Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/05/2018 at 13:50:27 (UTC).

JEROME TALLEY VS. EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A

Case Summary

On 08/24/2016 JEROME TALLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN K. STEWART. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3888

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN K. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TALLEY, JEROME

San Francisco, CA 94107

Defendants

EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA

EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

WERTH, STEVEN DOUGLAS

Attorney at ALLEN, GLAESSNER, HAZELWOOD & WERTH, LLP

180 Montgomery Street, Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-28-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME AS TO DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

THE AFFIDAVIT (DECLARATION) OF MAILING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO SECTION 587 OF CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ***FILED AT INSISTENCE OF LITIGANT*** FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME

DECLARATION

DECLARATION UNDER ARTICLE IV, SEC. 1 OF U NITED STATES CONSTITUTION FULL FAITH AND CREDIT TO UBLIC ACTS, RECORDS AND JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME

DECLARATION

DECLARATION ARTICLE I V, SEC 1 UOF UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION OFULL FAITH AND CREDIT TO PUBLIC ACTS, RECORDS AND JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME

Notice to Adverse Party of Filing Removal of Action

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59572183) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES

Notice of Filing Removal of Action

NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 59572183) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING PRIOR TO RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT UNDER SECTION 464 OF CCP BY LEAVE OF COURT **** FILED AT INSISTENCE OF LITIGANT **** FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME SERVED AUG-24-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME AS TO DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-28-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-24-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-05-2016

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2016
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R9416A14F016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W7616928F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Payment : FIRST PAPER RESPONSE/PLEADING $2,500 - $10,000; Amount : $225; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0216916F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R6416831F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Payment : CERTIFIED/EXEMPLIFIED COPIES; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : R9416824F022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Payment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Payment Type : IFP; Receipt Number : W0816824F011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-28-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME AS TO DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • COPYING FEES (4 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) AFFIDAVIT (10/12/16) PAID BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • THE AFFIDAVIT (DECLARATION) OF MAILING APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO SECTION 587 OF CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ***FILED AT INSISTENCE OF LITIGANT*** FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2016
  • COPYING FEES (24 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING REMOVAL OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59572183) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 59572183) FILED BY DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICES (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • COPYING FEES (22 PAGE) PAID BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING PRIOR TO RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT UNDER SECTION 464 OF CCP BY LEAVE OF COURT **** FILED AT INSISTENCE OF LITIGANT **** FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME SERVED AUG-24-2016, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • COPYING FEES (14 PAGE) COPY OF ENTIRE FILE PAID BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TALLEY, JEROME AS TO DEFENDANT EPISCOPAL COMMUNITY SERVICE/THE SANCTUARY; A SECTION 501 (C) (3) NON PROFIT ORGANIZATION AND CITIZEN OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-28-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-24-2016 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-05-2016 (Fee:$IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERTH, STEVEN DOUGLAS