This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 17:54:31 (UTC).

JANE DOE VS. EDWARD OOLSHANETSKY et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2012 JANE DOE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against EDWARD OOLSHANETSKY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1308

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DOE, JANE

Defendants

BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT

DOES 1 TO 50

OOLSHANETSKY, EDWARD

OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD

BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM")

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KNISBACHER ALDEN J

KNISBACHER, ALDEN J

Attorney at KNISBACHER LAW OFFICES

1736 Franklin Street, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

BARNHOLTZ, BRAD C.

Attorney at BARNHOLTZ & KUGLER

27240 Turnberry Lane Ste 200

Valencia, CA 91355

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE AS TO DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT DOES 1 TO 50

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR NOV-19-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-28-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE SERVED DEC-17-2013, MAIL ON DEFENDANT BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ADR PACKAGE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, AND RESPONSE ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE SERVED MAY-08-2014, MAIL ON DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55531778) FILED BY DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM") HEARING SET FOR JUL-07-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:900.00)

DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55531778) FILED BY DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM")

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-29-2014 CONTINUED TO DEC-24-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-17-2015 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE FEB-04-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST ALDEN J KNISBACHER, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JAN-29-2013, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE FEB-13-2013. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-26-2013 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-13-2014 CONTINUED TO JUL-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE MAY-13-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO UNVERIFIED FIRT AMENDED COMPLAINT [with attached Exhibit A]

DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO UNVERIFIED FIRT AMENDED COMPLAINT [WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT A] (TRANSACTION ID # 55531778) FILED BY DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM")

DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55532219) FILED BY DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM")

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-27-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE JUL-15-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DEMURRER TO, AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF, PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike the Entirety of Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE THE ENTIRETY OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56072674) FILED BY DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM") HEARING SET FOR NOV-07-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAR-17-2015 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15034294)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-17-2015 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE FEB-04-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-24-2014 CONTINUED TO FEB-04-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) AS TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEMAND FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-07-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, DEFENDANTS EDWARD OLSHANETSKY AND BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE THE ENTIRETY OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISS ACTION IS DENIED. ORDER SIGNED. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE RULING.) JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH; CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT; REPORTER: SHERYL L. SAWYER, CSR # 5976 (302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEMAND FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-29-2014 CONTINUED TO DEC-24-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56072674) FILED BY DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "BIM")

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAR-26-2013 CONTINUED TO MAY-14-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-26-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • SANCTION PAYMENT DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE (Fee:350.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-29-2013 CONTINUED TO MAR-26-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST ALDEN J KNISBACHER, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JAN-29-2013, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE FEB-13-2013. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-29-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-29-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE DEC-12-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-31-2012 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOE, JANE AS TO DEFENDANT OLSHANETSKY, EDWARD BUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT DOES 1 TO 50 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-31-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON OCT-16-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

1 [Brad C. Barnholtz, Esq. (SBN 182093)

IBARNHOLTZ & KUGLER

2 27240 Tumberry Ln., Ste. 200 ELECTRONICALLY Valencia, CA 91355 FILED

3 |[Telephone (661) 799-9140 Superior C forni IFacsimile (661) 799-9160 County of San Francisco. 4 |brad@barnholtz-kugler.com SEP 23 2014

|Attorneys for Defendants EDWARD OLSHANETSKY and Clerk of the Court

IBUSINESS INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT, INC. BY ROMY RIS, | eputy Clerk

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA IN AND FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO 10 |

11 JANE DOE, % Case No. CGC-12-521308 12 | Plaintiff, ) DEFENDANTS’ NOTICE OF MOTION AND

| ) MOTION TO STRIKE THE ENTIRETY OF

130 v 3 PLAINTIFF’S SECOND AMENDED | i COMPLAINT AND DISMISS ACTION 14

BUSINESS INVESTMENT

MANAGEMENT, INC.