This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 07/16/2022 at 10:31:43 (UTC).

JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL ET AL VS. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On July 13, 2022, John Doe SSS 19, Jane Doe SSS 20, Jane Doe SSS 21, Jane Doe SSS 22, and John Doe SSS 23 (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Michael W. Carney of Slater Slater Schulman LLP, filed a personal injury lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. (“Uber”), Rasier, LLC (“Rasier”), and Does 1 through 50 (collectively, "Defendants"), seeking damages for alleged sexual assault, rape and false imprisonment by an Uber driver. This case was filed in the San Francisco County Superior Courts in the Civic Center Courthouse with Judge Samuel K. Feng presiding. 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged that “Plaintiffs were kidnapped, sexually assaulted, sexually battered, raped, falsely imprisoned, stalked, harassed, and/or otherwise attacked by an Uber driver with whom they had been paired with through the Uber Application (‘App’). This action stems from these attacks as well as the toxic-male culture at Uber that caused these sexual attacks. A culture which started at the very top of Uber by placing profits and growth over safety above all else and, in the process, exploited, endangered, and injured women and girls, including Plaintiffs. This culture was put in place by Uber’s officers and directors, including Travis Kalanick, and it was put in place with conscious disregard to the rights and safety of Uber passengers.”

Plaintiffs further alleged that “as early as 2014, Uber became aware that Uber drivers were sexually assaulting and raping passengers. In the eight years since, sexual predators driving for Uber have continued to sexually assault, harass, kidnap, physically assault, and/or rape Uber’s passengers, including Plaintiffs.”

Plaintiffs also alleged that “complaints to Uber by passengers who had been attacked by Uber drivers, combined with subsequent criminal investigations by law enforcement, clearly establish that Uber has been fully aware of these continuing attacks by sexual predators driving for Uber. Uber’s response to these ongoing sexual assaults by Uber drivers has been slow and inadequate.”

Plaintiffs additionally alleged that “Uber has failed to implement basic safety measures necessary to prevent these serious sexual assaults, which continue to occur to this day.”

Plaintiffs claimed that “each Uber ride at issue was ordered by or for Plaintiff through the ride-sharing software application owned and controlled by Uber. At all relevant times, Defendants Uber and Rasier (operated and controlled the Uber App. Each Uber driver, while in the course and scope of his employment for Uber and while otherwise working on behalf of Uber, kidnapped, sexually assaulted, sexually battered, raped, falsely imprisoned, stalked, harassed, and/or otherwise attacked the respective Plaintiff, as set forth below.”

Plaintiffs presented fourteen claims for relief concerning allegations of negligence, negligent hiring, supervision and retention, common carrier negligence, negligent failure to warn, vicarious liability for torts and sexual assault, sexual battery, false imprisonment, intentional misrepresentation, emotional distress, breach of contract and strict product liability. 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiffs requested an award of special damages, past and future general damages, past and future loss of earnings, medical expenses, and punitive damages. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0697

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL

JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

RASIER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARNEY, MICHAEL W.

Attorney at SLATER SLATER SCHULMAN LLP

8383 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 255

Beveryly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

Complaint (first appearance fee) (Case Initiation)

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210011368) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION RASIER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-14-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-12-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-21-2022

Civil Case Coversheet (Cover Sheets)

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210011368) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Issued Summons (Summons)

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210011368) TO PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 210011368) TO PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: H2522714F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210011368) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 210011368) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHN DOE SSS 19, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 20, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 21, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 22, AN INDIVIDUAL JOHN DOE SSS 23, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION RASIER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-14-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-12-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-21-2022; Fee: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carney, Michael W