This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:26 (UTC).

JEFFREY A. JOHNSON VS. ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 JEFFREY A JOHNSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8423

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, JEFFREY A.

Defendants

ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC

OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT

OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC.

DOES 1 TO 100, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLIVERI, MATTHEW M

696 San Ramon Valley Blvd #342

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant Attorneys

MCINERNEY THOMAS M

LEVINE, ELIZABETH K.

DAVIS, JOSHUA M.

MCINERNEY, THOMAS M

Attorney at OGLETREE, DEAKINS, NASH, SMOAK & STEWART, P.C.STEUART TOWER, STE 1300

One Market Plaza

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING THE DATE FOR HEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF TRIAL (CONTINUED FROM MAY-2 TO MAY-5-2014)

ORDER

ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, JEFFREY A. TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC COSTS IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT ACCORDING TO PROOF. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON SEP-15-2014. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON DEC-17-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS, INC. AND OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON 5/14/14. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER (STIPULATED) FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (AMENDED) FILED BY DEFT'S

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-17-2014 CONTINUED TO JAN-28-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR OLD MUTUAL DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, JEFFREY A. SERVED FEB-04-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-15-2013 ON DEFENDANT OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC.

DEMURRER

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT HEARING SET FOR APR-12-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY JOSHUA M. DAVIS FILED BY COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOV-13-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE OCT-08-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF SHALL TAKE NOTHING BY WAY OF HIS COMPLAINT. (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-28-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY ELIZABETH K. LEVINE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-24-2015

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2015
  • ATTORNEY ELIZABETH K. LEVINE INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. (MAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • ATTORNEY JOSHUA M. DAVIS INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. (MAS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY ELIZABETH K. LEVINE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-24-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JOSHUA M. DAVIS TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-24-2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-28-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, PLAINTIFF JEFFREY JOHNSON'S MOTION TO TAX AND/OR STRIKE DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IS OFF CALENDAR. THE MOVING PARTY FAILED TO PROVIDE A COURTESY COPY OF THE MOTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH SAN FRANCISCO LOCAL RULE 2.6B OR A PROOF OF SERVICE. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED. (302/EHG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-05-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-17-2014 CONTINUED TO JAN-28-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR OLD MUTUAL DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE VIA MAIL FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (AMENDED) FILED BY DEFT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR APR-19-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC, OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC., OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IS CONTINUED TO APRIL 19, 2013 PER AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT HEARING SET FOR APR-12-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT ALSO SERVED ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT; BLANK CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, JEFFREY A. SERVED FEB-04-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-25-2013 ON DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, JEFFREY A. SERVED FEB-04-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-15-2013 ON DEFENDANT OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, JEFFREY A. SERVED FEB-04-2013, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE FEB-15-2013 ON DEFENDANT OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, JEFFREY A. AS TO DEFENDANT ASHFIELD CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC OLD MUTUAL HOLDINGS INC. OLD MUTUAL ASSET MANAGEMENT DOES 1 TO 100, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less