This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 01:39:53 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 JOHN DOE filed an Other lawsuit against THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1129

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE, JOHN

Defendants

ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL PACIFIC NORTHWEST INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

FRATKIN, MARK AN INDIVIDUAL

THE GREENSPAN ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 10

SCOTT, GORDON AN INDIVIDUAL

GIBSON, CLAY AN INDIVIDUAL

SEVERAID, STEVE AN INDIVIDUAL

MIGDAL, PAUL AN INDIVIDUAL

ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL/CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PERETZ, YOSEF

Attorney at PERETZ & ASSOCIATES

22 Battery Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPayment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819B27J012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819B27F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JOHN (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE GREENSPAN ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL/CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL PACIFIC NORTHWEST INC. A WASHINGTON CORPORATION SCOTT, GORDON AN INDIVIDUAL GIBSON, CLAY AN INDIVIDUAL FRATKIN, MARK AN INDIVIDUAL MIGDAL, PAUL AN INDIVIDUAL SEVERAID, STEVE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-29-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-27-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-06-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******1129
Case Title:JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:NOV-24-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Evidentiary Hearing Re: Whether A Valid Arbitration Agreement Exists
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, November 24, 2020, Line 12,3-Evidentiary Hearing Re: Whether A Valid Arbitration Agreement Exists.Mistaken calendar entry [evidentiary hearing has been completed]. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******1129
Case Title:JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:NOV-19-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Greenspan Adjusters International, Inc.'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Seal Select Allegations Of Plaintiff'S Original And First Amended Complaints
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, November 19, 2020, Line 9, 2. Defendant Greenspan Adjusters International, Inc.'S Motion To Seal Select Allegations Of Plaintiff'S Original And First Amended Complaints:Continued on the Court's own motion to November 24, 2020. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******1129
Case Title:JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:NOV-04-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, November 4, 2020, Line 6, 1. Defendants' Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay ProceedingsContinued to November 19, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******1129
Case Title:JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:NOV-03-2020 13:30 PM
Calendar Matter:Evidentiary Hearing Re: Whether A Valid Arbitration Agreement Exists
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, November 3, 2020, Line 7,Evidentiary Hearing Re: Whether A Valid Arbitration Agreement ExistsJudge Schulman to hear at 1:30 p.m.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******1129
Case Title:JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:OCT-30-2020 13:30 PM
Calendar Matter:Evidentiary Hearing Re: Whether A Valid Arbitration Agreement Exists
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, October 30, 2020, Line 8,Evidentiary Hearing Re: Whether A Valid Arbitration Agreement ExistsJudge Schulman to hear at 1:30 p.m.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******1129
Case Title:JOHN DOE VS. THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
Court Date:OCT-13-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendants' Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, October 13, 2020, Line 4, DEFENDANT GORDON SCOTT, CLAY GIBSON, MARK FRATKIN, PAUL MIGDAL, STEVE SEVERAID, GREENSPAN ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL, INC., ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL PACIFIC NORTHWEST, INC., THE GREENSPAN COMPANY Motion To Compel Arbitration And Stay Proceedings.Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is continued to October 20, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 302. The papers raise a factual dispute about whether Plaintiff signed the arbitration agreement. The Court must resolve the factual dispute to determine whether a valid arbitration agreement exists. (Rosenthal, Toal v. Tardif (2009) 178 Cal.App.4th 1208, 1219-1220 ["before granting a petition to compel arbitration, [a court] must determine the factual issue of 'the existence or validity of the arbitration agreement.'"], quoting Rosenthal v. Great Western Fin. Securities Corp. (1996) 14 Cal.4th 394, 413.) The Court hereby sets an evidentiary hearing for October 15, 2020 at 1:30pm in Department 302 via Zoom. =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE GREENSPAN COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA ADJUSTERS INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERETZ, YOSEF