This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:15:04 (UTC).

JIAN CAI MAO et al VS. CHUN YUAN LIN et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2013 JIAN CAI MAO filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CHUN YUAN LIN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3946

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAO, JIAN CAI

MAO, JING CI

Defendants

LIN, RISHENG

LIN, RI SHENG

San Francisco, CA 94121

DOES 1 TO 5

San Francisco, CA 94121

XIAO, ZIA YIAN HAN

San Francisco, CA 94121

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

San Francisco, CA 94121

LIN, CHUN YUAN

San Francisco, CA 94121

LIN, RICHENG

San Francisco, CA 94121

LIN, CHUN YUEN

San Francisco, CA 94121

XIAO, ZAI XIAN

San Francisco, CA 94121

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, MICHAEL CARRILLO

Attorney at M C HALL & ASSOCIATES

605 Market St Ste 900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

SHEN, STANLEY

Attorney at SHEN LAW FIRM

2037 Irving Street, Suite 206

San Francisco, CA 94122

BETZ, MICHAEL J

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS

3 Embarcadero Center, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

MOORE, ROBERT RORY

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4074

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED JAN-19-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND FILED BY DEFENDANT LIN, RICHENG HEARING SET FOR APR-18-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:225.00)

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND FILED BY DEFENDANT XIAO, ZAI XIAN HEARING SET FOR APR-18-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:225.00)

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI AS TO DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN LIN, RI SHENG XIAO, ZIA YIAN HAN ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS DOES 1 TO 5 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS

MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN HEARING SET FOR JAN-31-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:225.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI

ORDER

ORDER OVERRUING DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER VACATING AND SETTING ASIDE THE DEFAULTS ENTERED AGAINST DEFTS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SHORTENING TIOME ON DEFT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE DEFAULTS ENTERED, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI (Fee:60.00)

REPLY

REPLY PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FO R INSPECTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR SHEN, STANLEY AS ATTORNEY FOR LIN, CHUN YUEN

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: PRO PER SUBSTITUTED FOR SHEN, STANLEY AS ATTORNEY FOR XIAO, ZAI XIAN

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF TONY FU IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO PLTF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S DEMURRER TO PLTF'S UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT XIAO, ZAI XIAN

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

POS BY PERSONAL DELIVERY OF ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S MTN TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH DEMAND FOR INSPECTION OF PREMISES AND REQ. FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI AS TO DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN LIN, RI SHENG XIAO, ZIA YIAN HAN ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS DOES 1 TO 5

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OFHEARING ON MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF ANDRES SANCHEZ; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLTF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED APR-30-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT LIN, RI SHENG

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION, 501, NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT CHUN YUAN LIN, OFF CALENDAR DISMISSAL ON FILE. (D501)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUEN LIN, RICHENG XIAO, ZAI XIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: BETZ, MICHAEL J SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR LIN, RICHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, PLAINTIFF JIAN MAO, JING MAO'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFT CHUN YUAN LIN IS CONTINUED TO MAY 17, 2013 PER MOVING PARTY'S REQUEST. JUDGE ERNEST GOLDSMITH, CLERK: M. OLOPERNES, NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-06-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OFHEARING ON MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF ANDRES SANCHEZ; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLTF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED APR-30-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT LIN, RI SHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OFHEARING ON MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF ANDRES SANCHEZ; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLTF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED APR-30-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT XIAO, ZIA YIAN HAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; NOTICE OFHEARING ON MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES; DECLARATION OF ANDRES SANCHEZ; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF PLTF'S FORM INTERROGATORIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED APR-30-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT CHUN LIN'S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS IS DENIED, FIVE (5) DAYS TO PLEAD. PROPER SUBSERVICE PER CCP 415.20. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CLERK: M. SMITH, NOT REPORTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-31-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO QUASH SERCVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS OR STAY OR DISMISS, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN HEARING SET FOR JAN-31-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED JAN-19-2013, POSTING AND MAILING ON DEFENDANT ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT XIAO, ZIA YIAN HAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LIN, RI SHENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI SERVED JAN-19-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMMERCIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MAO, JIAN CAI MAO, JING CI AS TO DEFENDANT LIN, CHUN YUAN LIN, RI SHENG XIAO, ZIA YIAN HAN ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS DOES 1 TO 5 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less