This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:50:34 (UTC).

JEAN YUEN et al VS. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2007 JEAN YUEN filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W CHESTERTON COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4281

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

TRIPLE A MACHINE SHOP, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

YARWAY CORPORATION

VIACOM, INCORPORATION AS SBM TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC COMPANY

GRINNELL LLC

EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

UNIROYAL, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC.

LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

ELLIOTT COMPANY, FORMERLY KNOWN AS "ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC."

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SII TO SACOMO SIERRA AND SACOMO MANUFACTURING COMPANY

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAISER, JEFFREY A

Attorney at KAISER GORNICK LLP

100 First St., 25Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

SLOAN, THOMAS HARLAN

Attorney at KRIEG, KELLER, SLOAN, REILLEY & ROMAN LLP

114 Sansome Street, 4Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI, TADLOCK, KEENEY & CORDERY, LLP

100 Bush Street, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

PFALZER, THOMAS E

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

MURRAY, JAMES G.

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

VASQUEZ, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Ste. 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

SHAFFERY, JOHN

Poole & Shaffery, Llp, 445 South Figueroa St. #2520

Los Angeles, CA 90071

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Dam

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15592003) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Crane Co.s Demand for Jury Trial

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15891699) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

ELLIOTT COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16001852) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY, FORMERLY KNOWN AS "ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC." (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CLEAVER BROOKS, A DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC. ONLY WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24999680) AS TO DEFENDANT CLEAVER BROOKS, A DIVISION OF AQUA-CHEM, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORP. ONLY WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24999845) AS TO DEFENDANT FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL, INC. ONLY WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25000061) AS TO DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION ONLY WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS, FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 25000303) AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO ALLIS CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29372950) AS TO DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29372950) AS TO DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Def. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Wrongful Death-Asbestos.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15729624) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15882337) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. ONLY WITH A MUTUAL WAIVER OF COSTS.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24999086) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD INC.

Substitution of Attorney - Civil (Without Court Order)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 25949701): HUGO, EDWARD R SUBSTITUTED FOR PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J. AS ATTORNEY FOR LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28409841) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SII TO SACOMO SIERRA AND SACOMO MANUFACTURING COMPANY ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29372950) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SII TO SACOMO SIERRA AND SACOMO MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Plaintiffs Request for Dismissal without Prejudice of defendant Crown, Cork & Seal, Individually and as successor-in-interest to Mundet Cork with a Mutual of Waiver of Costs

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38441257) AS TO DEFENDANT CORWN, CORK & SEAL, IND AND AS SII TO MUNDET CORK

Plaintiffs Request for Dismissal without Prejudice of defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company with a Mutual of Waiver of Costs

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38441257) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

111 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2013
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2013. DISMISSAL FILED 2/27/13. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49826639)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-28-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 ON THE COURT'S OWN. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-27-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-28-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, SCOTT HAMES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-31-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-27-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, T. SCOTT HAMES. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS, (TRANSACTION ID # 42676718): KAISER, JEFFREY A, SIMES LAUREL L ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR YUEN, JEAN , INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE YUEN, DECEDENT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-26-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-31-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-26-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-25-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011 AT 9:45 AM IN DEPT. 220 ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38441257) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF. BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.S OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER. (TRANSACTION ID # 15729624) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15729624) FILED BY DEFENDANT BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15706345) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15645792) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOCO WEST, INC. FKA BRENNTAG WEST, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15599037) FILED BY DEFENDANT M. SLAYEN AND ASSOCIATES, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15592003) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARDNER DENVER, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15578376) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUEN, JEAN , INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE YUEN, DECEDENT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUEN, JEAN , INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THE ESTATE OF GEORGE YUEN, DECEDENT DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 300, INCLUSIVE ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-18-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LESLIE CONTROLS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FAIRBANKS MORSE PUMP CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where YARWAY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CUTLER-HAMMER is a litigant