This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 12:01:36 (UTC).

JOHN BUIE VS. REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2019 JOHN BUIE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PANG LY and CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6765

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PANG LY

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUIE, JOHN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 800 INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC.

REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC. FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION)

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC.

PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC.

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

SUN SHIP, LLC

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

OWEN-ILLINOIS, INC.

3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

BARBER, STEVEN J.

FOX, MICHAEL L.

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

SHELDON, CHARLES T

BOONE, MORDECAI D.

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT OF ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64787961) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY ONLY. E

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64754799) AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO SUN SHIP, LLC AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64625818)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY, INC

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64625746) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64548967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC.

Request for Dismissal of Defendant Peter Kiewit Sons, Inc. Only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64544278) AS TO DEFENDANT PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC.

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO TEXACO MARINE SERVICES INC & CHEVRON SHIPPING COMPANY LLC AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64530699)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY ONLY WITH A

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64526893) AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMP

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64440326) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64439483)

Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Owens-Illinois

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64431669) AS TO DEFENDANT OWEN-ILLINOIS, INC.

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64338047) AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC. AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64317548)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

DECLARATION OF JOHN BUIE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL

DECLARATION OF JOHN BUIE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL SETTING (TRANSACTION ID # 64178407) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36.5 IN SUPPORT

DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36.5 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 64178407) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GR

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 64178407) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING C

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 64178407) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN HEARING SET FOR OCT-08-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 503

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT OF ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64787961) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64754799) AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Oct-08-2019 Set For Trial On Jan-27-20 At 11:15 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CALENDAR; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 603; Judge Name: PANG LY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO SUN SHIP, LLC AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64625818)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64625746) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64548967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64544278) AS TO DEFENDANT PETER KIEWIT SONS', INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO TEXACO MARINE SERVICES INC & CHEVRON SHIPPING COMPANY LLC AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64530699)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63159336), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN SERVED MAR-11-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT OWEN-ILLINOIS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63159336), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN SERVED MAR-12-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63159336), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN SERVED MAR-12-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63159336), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN SERVED MAR-11-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63159336), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN SERVED MAR-12-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63159217) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET/NEW FILING/ ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0919228F011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BUIE, JOHN AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OWEN-ILLINOIS, INC. CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC. FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION) SUN SHIP, LLC PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC. 3M COMPANY TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC. DOES 1 TO 800 INCLUSIVE AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6765
Case Title:JOHN BUIE VS. REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY ET AL
Court Date:OCT-08-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial, And Extending Discovery Cutoff (Added To Calendar For Issuance Of Tentative Ruling Only.)
Rulings:(PART 2 OF 2)(Tentative ruling continued from previous entry)No later than October 22, 2019, Plaintiff must provide a statement stating, as to each Defendant, the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of Plaintiff's claims. No later than October 22, 2019, Defendants must provide a statement stating the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of Defendant's affirmative defenses. Any person not identified on the statements may be barred from testifying at trial or presenting a declaration on a summary motion absent good cause shown. Further case management conference on December 11, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. No need for any party to file any case management conference statement. Parties may appear at the conference by telephone. If the parties agree that no case management conference is necessary, they shall notify the Court at least two day prior to take the CMC off calendar. Plaintiff to make a settlement demand on Defendants no later than December 20, 2019. Responses to the demand are due no later than January 3, 2019. The parties are ordered to provide confidential settlement demands/offers stating their best and final settlement effort. This confidential value must be separately submitted to Commissioner Pang Ly via electronic mail by January 17, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. Mandatory settlement conference with only the attorneys present and final decision makers available by phone is set for Thursday, January 23, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. in 603. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30 a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. =(503/CML)