This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/18/2020 at 01:37:46 (UTC).

JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 JOANNA L PFEISTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6621

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PFEISTER, JOANNA L. PFEISTER & ASSOCIATES, LLP SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94108

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 20

GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PFEISTER, JOANNA L. AS TO DEFENDANT GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-17-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-16-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-25-2021

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1320917F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PFEISTER, JOANNA L. AS TO DEFENDANT GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-17-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-16-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-25-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:DEC-17-2020 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, December 17, 2020, Line 7, 3- PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Robert Kane, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: a) Gramercy's Motion to Quash Subpoena to Gramercy; and, (b) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production by Gramercy: Parties to appear on these interrelated motions. In addition to any other matters the parties wish to address, please be prepared to address the same issues set forth above and does it make a difference that the request is being made to Gramercy rather than the management company?As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rkane1089@aol.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:OCT-29-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For "Privildge Log" Order That Deft Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Discovery Calendar for Friday, October 29, 2021, Line 4, PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For "Privilege Log" Order That Defendant Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Katherine Gallo, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Motion denied. No separate statement of item in dispute was filed with the motion as required by CRC, Rule 3.1345.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to Klgallo@discoveryreferee.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:APR-04-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Joinder To Special Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Second Amended Complaint Per C.C.P. Sec.425.16 (Anti-Slapp) By David Wetzel, Scott Gordon, Stephen Rogers, Jyotsna Bires, Giampaolo D'Errico, Joseph O. Tobin, Ii
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for April 4, 2022 line 2.DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Joinder To Special Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Second Amended Complaint Per C.C.P. Sec.425.16 (Anti-Slapp) By David Wetzel, Scott Gordon, Stephen Rogers, Jyotsna Bires, Giampaolo D'Errico, Joseph O. Tobin, Iiis CONTINUED to April 22, 2022 on the Court's own motion. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified, and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:MAR-11-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Or
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for March 11, 2022 line 4.PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Or In The Alternative, For Summary Adjudicationis OFF CALENDAR, moot. Second Amended Complaint filed on February 7, 2022. =(501/REQ)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified, and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:MAR-02-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, March 2, 2022, Line 3DEFENDANT JOSEPH TOBIN, JR.'S DEMURRER to Amended COMPLAINT.Off calendar. Second Amended Complaint filed on February 7, 2022. In addition, department 501 is now hearing this real property dispute. Future law and motion matters shall be calendared in that department. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JAN-27-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court'S Orders And Ccop 2023.010(D) Through 2023.010(I)
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for January 27, 2022 line 5.PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court'S Orders And Ccop 2023.010(D) Through 2023.010(I)is DENIED. Plaintiff is seeking terminating sanctions, a drastic remedy not available at this stage of the litigation and under the facts of this case. Plaintiff shall engage in meaningful meet and confer efforts regarding discovery disputes, including those arising out of the Court's prior orders, and may bring further motions to compel if necessary and proper. All discovery matters shall be referred to discovery referee per December 13, 2021. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified, and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JAN-21-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court'S Orders And Ccop 2023.010(D) Through 2023.010(I)
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for January 21, 2022 line 3.PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court'S Orders And Ccop 2023.010(D) Through 2023.010(I)is continued to January 27, 2022 to be heard with other pending motions. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified, and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:DEC-30-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For A "Privilege Log" Order That Defendant Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, December 30, 2021, Line 3, PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER's Motion For A "Privilege Log" Order That Defendant Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions.Off calendar. On December 13, 2021, the court appointed a discovery referee to handle all discovery disputes in this case. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:DEC-02-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For "Privilege Log" Order That Deft Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, December 2, 2021 Line 10, PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER'S Motion For "Privilege Log" Order That Deft Produce The Documents And For Monetary SanctionsOff calendar at the request of the moving party per email to the court dated November 23, 2021. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:NOV-19-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For "Privilege Log" Order That Deft Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Friday, November 19, 2021, Line 4,1- PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER's Motion For "Privilege Log" Order That Defendant Produce The Documents And For Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Katherine Gallo, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Motion denied. This motion is a motion to compel further production of documents and requires a separate statement of items in dispute pursuant to CRC, Rule 3.1345. No separate statement was filed with the motion. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to Klgallo@discoveryreferee.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:SEP-23-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Quashing And Or Limiting Deposition Subpoena For Personal Appearance Of Giampaolo Derrico And Production Of Business Records Declaration Of Kirill M. Devyatov In Support Thereof
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, September 23, 2021, Line 101- DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION's Motion For Order Quashing And Or Limiting Deposition Subpoena For Personal Appearance Of Giampaolo Derrico And Production Of Business RecordsThe report and recommendation of the judge pro tem is adopted. Defendant Gramercy Towers Condominium Association's motion to quash or limit the deposition subpoena for personal appearance of Giampolo Derrico and production of business records is denied. Defendnt shall produce a privilege log as to any documents withheld on privilege grounds.Effective Monday, June 28, 2021, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, attorneys and parties may appear either in person in Department 302 or remotely by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. The plaintiff is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JAN-05-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike And Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday January 5, 2021, Line 7. DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION'S Motion To Strike And Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S ComplaintTransferred to be heard in department 501 on January 19, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. That department handles all cases involving damage to real property per SF Local Rule 8.10A1. =(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:AUG-12-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Joanna Pfeister'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, August 12, 2021, Line 7, Joanna Pfeister's Motion To Compel Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Scott Borrowman, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Motion DENIED. Plaintiff does not demonstrate how any of these arguments were not addressed in, and therefore precluded by, the order signed on June 9, 2021, by Judge Schulman. It is improper to re-serve discovery to evade an order.For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to sborrowman@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:AUG-02-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Compel Responses To Req. For Production Of Documents And Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for August 2, 2021 line 2.PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND MONETARY SANCTIONSis transferred to department 301 to be heard on August 12, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JUN-03-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Affirm This Courts April 22, 2021 Judgment Against The Defendant For Disobeying The January 21, 2021 And April 22, 2021 Orders To Provide Discovery
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for June 3, 2021 line 5.PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Affirm This Courts April 22, 2021 Judgment Against The Defendant For Disobeying The January 21, 2021 And April 22, 2021 Orders To Provide Discoveryis continued to June 15, 2021 per stipulation and order. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JUN-01-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Confirm Compliance With This Court'S January 21, 2021 Discovery Order
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday June 1, 2021, Line 11DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION's Motion To Confirm Compliance With This Court'S January 21, 2021 Discovery OrderDefendant Gramercy Towers Condominium Association's motion to confirm compliance with the Court's January 21, 2021 discovery order is granted. *FULL AND COMPLETE TENTATIVE RULING HAS BEEN EMAILED TO ALL COUNSEL*As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the defendant is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.=(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:APR-22-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff Joanna Pfeister'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court Order To Provide Discovery Under Ccp 2023.010(G)
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for April 22, 2021 line 9.Plaintiff Joanna Pfeister's Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court Order To Provide Discovery Under Ccp 2023.010(G)is GRANTED. The order will be stayed and vacated if Defendants (1) produce unredacted copies (as previously order by judge Shulman; that decision will not be re-visited and reconsidered by this Court) of all communications between the HOA and its attorneys between December 1, 2018 and July 2, 2019, including invoices for legal services, no later than May 14, 2021; and (2) turn over the mailing addresses of all members no later than May 14, 2021, unless they have specifically opted out. Any further proceedings by Defendants in this action are stayed until May 21, 2021. Monetary sanctions awarded in the amount of costs (to be presented at the hearing) and to be paid no later than May 14, 2021. Each defendant is also sanctioned in the amount of $1,000 payable to the Court to be paid no later than May 14, 2021 The stay of this order discussed above does not apply to monetary sanctions. No later than May 21, 2021 Defendants to file declarations of compliance and to appear ex-parte with a proposed order vacating the order as outlined above. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:APR-01-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Plaintiff Joanna Pfeister'S Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court Order To Provide Discovery Under Ccp 2023.010(G)
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, April 1, 2021, Line 6, Plaintiff Joanna Pfeister's Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To CCP 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court Order To Provide Discovery Under CCP 2023.010(G).Pro Tem Judge Robert Kane, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Plaintiff's Sanction Motion for Entry of Default: Parties to appear; there appears to be a factual dispute regarding whether all documents have been produced in accordance with the Court's prior order.To the extent that Plaintiff is complaining about redactions that are based on attorney client or attorney work product ;privileges connected with the defense of the instant action, the order specifically allows for such redactions, , which does not appear to be part of Plaintiff's motion. As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rkane1089@aol.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:MAR-25-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court Order To Provide Discovery Under Ccp 2023.010(G)
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for March 25, 2021 line 5.PLAINTIFF JOANNA PFEISTER's Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Rendering Judgment By Default Against Defendant Pursuant To Ccp 2023.030(D)(4) For Disobeying The Court Order To Provide Discovery Under Ccp 2023.010(G)is transferred to department 301 to be heard on April 1, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JAN-21-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Quashing And Or Limiting Deposition Subpoena For Production Of Business Records; Declaration Of Kirill M. Devyatov In Supportthereof
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, January 21, 2021, Line 8, 1. DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION's Motion For Order Quashing And Or Limiting Deposition Subpoena For Production Of Business Records:The report and recommendation of the judge pro tem is adopted in its entirety.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the Association is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested.=(302/EPS)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:JAN-19-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike And Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for January 19, 2020 line 8.DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike And Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Complaint; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereofis DENIED. Moving party fails to cite any authority for the proposition that the entire complaint should be stricken under CC 5950. Furthermore, late-filed CC 5950 Certification is now on file. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******6621
Case Title:JOANNA L. PFEISTER VS. GRAMERY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION ET AL
Court Date:APR-22-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Joinder To Special Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Second Amended Complaint Per C.C.P. Sec.425.16 (Anti-Slapp) By David Wetzel, Scott Gordon, Stephen Rogers, Jyotsna Bires, Giampaolo D'Errico, Joseph O. Tobin, Ii
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for April 22, 2022 line 6.DEFENDANT GRAMERCY TOWERS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION Gramercy Towers Condominium Association'S Joinder To Special Motion To Strike Plaintiff'S Second Amended Complaint Per C.C.P. Sec.425.16 (Anti-Slapp) By David Wetzel, Scott Gordon, Stephen Rogers, Jyotsna Bires, Giampaolo D'Errico, Joseph O. Tobin, Ii (Tentative ruling part 1 of 3) 1) Plaintiff served the FAC on Defendants between November 23 and November 26, 2021. The SAC, filed February 7, 2022, only alleged one new cause of action not included in the FAC (violation of privacy). This anti-SLAPP motion was filed on March 8, 2022, more than 60 days after the FAC was served on Defendants. The Motion is untimely as to the claims alleged in the FAC. The only claim not untimely is COA Four for invasion of privacy. 2) The anti-SLAPP motion is denied on Invasion of Privacy, as Plaintiff demonstrates a probability of prevailing on the claim. 3) Defendant Gramercy Tower's motion to join lacks sufficient notice, and in addition it does not request affirmative relief.4) On the merits, Defendant Board of Director's Special Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint per CCP Sec. 425.16 is DENIED. For each claim, Plaintiff demonstrates a probability of prevailing, or the claim is based on conduct not protected by the anti-SLAPP statute.5) First Cause of Action for Discrimination. Plaintiff's declaration constitutes a prima facie showing of discrimination, particularly as she claims she is a member of protected classes and that she was subjected to disparate, adverse treatment through a direct and circumstantial showing. (See, e.g., Guz v. Bechtel National, Inc. (2000) 24 Cal.4th 317, 355). Further, not all conduct alleged in this cause of action is speech for the purposes of the anti-SLAPP statute.6) Second Cause of Action for Abuse of Process. Plaintiff claims Defendant made false statements to law enforcement officers about plaintiff's conduct during the settlement conference for the purposes of instigating a wrongful criminal prosecution against plaintiff (which was dismissed) and to create a false premise to support a civil case by defendants to obtain a restraining order against plaintiff (which was also later dismissed) in order to further defendants' plan to exclude plaintiff from serving on the Board on account of her protected status. Plaintiff provides sufficient evidence to establish a prima facie case for Abuse of Process. Further, not all conduct alleged in this cause of action is speech for the purposes of the anti-SLAPP statute. (End of tentative ruling Part 1 of 3) =(501/CFH)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gramercy Towers Condominium Association is a litigant