This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2020 at 12:02:31 (UTC).

JESSE ALVARADO ET AL VS. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2019 JESSE ALVARADO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PANG LY and CYNTHIA M. LEE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6769

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PANG LY

CYNTHIA M. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARNER, SONIA

ALVARADO, JESSE

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

METALCLAD INSULATION LLC

SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.

SUN SHIP, LLC

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

BROADMOOR LUMBER & PLYWOOD CO.

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Defendant Attorneys

BARBER, STEVEN J.

OBERG, LISA L

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT S

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64830793) AS TO DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 64758242)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64709322) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK AND SEAL COMPANY, INC

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ; WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64550351) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO SUN SHIP, LLC AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64544566)

Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc.s Notice of Partial Reso

NOTICE OF PARTIAL RESOLUTION OF THIS MATTER (TRANSACTION ID # 64482267) FILED BY DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64452579) AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO SYD CARPENTER, MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64302632)

Plaintiff hereby dismisses all allegations, if any, related to exposur

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64302593)

ORDER

ORDER : STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Broadmoor Lumber and Plywood Co.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64265608) AS TO DEFENDANT BROADMOOR LUMBER & PLYWOOD CO.

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice of the Complaint as to Defendant

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64188604) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF

DECLARATION OF JESSE ALVARADO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENC

DECLARATION OF JESSE ALVARADO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 64073324) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA

DECLARATION OF DAVID R. DONADIO PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36.5 IN SUPPORT OF

DECLARATION OF DAVID R. DONADIO PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 36.5 IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 64073324) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GR

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 64073324) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING C

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL, AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (TRANSACTION ID # 64073324) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA HEARING SET FOR SEP-05-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 503

Defendant Broadmoor Lumber and Plywood Co.s Answer to Plaintiffs Compl

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63327669) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR LUMBER & PLYWOOD CO.

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64830793) AS TO DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 64758242)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Sep-05-2019 Set For Trial On Dec-23-19 At 11:15 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64709322) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ; WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 64550351) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF HEREBY DISMISSES ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO SUN SHIP, LLC AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 64544566)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CALENDAR; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 603; Judge Name: PANG LY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PARTIAL RESOLUTION OF THIS MATTER (TRANSACTION ID # 64482267) FILED BY DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64452579) AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63193979), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA SERVED APR-01-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63193979), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA SERVED APR-02-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63193979), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA SERVED APR-01-2019, CERTIFIED OR REGISTERED MAIL - OUT OF STATE AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63193979), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA SERVED APR-02-2019, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BROADMOOR LUMBER & PLYWOOD CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W0919419F025

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63180128) FILED BY DEFENDANT SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT/SHEET/NEW FILING/ASBESTOS LITIGATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0819320F008

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVARADO, JESSE GARNER, SONIA AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FKA FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION) KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY METALCLAD INSULATION LLC SUN SHIP, LLC BROADMOOR LUMBER & PLYWOOD CO. SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR, INC. HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE, AS REQUIRED BY CALIFORNIA LAW ON JOINT AND SEVERAL LIABILITY PURSUANT TO CALIFONRIA CIVIL CODE 1431.2 ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE SATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2020 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6769
Case Title:JESSE ALVARADO ET AL VS. INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Court Date:SEP-05-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial, And Extending Discovery Cutoff (Added To Calendar For Issuance Of Tentative Ruling Only.)
Rulings:(PART 2 OF 2)(Tentative ruling continued from previous entry)No later than September 18, Plaintiff must provide a statement stating, as to each Defendant, the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of Plaintiff's claims. No later than September 18, 2019, Defendants must provide a statement stating the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of Defendant's affirmative defenses. Any person not identified on the statements may be barred from testifying at trial or presenting a declaration on a summary motion absent good cause shown. Further case management conference on November 6, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. No need for any party to file any case management conference statement. Parties may appear at the conference by telephone. If the parties agree that no case management conference is necessary, they shall notify the Court at least two day prior to take the CMC off calendar. Plaintiff to make a settlement demand on Defendants no later than November 15, 2019. Responses to the demand are due no later than November 29, 2019. The parties are ordered to provide confidential settlement demands/offers stating their best and final settlement effort. This confidential value must be separately submitted to Commissioner Pang Ly via electronic mail by December 13, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Mandatory settlement conference with only the attorneys present and final decision makers available by phone is set for Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in 603. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30 a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)