Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:44 (UTC).

JOCHEN BACKS VS. DAVID VARDY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 JOCHEN BACKS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID VARDY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3077

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACKS, JOCHEN

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant

VARDY, DAVID

Berkeley, CA 94710

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,562.40 FILED BY BACKS, JOCHEN AS TO DEFENDANT VARDY, DAVID ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-15-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action L.R. 18.0

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. NO APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFFS NOT EXHIBITS RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID YANG. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (ENVELOPE MARKED:RETURNED TO SENDER - UNCLAIMED - UNABLE TO FORWARD) COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON DEFENDANT VARDY, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. NO APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFFS NOT EXHIBITS RETAINED. DEFENDANTS EXHIBITS NOT RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID YANG. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF BACKS, JOCHEN AS TO DEFENDANT VARDY, DAVID (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • COPYING FEES (12 PAGE) (Fee:6.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $2,562.40 FILED BY BACKS, JOCHEN AS TO DEFENDANT VARDY, DAVID ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-15-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less