This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 10:47:22 (UTC).

JOHN DACHAUER et al VS. AMCORD INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR et al

Case Summary

On 08/04/2006 JOHN DACHAUER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4837

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SII TO BESTWALL GYPSUM CO

SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY

AMCORD INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN-INTEREST TO RIVERSIDE CEMENT

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. INDIVIDUALLY & AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ALLIED-SIGNAL, INC. AND THE BENDIX CORPORATION

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

RPM INTERNATIONAL, INC.

UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC.

AMCORD, INC.

CALIFORNIA PORTLANAD CEMENT COMPANY

ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. A/K/A AND SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO ERIE CITY IRON WORKS

PARALEXLAHABRA, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A LA HABRA STUCCO COMPANY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

RPM INTERNATIONAL INC., ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS RPM INTERNATIONAL, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO RPM, INC. AND BONDEX INTERNATIONAL, INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL, INC.

JOHN K BICE CO INC

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DOUGLAS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.,FKA DOUGLAS INSULATION, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA DI INSULATION; DOUGLASS INSULATION CO.

Intervenor

HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

DESIGNATED COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BERRY, PHILLIP SAMUEL

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1333 North California Blvd., Suite 690

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

CLEAVINGER, MARC D.

Attorney at CLEAVINGER ASSOCIATES

550 West "C" Street, Suite 930

San Diego, CA 92101-3578

ADAMS, BARBARA ROSE

Attorney at ADAMS NYE SINUNU BRUNI BECHT LLP

222 Kearny St., 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Intervenor Attorney

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. - Ste. 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorney

WOO, RHONDA L

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY INC

100 Pringle Avenue, Ste 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS, D'AMATO, BRISBOIS & BISGAARD LLP

One Sansome St., Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Street Tower,8T Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

OXLEY, WILLIAM WAYNE

Attorney at ORRICK, HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, Ste 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

SHINING, CAROLIN K.

Attorney at BARON & BUDD, P.C.

9465 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 460

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

SCADDEN, JAMES G.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery St., 20Th Flr.

Sf, CA 94111

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Dachauer Highland PLEADING Answer to Complaint Plural 091206

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12394171) FILED BY DEFENDANT HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 12394251) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Sequoia Ventures Inc.s Demand for Jury

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 12404069) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING; DECLARATIO

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING; DECLARATION OF ERIC L. BROWN; DECLARATION OF ROBERT FALLAT, M.D. [PROPOSED] ORDER, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 13059619) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA HEARING SET FOR DEC-12-2006 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Trial Preference

OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 13134225) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEHIGH SOUTHWEST CEMENT COMPANY

Substitution of Attorney (Georgia-Pacific)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 14043579): BIDERMAN, DAVID T. SUBSTITUTED FOR ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC AS ATTORNEY FOR GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KELLY-MOO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14273460) FILED BY DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Highland Stucco and

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14816169) FILED BY DEFENDANT HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-03-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 14816169) FILED BY DEFENDANT HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 14816169) FILED BY DEFENDANT HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

University Mechanicals Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14873854) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-01-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

Declaration of Ronald R. Hill in Support of Hill Brothers Chemical Com

DECLARATION OF RONALD R. HILL IN SUPPORT OF HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15094900) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR S

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15099905) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

Declaration of Alexis A. Phocas in Support of Plant InsulatioN Company

DECLARATION OF ALEXIS A. PHOCAS IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15105163) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DECLARATION OF KEN COHEN [Filed concurrently with ; Plaintiffs??? Opp

DECLARATION OF KEN COHEN [FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH ; PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HILL BROS. CHEMICAL COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT; PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL DISPUTED FACTS; PLAINTIFFS?RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE STATEMENT; OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE; DECLARATION OF ERIC BROWN; EXHIBITS A-G; DECLARATION OF KEN COHEN; PROPOSED ORDER] (TRANSACTION ID # 15169592) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA

Plaintiffs??? Motion In Limine No. 10 : MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE I

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 15171999) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA

EXHIBITS 13-15 (of 1-28) [filed in connection with the DECLARATION OF

EXHIBITS 13-15 (OF 1-28) [FILED IN CONNECTION WITH THE DECL OF ERIC BROWN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.'S & HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.'S MOT IN LIMINE TO LIMIT THE TESTIMONY OF RICHARD HATFIELD (TRANSACTION ID # 15375384) FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA

KAISER CEMENT???S OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFF???S

OBJECTIONS AND COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S PAGE AND LINE DESIGNATIONS TO THE DEPOSITION OF CARROLL LAGRAFFE, VOLUME 1 (TRANSACTION ID # 15575481) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

468 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION B9507525J004 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION B9507525J007 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16644978) AS TO DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC. FKA HAMILTON DISTRIBUTING ,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16326121) FILED BY DEFENDANT E.F. BRADY COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF REQ FOR DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 16125998) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16125998) AS TO DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15837258) AS TO DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:280.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • SUBSEQUENT JURY FEE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA FEE DEPOSITED BY BARON & BUDD, P.C. FOR JURY FEE FOR JUL-16-2007 THROUGH JUL-17-2007 FOR TRIAL IN DEPT 504 (Fee:227.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2007
  • PER DIEM FEES DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA (Fee:280.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
544 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 12241730) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. INDIVIDUALLY & AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO ALLIED-SIGNAL, INC. AND THE BENDIX CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE- HBCC ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 12220269)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12220269) FILED BY DEFENDANT HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 12174119) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12174119) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.S. GUERIN & COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 12174119) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 12174119) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET NEW FILING ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DACHAUER, JOHN DACHAUER, RITA AS TO DEFENDANT AMCORD INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN-INTEREST TO RIVERSIDE CEMENT BONDEX INTERNATIONAL INC CAHILL CONSTRUCTION CO INC CAHILL CONSTRUCTION SERVICES INC INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CAHILL CONSTRUCTION CO INC DOES 1-300 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-15-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO GRAVEL COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN GATE DRYWALL is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSITY MECHANICAL & ENGINEERING CONTRACTORS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ZURN INDUSTRIES LLC is a litigant