This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 20:13:59 (UTC).

JOHN CHOW et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2013 JOHN CHOW filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6148

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

SUN SHIP, LLC

EX-FM, INC. (FKA FISCHBACH AND MOORE INCORPORATED) (PREVIOUSLY SUED AS DOE 301)

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

DOLPHIN STEAMSHIP CORP.

ISCO, INC.

AMERCARGO, INC.

AMERICAN LIBERTY STEAMSHIP CORPORATION (PREVIOUSLY SUED AS DOE 503)

GENERAL AMERICAN TRANSPORTATION

3M COMPANY

MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC.

TURK AUTO PARKS, INC.

S L SERVICE, INC.

FARRELL LINES, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA,

VICTORY REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

TURK AUTO PARKS, INC. (FKA PINE AUTO PARTS, INC.)

57 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

GILBERT, PETER RAY

KELLEY, RENEE C.

HUGO, EDWARD R

SHELDON, CHARLES T

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

FRAYSSE, THOMAS EDWARD

HORNSTEIN, VAL DAWSON

PORT, ANDREW IRA

Other Attorneys

POLLACK, DEAN

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

GOETZ, ANDY J.

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

YARON, GEORGE DIMITRI

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

JUDIN, JENNIFER

KRAFT, ROBERT S

BAILEY, BOBBIE R.

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT AND PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION 3M COMPANY AMERCARGO, INC. ARNOLD BERNSTEIN STEAMSHIP CORP. ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA ATTRANSCO, INC. CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CRANE AUTO CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. CSK AUTO, INC. DOLPHIN STEAMSHIP CORP. FARRELL LINES, INC. FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) FRANK EDWARDS COMPANY, INC. GENERAL AMERICAN TRANSPORTATION GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY ISCO, INC. ITT CORPORATION (FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.) J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. J.T. THORPE, INC. KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. KAISER VENTURES LLC MACARTHUR COMPANY METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC. MORAN TOWING & TRANSPORTATION COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PINE AUTO PIONEER MARITIME CORP. PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) S L SERVICE, INC. SOUTH ATLANTIC STEAMSHIP LINE, INC. SUN SHIP, LLC TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TRINIDAD CORPORATION TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA VICTORY REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2014 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY

DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC. AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52405224) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC. AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE

OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE (TRANSACTION ID # 52405224) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC. AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATIONS DECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL

DECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 52405224) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.s ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52559934) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:1450.00)

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FKA KAISER CEMENT CORPORATIONs ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52559934) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANYS ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM(ASBESTOS); JURY DEMAND

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52564906) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:1450.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58659424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATIO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58659424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FO

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58659424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFT'S TRUE NAME DOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58667201) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

AMENDMENT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAM

AMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 58667201) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 9 AND 303 TO BE MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDA

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SEA ROAD, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED (Fee:20.00)

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FO

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SEA ROAD, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORD

DECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SEA ROAD, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

284 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MONTIE DERBY IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SEA ROAD, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SEA ROAD, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT SEA ROAD, INC., BY DELIVERY OF PROCESS TO SECRETARY OF STATE (TRANSACTION ID # 58732044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED (Fee:20.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT PER ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 58667201) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 9 AND 303 TO BE MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFT'S TRUE NAME DOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58667201) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT'S TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58659424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58659424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAME FOR DOES 9 AND 303 (TRANSACTION ID # 58659424) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY , AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO AND AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED; CHOW, JAMES CHOW, KENNETH , AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIRS OF JOHN CHOW, DECEASED (Fee:60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND (PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA) DEFAULT OF SEP-16-2015 SET ASIDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
307 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52586885) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52564906) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52559934) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52559934) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 52405224) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEMPORE (TRANSACTION ID # 52405224) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 52405224) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT AND PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHOW, JOHN CHOW, EMILY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED DOES 1 TO 800, INCLUSIVE BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION 3M COMPANY AMERCARGO, INC. ARNOLD BERNSTEIN STEAMSHIP CORP. ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA ATTRANSCO, INC. CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) CRANE AUTO CROWLEY MARITIME CORPORATION CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. CSK AUTO, INC. DOLPHIN STEAMSHIP CORP. FARRELL LINES, INC. FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) FRANK EDWARDS COMPANY, INC. GENERAL AMERICAN TRANSPORTATION GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC (FKA GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION) HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC. FORMERLY KNOWN AS KAISER CEMENT CORPORATION HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY ISCO, INC. ITT CORPORATION (FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.) J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. J.T. THORPE, INC. KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. KAISER VENTURES LLC MACARTHUR COMPANY METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY MOORE MCCORMACK RESOURCES, INC. MORAN TOWING & TRANSPORTATION COMPANY OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PINE AUTO PIONEER MARITIME CORP. PUGET SOUND COMMERCE CENTER, INC. (FKA TODD SHIPYARDS CORPORATION) S L SERVICE, INC. SOUTH ATLANTIC STEAMSHIP LINE, INC. SUN SHIP, LLC TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC. THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY TRINIDAD CORPORATION TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC. UNION OIL COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA VICTORY REAL ESTATE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2014 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6148
Case Title:JOHN CHOW et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:JUN-21-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion For Preferential Setting (For Entry Of Tentative Ruling Only)
Rulings:**** PART 2 OF 2 **** If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30 a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/GLW)



Case Number:*******6148
Case Title:JOHN CHOW et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:APR-15-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, April 15, 2015 in Department 503, Line 2. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file first amended complaint is continued on the court's own motion to April 22, 2015. = (503/TLJ)


Case Number:*******6148
Case Title:JOHN CHOW et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:MAY-08-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, May 08, 2014 in Department 503, Line 4. Defendant 3M Company's motion for summary judgment or, in the alternative, summary adjudication is off calendar at the moving party's request. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******6148
Case Title:JOHN CHOW et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:JAN-16-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial, And Extending Discovery Cutoff
Rulings: ON ASBESTOS TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR FOR THURSDAY, JANUARY 16, 2014 IN DEPARTMENT 503, LINE 1, Plaintiffsu00BF motion for preference is granted pursuant to C.C.P. 36(a). Trial is May 12, 2014 at 11:15am in Department 503. Last day for hearing summary motions is May 8, 2014. At the hearing the court will ask whether plaintiffs will stipulate to shortened notice for summary motions. The time to respond to written discovery is shortened to 20 days. Plaintiffs to make a settlement demand on defendants no later than February 7, 2014. Responses to the demand are due no later than February 14, 2014. Settlement conference in room 603 at 1:30pm on May 8, 2014. Fact discovery cut-off date is April 25, 2014. Expert discovery cut-off date is May 9, 2014. No later than January 30, 2014 plaintiffs must provide a statement stating, as to each defendant, the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of plaintiffsu00BF claims. No later than January 30, 2014 defendants must provide a statement stating the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of defendantu00BFs affirmative defenses. Any person not identified on the statements will be barred from testifying at trial or presenting a declaration on a summary motion absent good cause shown. Before any motions in limine are filed with the court the defendants are ordered to meet and confer on all motions in limine in order to avoid frivolous and duplicative hearings. If the parties do not meet and confer on the motions in limine the court will take appropriate actions. Each side is limited to a total of five motions in limine not to exceed five pages per motion. If a particular party requires additional motions in limine, this request shall be made to the assigned trial judge. Parties are ordered to meet and confer on deposition designations on the same day the case is assigned to a trial department. Deposition designations shall be submitted to the trial judge on the third day after assignment. Further case management conference on February 26, 2014 at 1:30pm. No need for any party to file any case management conference statement. Parties may appear at the conference by telephone. There will be a mandatory settlement conference with the court pursuant to San Francisco Local Rules of Court Rule 5 on May 12, 2014 at 1:30p.m. in Department 503. The parties shall comply with Local Rule 5.0 and provide a confidential settlement statement by May 8, 2014 at 2:00p.m. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)



Case Number:*******6148
Case Title:JOHN CHOW et al VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:JUL-11-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Service Of Summons For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, July 11, 2013 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 2. Specially appearing defendant Victory Real Estate Development Corporationu00BFs motion to quash service of summons for lack of personal jurisdiction is off calendar at the moving partyu00BFs request. = (503/TLJ)