This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:49:01 (UTC).

JOHN JACKSON JR VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 05/01/2007 JOHN JACKSON JR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4180

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

NIBCO INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

MOORE BROS.

SPIRAX SARCO, INC.

SEE ATTACHED LIST

GRINNELL LLC

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC.

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

AMERICAN REFRIGERATION SUPPLIES, INC.

CRANE CO.

AIRGAS-WEST, INC.

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

TRANE US INC., FKA AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

WILSON, LANCE

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Ste.1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

GILLESPIE, JEFFREY S.

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RHOADES, RALPH

Attorney at PARTON SELL

750 Lindaro Street, Suite 140

San Rafael, CA 94901

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

CBS CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15269114) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Companys Answer to First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21146892) FILED BY DEFENDANT RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Nibco Inc. only, from the Third Cause of Action (False Representation) and Punitive Damages only.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION (FALSE REPRESENTATION) AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 21435951) AS TO DEFENDANT NIBCO INC.

Answer of Defendant Airgas-West, Inc. to Unverified Frist Amended Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21525002) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRGAS-WEST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF OREN P. NOAH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S SURREPLY TO DEFENDANT THE LEAVITT MACHINE COMPANY?S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

DECLARATION OF OREN P. NOAH IN SUPPORT OF SURREPLY TO DEFENDANT THE LEAVITT MACHINE CO.'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (TRANSACTION ID # 23122277) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON JR, JOHN

EXHIBITS G THROUGH L IN SUPPORT OF THE DECLARATION OF KATHY M. HUYNH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

EXHIBITS G THROUGH L IN SUPPORT OF THE DECLARATION OF KATHY M. HUYNH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 25679654) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Declaration of Sam Thompson in Support of defendant Airgas-West, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF SAM THOMPSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIRGAS-WEST, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25794292) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRGAS-WEST, INC.

DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY,INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (UNDISPUTED MATERIAL) IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25808668) FILED BY DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF?S EXPERTS REGARDING QUANTITIES OF ASBESTOS AT WORK SITES

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 23: TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF PLTF'S EXPERTS REGARDING QUANTITIES OF ASBESTOS AT WORK SITES (TRANSACTION ID # 32335039) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.

Jackson Supply Company PLEADING Answer to Complaint Single 06-14-2007

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15298724) FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Defendant General Motors Corporations Answer to First Amended Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20987792) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT UNGER CONSTRUCTION COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COURT COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 21474971) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNGER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, / NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL (TRANSACTION ID # 22450485): HILLYARD, MARY KIRK ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

Request for Dismissal (re: Fisher Controls International LLC only)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25271398) AS TO DEFENDANT FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC

Declaration of Leopoldo J. Chanco in Support of Defendant Airgas-West, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF LEOPOLDO J. CHANCO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT AIRGAS-WEST, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 25794292) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRGAS-WEST, INC.

DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 26946443) FILED BY DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 26946443) FILED BY DEFENDANT J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EXPERT WITNESS NOT TIMELY DISCLOSED

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 22: TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF EXPERT WITNESS NOT TIMELY DISCLOSED (TRANSACTION ID # 32335039) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.

412 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. GIL PURCELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-04-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO OCT-29-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON JR, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
480 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15116684) FILED BY DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15086570) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15048470) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 15048470) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15048470) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15048470) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14999418) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON JR, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACKSON JR, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NIBCO Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SPIRAX SARCO, INC. is a litigant