This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/08/2016 at 15:31:27 (UTC).

JERRY A DEAL VS. ANDREW R. DUHAMEL et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2010 JERRY A DEAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANDREW R DUHAMEL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5493

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEAL, JERRY A

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.

DUHAMEL, ANDREW R.

SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

Cross Defendants and Defendants

DUHAMEL, ANDREW R.

ROES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SWERDLIN, DANIEL B

Attorney at DANIEL B. SWERDLIN ATTORNEY AT LAW

1388 Haight Street, Suite 58

San Francisco, CA 94117

WOLCHANSKY, MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL WOLCHANSKY

2370 Market Street, Suite 180

San Francisco, CA 94114

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

AARON, ROBERT S

Attorney at AARON & WILSON, LLP

150 Post Street, Ste 400

San Francisco, CA 94108

FORD, ROBERT ANDREW

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-20-2014 CONTINUED TO JUL-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANDREW R. DUHAMEL, OR DISMISS DEFENDANTS ANDREW R. DUHAMEL AND DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-25-2014 CONTINUED TO MAY-20-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) ANDREW R. DUHAMEL, OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) ANDREW R. DUHAMEL, AND DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE. THE MAR-25-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL ROBERT ANDREW FORD SET FOR MAR-25-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SHELL VACATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. THE FEB-05-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-18-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-05-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP. TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON OCT-21-2013. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT. 610 ON DEC-18-2013 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR FILING OF A JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. DEFENDANT SHELL VACATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WAS GRANTED ON 10/2/12. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206) (206)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A AS TO DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R. SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-22-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-07-2011 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED DEC-01-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED NOV-24-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED NOV-24-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. (Fee:410.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R. SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP ROES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

ORDER TO STRIKE

ORDER TO STRIKE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED AS TO REMAINING DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUL-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-08-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. SWERDLIN IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER VACATING SANCTIONS AGAINST DANIEL B. SWERDLIN & MICHAEL WOLCHANSKY IMPOSED ON MAY-20-2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • DECLARATION OF DANIEL B. SWERDLIN FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • APPLCIATION TO VACATE SANCTIONS AGAINST MICHAEL WOLCHANSKY FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • APPLICATION AND MEMO OF P&A TO VACATE SANCTIONS AGAINST DANIEL B. SWERDLIN FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-20-2014 CONTINUED TO JUL-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ANDREW R. DUHAMEL, OR DISMISS DEFENDANTS ANDREW R. DUHAMEL AND DOES 1-20, INCLUSIVE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $400.00 AGAINST MICHAEL WOLCHANSKY, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: MAY-20-2014, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE JUN-05-2014. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED JAN-04-2011, MAIL ON DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R. SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (SET ASIDE PER 4/14/11 COURT ORDER) AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R. SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP ROES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED NOV-24-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED NOV-24-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A SERVED DEC-01-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DEAL, JERRY A AS TO DEFENDANT DUHAMEL, ANDREW R. SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP REAL HOSPITALITY GROUP, INC. DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-22-2011 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-18-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-07-2011 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5493
Case Title:JERRY A DEAL VS. ANDREW R. DUHAMEL et al
Court Date:OCT-02-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Tuesday, October 2, 2012, Line 6, DEFENDANT SHELL VACATIONS CM CORP MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENTThe motion is granted because no opposition was filed. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and in compliance with Code of Civil Procedure 437c(g) and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/AJR)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWERDLIN, DANIEL B.