This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:51:25 (UTC).

JOHN DAHL VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2007 JOHN DAHL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4283

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

SUN SHIP, LLC

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

VIACOM, INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

CRANE CO. CRANE COMPANY

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST

ALLIS-CHALBERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

ISCO, INC.

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

ASCO VALVE, INC.

NAVISTAR, INC., FKA INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORP.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

PORT, ANDREW IRA

Attorney at EMARD, DANNOFF, PORT, TAMULSKI & PAETZOLD, LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94105

FRAYSSE, THOMAS EDWARD

Attorney at KNOX RICKSEN LLP

1300 Clay Street, Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

CUMMINGS, SASHA M.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St. Ste. 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

BRAINICH, MARC

Attorney at SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

71 Stevenson St., 2Oth Flr

Sf, CA 94105-2981

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15942511) FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Between Plaintiff and NG Ship Systems

FEE PAID ON STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND NG SHIP SYSTEMS (TRANSACTION ID # 16193724) FILED BY DEFENDANT NORTHROP GRUMMAN SHIP SYSTEMS, INC. (Fee:20.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19850939) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT KAISER VENTURES LLC?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 23992939) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER VENTURES LLC

Defendant Moore McCormack Resources, Inc.s Index of Motions in Limine (Nos. 1-14)

DEFENDANT MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.S INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (NOS. 1-14) (TRANSACTION ID # 31335031) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

MIL 16 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE USE OF DEPOSITIONS TAKEN IN OTHER ACTIONS (EVIDENCE CODE ?? 1200, 1292)

MIL 16 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE USE OF DEPOSITIONS TAKEN IN OTHER ACTIONS (EVIDENCE CODE 1200, 1292) (TRANSACTION ID # 31446130) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

TRIAL BRIEF 33 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S TRIAL BRIEF RE NON-LIABILITY FOR THE PRODUCTS OF OTHERS

TRIAL BRIEF 33 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS TRIAL BRIEF RE NON-LIABILITY FOR THE PRODUCTS OF OTHERS (TRANSACTION ID # 31446130) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

TRIAL BRIEF 35 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING EVIDENCE OF SAFETY ORDER VIOLATIONS

TRIAL BRIEF 35 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING EVIDENCE OF SAFETY ORDER VIOLATIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 31446130) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 36293413) FILED BY DEFENDANT WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16113401) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19589141) FILED BY DEFENDANT YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 21033825) AS TO DEFENDANT LUNKENHEIMER COMPANY, THE

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 24804482) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAHL, JOHN

PLAINTIFF?S INDEX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED IN PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION

INDEX OF NON-CALIFORNIA AUTHORITIES CITED IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) TO PRODUCE ITS CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS AND PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE FOR DEPOSITION AND TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AT DEPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 24804482) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAHL, JOHN

MIL 22 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY BEYOND THE SCOPE OF EXPERT DESIGNATION AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY

MIL 22 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY BEYOND THE SCOPE OF EXPERT DESIGNATION AND DEPOSITION TESTIMONY (TRANSACTION ID # 31446130) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

MIL 29 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT REGARDING DEFENDANT?S ALLEGED LIABILITY FOR ?REPLACEMENT? PARTS

MIL 29 - DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS ALLEGED LIABILITY FOR REPLACEMENT PARTS (TRANSACTION ID # 31446130) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Defendant Moore McCormack Resources, Inc. Request for Dismissal of Plaintiff John Dahls Complaint.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33165357) AS TO DEFENDANT MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Foster Wheeler LLC only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34458648) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38750937) AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 36293413) FILED BY DEFENDANT WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36264117) AS TO DEFENDANT WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2011
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34458648) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34432270)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-27-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2010
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 - DUPLICATE ENTRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-28-2010 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-18-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15832686) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15808003) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 15808003) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15808003) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15800083) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15757515) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15757515) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAHL, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DAHL, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B-1, C, D, H, I OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN SHIP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ASCO VALVE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAPID AMERICAN CORP is a litigant