This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:06:42 (UTC).

JOHN MOORCROFT et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2007 JOHN MOORCROFT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4237

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

DOES 1-8500

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

VIAD CORP

HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

VIAD CORP INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN -INTEREST TO GRISCOM RUSSELL

THE FAIRCHILD CORPORATION

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

ROBINSON, RALPH WELLS

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2725

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DAVIS, WHITNEY A

Attorney at CHARTER DAVIS LLP

1730 I Street, Suite 240

Sacramento, CA 95814

MURRAY, JAMES G.

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

1 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORCROFT, JOHN MOORCROFT, MARGARET AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

DaimlerChrysler Company LLCs Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15320722) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC (Fee:335.00)

Def. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S Objection to Stipulation of Hearing by Commi

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 15402610) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15572043) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN -INTEREST TO GRISCOM RUSSELL (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM-ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15635781) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:335.00)

Answer of Defendant to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15647009) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15674055) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15967901) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE FORD MOTOR COMPANY DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE VIKING PUMP INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 3 TO BE THE FAIRCHILD CORPORATION DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 4 TO BE HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.

Partial Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FROM 3RD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 15970207) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION???S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 16012417) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION???S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION'S OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16012417) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

Defendant Ford Motor Companys Answer to Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16269637) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Def. VIKING PUMP, INC.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbestos.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16369221) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP INC. (Fee:335.00)

Def. VIKING PUMP, INC.s Objection to Stipulation of Hearing by Commissioner.

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 16369221) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIKING PUMP INC.

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16909598) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 TO BE FMC CORPORATION

Request For Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17096104) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 17980057) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORCROFT, JOHN MOORCROFT, MARGARET HEARING SET FOR FEB-07-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:40.00)

Request for Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant, FMC Corporation - Northern Pump

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18085568) AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER NORTHERN PUMP BUSINESS

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2008
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-18-2008. OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF COUNSEL. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22352650) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF & EACH DEFENDANT TO BEAR THEIR OWN COSTS AND FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 20976210)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-19-2008 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-18-2008 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 206. JUDGE: DAVID BALLATI; CLERK: DLOK/EBURA; REPORTER: SUSAN LEE CSR# 4280 (D206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 20034096) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ALLEGED SUCCESSOR-IN -INTEREST TO GRISCOM RUSSELL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 20.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2008
  • ASBESTOS MOTION CALENDAR ON FEB-07-2008 IN DEPT. 206, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY. PLAINTIFF'S DECEASED PER LETTER DATED 1/25/08 FROM BRAYTON PURCELL. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BRENDAN J. TUOHY IN SUPPORT OF DEFT CRANE CO'S CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MO FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 18226412) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 18226412) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18085568) AS TO DEFENDANT FMC CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITS FORMER NORTHERN PUMP BUSINESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENCE [CODE CIV. PROC. ?? 36(A) (D)] (TRANSACTION ID # 18079299) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15549625) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15532295) FILED BY DEFENDANT VIAD CORP (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15510875) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 15402610) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TIME. (TRANSACTION ID # 15402610) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15402610) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15320722) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORCROFT, JOHN MOORCROFT, MARGARET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MOORCROFT, JOHN MOORCROFT, MARGARET AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.