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION F.W. SPENCER & SON, INC. FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC. FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) FRANK M. BOOTH, INC. FREDERICK MEISWINKEL, INC. GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY GEORGE H. WILSON, INC. GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC. H.T.R. ENTERPRISES, INC. HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO. HOBUND, INC. J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. JAMES A. NELSON CO., INC. K & B DRYWALL KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. MACARTHUR COMPANY MARCAL ASSOCIATES, LTD. MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. MCCARTHY CONSTRUCTION METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY MISSION RANCH DEVELOPMENT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANY O.C. MCDONALD CO., INC. PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PIONEER INSULATION CONTRACTORS, INC. RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION RAY L. HELLWIG MECHANICAL CO. INC. RAY L. HELLWIG PLUMBING & HEATING, INC. ROEBER'S INCORPORATED RUDOLPH AND SLETTEN, INC. S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA SHELL OIL COMPANY SUGDEN ENGINEERING CO. SWINERTON BUILDERS TEXACO, INC. THERMA CORPORATION THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TRAMMEL INSULATION UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC. WESTERN ALLIED CORPORATION WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2013; Fee: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:DEC-23-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, December 23, 2021 in Department 503, Line 1. Intervenors Employers insurance of Wausau and Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment is off calendar for failure to lodge courtesy copies of the moving papers with the Court. (Local Rule 2.7B.) = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:FEB-11-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-14-276242 WITH CASE CGC-12-275988
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, February 11 2021 in Department 503, Line 1. Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Actions of Case(s) CGC-14-276242 with Case CGC-12-275988 for All Purposes Including Trial; To Substitute Successor For Deceased Plaintiff; And to Maintain the Trial Date Assigned to Matter Number CGC-14-276242 is granted. No opposition filed. The two cases are consolidated for all purposes including trial. Case CGC-12-275988 shall be the lead case. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (b).) Subsequent documents must be filed only in the lead case and all documents filed in the consolidated case must include the caption and case number of the lead case, followed by the case number of the other consolidated case. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (c), (d).) The lead case will adopt the July 26, 2021 trial date assigned in CGC-14-276242. Plaintiff's request to substitute Mary Beth Perniz as Successor-In-Interest for deceased Plaintiff John Perniz is granted pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 377.31. No opposition filed. Petitioner complied with the requirements of Code of Civil Procedure section 337.32.If a hearing is requested, it will be on February 11, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. In light of the current public health situation, all attorneys may only appear telephonically. Telephone appearances must be arranged through Court Call by calling 1-888-88-COURT. No prior notice or permission is required. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:JUL-23-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Specially Appearing American States Insurance Company (A Safeco Company)'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To 1) Set Aside Default And 2) Seek Leave To File An Answer-In-Intervention
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, July 23, 2020 in Department 503, Line 6. Specially Appearing American States Insurance Company's Amended Motion to 1) Set Aside Default and 2) Grant Leave to File An Answer in Intervention is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. No opposition filed. Specially Appearing Defendant American States Insurance Company is granted leave to file an answer-in-intervention. The motion is denied as to the setting aside of the default. If a hearing is requested, it will be on July 23, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. In light of the current public health situation, all attorneys may only appear telephonically. Telephone appearances must be arranged through Court Call by calling 1-888-88-COURT. No prior notice or permission is required. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must submit the proposed order to the Court after the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must submit it before or after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:JUL-21-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Specially Appearing American States Insurance Company (A Safeco Company)'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To 1) Set Aside Default And 2) Seek Leave To File An Answer-In-Intervention
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, July 21, 2020 in Department 503, Line 4. Specially Appearing American States Insurance Company's Motion to 1) Set Aside Default and 2) Grant Leave to File an Answer in Intervention is continued on the Court's own motion to July 23, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 503. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:JUN-23-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To 1)Set Aside Default And 2)Seek Leave To File An Answer-In-Intervention
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, June 23, 2020 in Department 503, Line 9. Specially Appearing American States Insurance Company's Motion to 1) Set Aside Default Judgment and 2) Grant Leave to File an Answer-In-Intervention is off calendar for failure to lodge courtesy copies with the Court. (Local Rule 2.7B.) = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:MAY-21-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Stay Deposition Of Third Party Witness Tracey Melrose And To Quash Deposition Subpoena
Rulings: On Asbestos Discovery Calendar for Tuesday, May 21, 2013 in Department 503 at 9:00 a.m., Line 1. Defendant FDCC California Inc.u00BFs motion to stay deposition of third party witness Tracey Melrose and to quash deposition subpoena is continued on the courtu00BFs own motion to June 3, 2013 at 9:00a.m. in Department 220, Hon. James J. McBride presiding. = (220/JJM)



Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:FEB-06-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Fdcc California, Inc. To Produce Custodian(S) Of Records And Person(S) Most Knowledgeable For Deposition And Responsive Documents
Rulings: On Asbestos Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, February 6, 2013 in Department 503 at 9:00 a.m., Line 2. Plaintiffsu00BF motion to compel defendant FDCC California, Inc. to produce custodian(s) of records and person(s) most knowledgeable for deposition and responsive documents is denied. Defendant, a dissolved corporation, is under no obligation to produce a deponent. (Maldonado v. Superior Court (2002) 94 Cal.App.4th 1390.) If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:00a.m. in Department 611, Hon. Lynn Ou00BFMalley-Taylor presiding. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (611/LOT)



Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:JAN-16-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave Of Court To File Complaint In Intervention To Name Hartford Accident And Indemnity Company; American Guarantee And Liability Insurance Company; Century Indemnity Company As Successor To Cci Insurance Company As Successor To Insurance Company Of North America; National Fire Insurance Company Of Hartford Successor By Merger To Transcontinental Insurance Company;
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 16, 2013 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 2, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Co., et al., on behalf of their suspended insured Alta Mechanicalu00BFs motion for leave to file complaint in intervention will be heard at 9:30am in Department 220, Hon. James J. McBride presiding. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:DEC-11-2012 11:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Intervenors' Motion For An Order Granting Relief From The Court'S Assessment Of A "First Paper" Filing Fee To Each Intervenor; Or, In The Alternative, That The Assessed "First Paper" Filing Fees Be Reduced To A Total Of $410.00 For All Intervenors; Or, In The Alternative, That The Assessed "First Paper" Filing Fees Be Equitably Reduced (Added To Calendar Per Ruling At The 10/24/12 Hearing In Case #828684)
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, December 11, 2012 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 28. Intervenorsu00BF motion for relief from the courtu00BFs assessment of a first paper filing fee, or in the alternative, that the assessed first paper filing fees be reduced is continued on the courtu00BFs own motion to January 25, 2013 at 1:30pm in Department 604, Hon. Marla J. Miller presiding. = (503/TLJ)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:DEC-05-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Hearing On Intervenors' Objections To Plaintiffs' 170.6 Challenge (Per Order Of 11/27/12)
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, December 5, 2012 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 2. Hearing on the timeliness of plaintiffsu00BF C.C.P. 170.6 challenge to Judge Jackson: the court will accept plaintiffsu00BF section 170.6 challenge. Plaintiffsu00BF challenge was timely and was not made after Judge Jackson had presided over any hearings involving a determination of contested fact issues relating to the merits. Intervenorsu00BF objection based on timeliness, and all joinders thereto, are overruled. A hearing is required and will be at 9:45am. If the court adopts its tentative ruling the parties will receive further instruction at the hearing on where to proceed. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:NOV-29-2012 13:30 PM
Calendar Matter:Intervenors' Motion For An Order Granting Relief From The Court'S Assessment Of A "First Paper" Filing Fee To Each Intervenor; Or, In The Alternative, That The Assessed "First Paper" Filing Fees Be Reduced To A Total Of $410.00 For All Intervenors; Or, In The Alternative, That The Assessed "First Paper" Filing Fees Be Equitably Reduced (Added To Calendar Per Ruling At The 10/24/12 Hearing In Case #828684)
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 29, 2012 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 25, Intervenorsu00BF motion for relief from the courtu00BFs assessment of a first paper filing fee, or in the alternative, that the assessed first paper filing fees be reduced: hearing required. The hearing will be at 1:30pm. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. = (503/TLJ)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:NOV-13-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR TUESDAY, NOVEMBER 13, 2012 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 4, Defendant Temporary Plant Cleaners, Inc.u00BFs general demurrer to plaintiffsu00BF second amended complaint is sustained with five days leave to amend to give plaintiffs an opportunity, if they are able to do so, to allege facts sufficient to meet the requirements of Bockrath v. Aldrich Chemical (1999) 21 Cal.4th 71. Plaintiffs did not substantively oppose defendantu00BFs demurrer. Although not cited by defendant, Bockrath controls. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45am. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:NOV-08-2012 13:30 PM
Calendar Matter:Intervenors' Motion For An Order Granting Relief From The Court'S Assessment Of A "First Paper" Filing Fee To Each Intervenor; Or, In The Alternative, That The Assessed "First Paper" Filing Fees Be Reduced To A Total Of $410.00 For All Intervenors; Or, In The Alternative, That The Assessed "First Paper" Filing Fees Be Equitably Reduced (Added To Calendar Per Ruling At The 10/24/12 Hearing In Case #828684)
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, November 8, 2012 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 28. Intervenorsu00BF motion for relief from the courtu00BFs assessment of a first paper filing fee, or in the alternative, that the assessed first paper filing fees be reduced: hearing required. The hearing will be at 1:30pm. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. = (503/TLJ)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:SEP-06-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 6, 2012 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 7, Plaintiffu00BFs motion for order granting leave to file second amended complaint is granted. No opposition filed. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 10:15am, not 9:30am. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:AUG-14-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION And Notice Of Motion To Stay
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, August 14, 2012 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 27. Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Co., Inc.u00BFs motion to stay is off calendar pursuant to the conditional non-opposition and proposed order that the court will sign. = (503/TLJ)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:AUG-09-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION And Notice Of Motion To Stay
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR THURSDAY, AUGUST 9, 2012 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 90. Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Co., Inc.u00BFs motion to stay is continued on the courtu00BFs own motion to August 14. The motion will be granted pursuant to representations by counsel. On August 14 the motion will be taken off calendar if all orders have been signed and filed. = (503/TLJ)


Case Number:*******5988
Case Title:JOHN PERNIZ VS. SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Court Date:MAY-30-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs Complaint
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION CALENDAR FOR WEDNESDAY, MAY 30, 2012 IN DEPARTMENT 503 AT 9:30 A.M., LINE 5, Defendant FDCC California, Inc.u00BFs motion to strike portions of plaintiffu00BFs complaint is granted with 15 days leave to amend to give plaintiff the opportunity, if he is able to do so, to state facts sufficient to plead a claim for punitive damages. Plaintiff did not substantively oppose defendantu00BFs motion. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45am. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUTTNER CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where GIAMPOLINI & CO. DBA GIAMPOLINI/ARCHULETA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where A C P, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAINBOW WATERPROOFING & RESTORATION CO. is a litigant