This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/17/2018 at 07:23:15 (UTC).

JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2012 JENNIFER WALKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HAND JOB, LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD A. KRAMER, CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, JOSEPH M. QUINN, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, HAROLD E. KAHN, JOHN K. STEWART, SUZANNE R. BOLANOS and STEPHEN M. MURPHY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5970

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

RICHARD A. KRAMER

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

JOSEPH M. QUINN

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

STEPHEN M. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALKER, JENNIFER

WALKER, ANDREA

Defendants

HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

565 Castro St.

San Francisco, CA 94114

HO, TEVIN

NGUYEN, BAO

San Francisco, CA 94606

DOES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAZARIAN, MORRIS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MORRIS NAZARIAN

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2120

Los Angeles, CA 90067

WATSON, MARK C.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MARK C. WATSON

1633 Bayshore Hwy., Suite 250

Burlingame, CA 94010-1515

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, CHARLES G

Attorney at GOLDEN STATE EMPLOYMENT LAW

46542 Paseo Padre Parkway

Fremont, CA 94539

MARTIN, DAVID W.

5350 James Avenue

Oakland, CA 94618

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100025055) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT NGUYEN, BAO SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100027451)

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS JENNIFER WALKER AND ANDREA WALKER AND AGAINST DEFENDANT HAND JOB, L.L.C., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Proof of Service re Motion for Court Judgment against Hand Job, LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE RE MOTION FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST HAND JOB, LLC (TRANSACTION ID # 100026492) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

Request for Court Judgment

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS (TRANSACTION ID # 100026492) AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Plaintiffs Motion for Court Judgment Against Hand Job, L.L.C

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST HAND JOB, L.L.C (TRANSACTION ID # 100026492) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Plaintiffs Notice of Motion for Court Judgment Against Defendant Hand

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT HAND JOB, L.L.C. (TRANSACTION ID # 100026492) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR MAY-09-2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NGUYEN, BAO HO, TEVIN

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MINUTES FOR OCT-17-2017 9:00 AM

MINUTES FOR OCT-17-2017 9:00 AM

Plaintiffs statement regarding trial time limits

STATEMENT REGARDING TRIAL TIME LIMITS (TRANSACTION ID # 100029957) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

ORDER

ORDER DENYING (AUG-7-2017) MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100028805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

Declaration of Morris Nazarian in Support of Plaintiffs Sur-Reply In S

DECLARATION OF MORRIS NAZARIAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS AND EVIDENCE SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT BAO NGUYEN (TRANSACTION ID # 100028805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

Plaintiffs Sur-Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Terminating S

SUR-REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS AND EVIDENCE SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT BAO NGUYEN (TRANSACTION ID # 100028805) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

188 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : X4417714M004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1417705M004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5217703M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1417620M003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1417620M002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • DocketPayment : WRIT ISSUED; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1717524W005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPayment : WRIT ISSUED; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R4917518W018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketPayment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W6617317R003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W6617317M002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0217301M022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
305 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-21-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) TEVIN HO; OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE APR-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA SERVED JAN-09-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-29-2013 AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA SERVED JAN-09-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE JAN-29-2013 AS TO DEFENDANT NGUYEN, BAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY NAZARIAN, MORRIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NGUYEN, BAO HO, TEVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER SERVED NOV-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WALKER, JENNIFER AS TO DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION NGUYEN, BAO HO, TEVIN DOES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-07-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-26-2013 (Fee:$450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:AUG-07-2017 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions,Or Evidence Sanctions; Or In The Alternative To Compel Defendant Bao Nguyen To Provide Responses To Plaintiffs Second And Third Set Of Request For Documents And Monetary Sanction
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, August 7, 2017, Line 1, PLAINTIFF JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA WALKER Motion For Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions,Or Evidence Sanctions; Or In The Alternative To Compel Defendant Bao Nguyen To Provide Responses To Plaintiffs Second And Third Set Of Request For Documents And Monetary Sanction. (Part 1 of 2). Pro Tem Judge James Fleming, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Plaintiffs move to compel answers to their second and third requests for production and for sanctions. The answers were due on July 10 and 12, 2017. The motion to compel was filed on July 14, 2017, without the required declaration of "facts showing a reasonable and good faith attempt at an informal resolution of each issue presented by the motion". Code of Civil Procedure Sections 2031.310(b)(2) and 2016.040. Under such circumstances, "the court shall impose a monetary sanction ordering that any party or attorney who fails to confer as required pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct." Code of Civil Procedure Section 2023.020. In addition, plaintiffs' motion was filed and noticed for hearing at times when plaintiffs' counsel knew that counsel for responding party would be out of the country and unavailable. On an appropriate motion, this conduct is separately sanctionable under Code of Civil Procedure Section 128.5. Tenderloin Housing Clinic, Inc. v. Sparks, 8 Cal. App. 4th 302 (1992). No such motion has been presented here.Moving parties' conduct also amounts to a misuse of the discovery process under Code of Civil Procedure Section 2023.010(c) and (i). On an appropriate motion, sanctions for such conduct may be imposed under Code of Civil Procedure Section 2023.030. Again, no such motion has been presented here. (Continued to Part 2) =(302/JPT/HK)


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:JUL-12-2017 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendant Bao Nguyen To Provide Further Responses To Plaintiffs First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents, For Award Of Terminating Sanctions And Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, July 12, 2017, Line 1, PLAINTIFF JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA WALKER Motion To Compel Defendant Bao Nguyen To Provide Further Responses To Plaintiffs First Set Of Requests For Production Of Documents, For Award Of Terminating Sanctions And Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant.Pro Tem Judge Peter Catalanotti, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories is GRANTED. On November 8, 2016, the Court entered an order granting plaintiff's Motion to Compel, ordering Defendant Nguyen to serve responses to Plaintiffs' Form and Special Interrogatories, Set One, within 14 days and to provide responsive documents by December 1, 2016. Defendant failed to comply with the November 8, 2016 order. Nazarian Decl., par. 9. On January 20, 2017, the Court entered an order requiring Defendant to serve verified code-compliant non-evasive responses by February 2, 2017. On February 2, 2017, Defendant Nguyen served responses (Nazarian Decl., Ex. D). On February 3 and 13, 2017, Plaintiffs' counsel sent two meet and confer efforts regarding the responses. Nazarian Decl., par. 16. The Court finds the responses in the separate statement are not code-compliant. The Court finds that Defendant's counsel failed to meet and confer with plaintiff's counsel on the responses. Defendant is hereby ordered to serve code-complaint, verified responses to the interrogatories listed in the separate statement, within two weeks of notice of entry of this order. Sanctions in the amount of $1,000 are awarded against Defendant Nguyen and in favor of plaintiffs to be paid within two weeks of notice of entry of this order. Plaintiffs' counsel shall serve this order via express mail on all parties.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to pcatalanotti@fmglaw.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT/SB)


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:FEB-06-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order To Strike Defendant Bao Nguyen'S Answer And Enter A Default Judgment Against Defendant; Order For Evidentiary Sanctions; And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Bao Nguyen In The Amount Of $7,290.00
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON MONDAY, February 6, 2017, LINE 11PLAINTIFFS JENNIFER WALKER and ANDREA WALKER'S Motion For Order To Strike Defendant Bao Nguyen'S Answer And Enter A Default Judgment Against Defendant; Order For Evidentiary Sanctions; And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Bao Nguyen In The Amount Of $7,290.00Hearing required unless counsel for the Walkers agree that defendant Bao Nguyen has paid the sanctions award of $1633 and served verified code-compliant non-evasive responses without any objections except objections based on privilege to all of the discovery referenced in the November 1, 2016 order. If counsel for the Walkers so agree, then he should send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties so stating and the motion will be taken off calendar. =302/HK


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:JAN-26-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order To Strike Defendant Bao Nguyen'S Answer And Enter A Default Judgment Against Defendant; Order For Evidentiary Sanctions; And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Bao Nguyen In The Amount Of $7,290.00
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, January 26, 2017, Line 5, PLAINTIFF JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA WALKER Motion For Order To Strike Defendant Bao Nguyen'S Answer And Enter A Default Judgment Against Defendant; Order For Evidentiary Sanctions; And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Bao Nguyen In The Amount Of $7,290.00.The hearing on the motion of plaintiffs Jennifer Walker and Andrea Walker to enter default judgment and for evidence and monetary sanctions is continued on the court's own motion to February 6, 2017. No later than February 2, 2017 defendant Bao Nguyen must: 1) serve verified code-compliant non-evasive responses without any objections except objections based on privilege to all of the discovery referenced in the November 1, 2016 order, 2) pay the sanctions award of $1633, and 3) agree to a continuance of the trial of any length not to exceed six months requested by the Walkers with discovery deadlines to be triggered off the new trial date if requested by the Walkers. If Mr. Nguyen fails to comply with all three requirements, then his answer will be stricken and plaintiffs may request a prove-up to obtain a default judgment. If, however, Mr. Nguyen complies with all three requirements, then the portions of the motion seeking to strike Mr. Nguyen's answer and evidence sanctions will be denied and the Walkers will be awarded further monetary sanctions of $3000 to be paid no later than February 28, 2017 to compensate the Walkers for their filing of this motion. While there is some basis to believe that all of the factual assertions in Mr. Nguyen's opposition papers are not entirely accurate, if Mr. Nguyen complies with three requirements there is no basis to strike his answer or impose evidentiary sanctions against him. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for the Walkers is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring them to the hearing or email them to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:JAN-12-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order To Strike Defendant Bao Nguyen'S Answer And Enter A Default Judgment Against Defendant; Order For Evidentiary Sanctions; And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Bao Nguyen In The Amount Of $7,290.00
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, January 12, 2017, Line 4, PLAINTIFF JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA WALKER Motion For Order To Strike Defendant Bao Nguyen's Answer And Enter A Default Judgment Against Defendant; Order For Evidentiary Sanctions; And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Defendant Bao Nguyen In The Amount Of $7,290.00.Plaintiffs Jennifer and Andrea Walker's motion to strike defendant Bao Nguyen's answer and enter default is granted and their request for monetary sanctions is denied. No opposition filed. Bao Nguyen's answer is stricken due to his failure to comply with discovery orders and no lesser sanction being sufficient to remedy the prejudice caused to plaintiffs. Plaintiffs will need to prove their damages at a default prove-up hearing. Plaintiffs' request for monetary sanctions is both excessive in amount and not appropriate since they have obtained relief on this motion that they could not have received by an action of Bao Nguyen. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling adversely affects, in whole or in part, any party who is not represented by an attorney, then any other party (whether represented by an attorney or not) may submit on the tentative ruling without appearing for the hearing only if the adversely affected self-represented party has stated in writing or orally that he or she will not appear at the hearing. Counsel for plaintiffs is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portions of the tentative ruling and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:OCT-31-2016 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Compel Responses To Plaintiffs Request For Production Of Documents
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON MONDAY, OCTOBER 31, 2016, LINE 1PLAINTIFFS JENNIFER WALKER and ANDREA WALKER'S Motion To Compel Responses To Plaintiffs Request For Production Of DocumentsPro Tem Judge Diana Kruze, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:No opposition filed. Plaintiffs Andrea Walker and Jennifer Walker's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiffs' Request For Production of Documents And For An Award Of Monetary Sanctions is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. The Court orders Defendants to provide complete responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents (set one) within 14 days of notice of the Court's written order. The Court further orders Defendants to produce responsive documents thereto no later than December 1, 2016. Defendants must also pay sanctions to Plaintiffs in the amount of $735.00 no later than December 1, 2016. Plaintiffs' request for additional sanctions for drafting a reply brief and appearing at a hearing is DENIED, as Plaintiffs have not incurred such costs. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to DKruze@mofo.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order. =302/JPT


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:AUG-31-2016 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Plaitiff'S Special Interrogatories (Set One); Form Interrogatories-Employment (Set One); Form Interrogatories-General (Set One); And For Award Of Monetary Sanctions In The Amount Of $3,885.00
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Wednesday, August 31, 2016, Line 1, PLAINTIFF JENNIFER WALKER, ANDREA WALKER Motion To Compel Responses To Plaitiff's Special Interrogatories (Set One); Form Interrogatories-Employment (Set One); Form Interrogatories-General (Set One); And For Award Of Monetary Sanctions In The Amount Of $3,885.00.Pro Tem Judge Peter Catalanotti, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: The Motion is DENIED without prejudice. No Memorandum of Points and Authorities and no evidence was filed and no courtesy copy of these documents was received by the Court. For each of the three Motions, only a three page Notice of Motion was Filed with the Court, per the online ROA.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to pcc@manningllp.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT/HK)


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:MAY-24-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Strike Answer Of Defendant Hand Job, L.L.C.
Rulings:SET FOR HEARING ON TUESDAY, MAY 24, 2016, LINE 4PLAINTIFFS JENNIFER WALKER and ANDREA WALKER Motion To Strike Answer Of Defendant Hand Job, L.L.C.Granted. No opposition filed and good cause shown. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for plaintiffs is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/HK


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:MAR-15-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, March 15, 2016, Line 10, DEFENDANTS HAND JOB, LLC. and BAO NGUYEN's MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORDHearing required. =302/HK


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:FEB-02-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment And Leave To Defend Action
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, February 2, 2016, Line 2, DEFENDANT HAND JOB, LLC, BAO NGUYEN Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment And Leave To Defend Action.Defendants' motion to set aside default and default judgment is granted. Defendants have shown that the default and default judgment were taken against them as a result of extrinsic mistake. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:JAN-20-2016 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment And Leave To Defend Action
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, January 20, 2016, Line 4, DEFENDANTS HAND JOB, LLC AND BAO NGUYEN'S Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment And Leave To Defend ActionContinued to February 2, 2016, to give all parties an opportunity to comply with San Francisco Local Rule 2.7B. The Plaintiff and Defendant must deliver courtesy copies of the moving and opposition papers to department 302 with a cover letter reflecting the new hearing date, no later than January 20, 2016, at 4:00 pm. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. =302/EG


Case Number:*******5970
Case Title:JENNIFER WALKER VS. HAND JOB, LLC et al
Court Date:JUL-01-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint;
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, July 1, 2013, Line 13,PLAINTIFFs JENNIFER WALKER & ANDREA WALKER's Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint.Grant, no opposition filed. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/RAK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Charles G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN, DAVID W.