This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/01/2022 at 21:38:33 (UTC).

JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2023

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON, KEVIN Y

Attorney at QUILL & ARROW, LLP

10900 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

09.28.2022 Gonzalez-Pacheco, Jesus v. GM - Fraud Complaint

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100177447) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-01-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-28-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-06-2023

09.28.2022 Gonzalez-Pacheco, Jesus v. GM - Civ Case Cover

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100177447) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

09.28.2022 Gonzalez-Pacheco, Jesus v. GM - Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100177447) TO PLAINTIFF JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100177447) TO PLAINTIFF JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122930F015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100177447) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100177447) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JESUS GONZALEZ-PACHECO, AN INDIVIDUAL AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-01-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-28-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-06-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON KEVIN