This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:22:28 (UTC).

JOHN GRAY VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2007 JOHN GRAY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4119

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

YARWAY CORPORATION

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

COLTEC INDUSTREIS, INC.

CRANE CO.

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

COSMODYNE INC

DOES 1-8500

COSMODYNE, LLC

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

CSK AUTO, INC.

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "CHRYSLER") ERRONEOUSLY AND IMPROPERLY NAMED IN PLNTF'S COMPLAINT AS AN "ALTERNATE ENTITY" OF "AMERICAN LAFRANCE CORPORATION", "GRAY MOTOR COMPANY"

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR CO.

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SHAFFERY, JOHN

Poole & Shaffery, Llp, 445 South Figueroa St. #2520

Los Angeles, CA 90071

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN, LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

Other Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Defendant General Motors Corporations Answer to Complaint for Damages

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14949097) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORP. (Fee:335.00)

Milwaukee Valve Co. Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21073390) FILED BY DEFENDANT MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY INC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 22997991) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN HEARING SET FOR JAN-23-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 612 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION OF KATHERINE E. ALLEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

DECLARATION OF KATHERINE E. ALLEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 22997991) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN

PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 27707593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN

Compendium of Non-California Authorities in Support of the Goodyear Tire & Rubber Companys Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Consolidate All Cases in Brayton Group 509 for Trial

COMPENDIUM OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THE GOODYEAR TIRE RUBBER COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 509 FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27719858) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY?S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27937906) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. AND/OR WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS) AND/OR WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 31578541) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ??? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15000453) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Lamons Gasket Companys Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15006979) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL A SINGLE DATE (CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE # 274409, 274419, 274339 & 274179)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to defendants Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC and Coltec Industries Inc

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25980114) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC COLTEC INDUSTREIS, INC.

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO CRANE CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27707593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 27707593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN

PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27707593) FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN

Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation?s Response To Plaintiff?s Response To Defendant?s Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 27826539) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54816484)

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 1/9/14. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54816484)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, MR. OREN NOAH. THE BRAYTON'S LAW FIRM HAS PROVIDED A COLOR CODED CHART TO THE COURT REGARDING THE STATUS OF DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CASES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41148783) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39806498) AS TO DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 37537198) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35999203) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
199 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15000453) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15000453) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14993229) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "CHRYSLER") ERRONEOUSLY AND IMPROPERLY NAMED IN PLNTF'S COMPLAINT AS AN "ALTERNATE ENTITY" OF "AMERICAN LAFRANCE CORPORATION", "GRAY MOTOR COMPANY" AND "GRAY MARINE" (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14949097) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14949097) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORP. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14949097) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14949097) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR CO. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRAY, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where YARWAY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant