This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 09:10:49 (UTC).

JAMES ZBORALSKE VS. ALEX KULIKOV et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2013 JAMES ZBORALSKE filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALEX KULIKOV. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3318

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

ZBORALSKE, JAMES

Appellants and Defendants

DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC

KULIKOV, ALEX

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Appellants

ZBORALSKE, JAMES

KULIKOV, ALEX

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

COURT JUDGMENT SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT KULIKOV, ALEX DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT ZBORALSKE, JAMES $75.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $75.00, JUDGMENT IS IN FAVOR OF APPELLANT, ALEX KULIKOV,ETAL AND AGAINST RESPONDENT, JAMES ZBORALSKE.TOTAL JUDGMENT$75.00. THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS FINAL AND REPLACES THE SMALL CLIAMS JUDGMENT OF APRIL 29, 2013. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER

STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY KULIKOV, ALEX ZBORALSKE, JAMES KULIKOV, ALEX

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PROCUTCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AT TRIAL OR HEARING AND DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT ZBORALSKE, JAMES

Notice of Time and Place of Hearing on Appeal

SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525

Transmittal Receipt

TRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (RECEIVED NO EXHIBITS FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

Transfer of Record Notice

CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT

NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KULIKOV, ALEX MAILED TO RESPONDENT ZBORALSKE, JAMES (Fee:75.00)

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ZBORALSKE, JAMES RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT KULIKOV, ALEX DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC $7,289.32 PRINCIPAL, $186.78 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,476.10, DEFENDANTS SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF: CONCURRENTLY WITH PAYMENT OF THIS JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF SHALL RETURN TO DEFENDANT AT HIS REQUEST ALL OF THE MATERIALS USED TO FABRICATE THE CUSTOM CABINETS AND DRAWERS THAT ARE SUBJECT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED (SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORIGINAL SUBPOENA)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $55.89) SERVED MAR-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $55.89) SERVED MAR-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KULIKOV, ALEX

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $7,289.32 FILED BY ZBORALSKE, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT KULIKOV, ALEX DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-29-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2013
  • DocketRECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT APPELLANT KULIKOV, ALEX DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT ZBORALSKE, JAMES $75.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $75.00, JUDGMENT IS IN FAVOR OF APPELLANT, ALEX KULIKOV,ETAL AND AGAINST RESPONDENT, JAMES ZBORALSKE.TOTAL JUDGMENT$75.00. THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IS FINAL AND REPLACES THE SMALL CLIAMS JUDGMENT OF APRIL 29, 2013. NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF JUN-05-2013 - SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT REVERSED. JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID FLEISIG, CLERK J. KONG, NOT REPORTED, D525.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY KULIKOV, ALEX ZBORALSKE, JAMES KULIKOV, ALEX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR JUN-05-2013 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF CIVIL SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PROCUTCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AT TRIAL OR HEARING AND DECLARATION FILED BY RESPONDENT ZBORALSKE, JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE HEARING SET FOR JUN-05-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 525

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSMITTAL RECEIPT FILED (RECEIVED NO EXHIBITS FROM SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD TRANSFERRED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KULIKOV, ALEX MAILED TO RESPONDENT ZBORALSKE, JAMES (Fee:75.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ZBORALSKE, JAMES RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT KULIKOV, ALEX DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC $7,289.32 PRINCIPAL, $186.78 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $7,476.10, DEFENDANTS SHALL PAY PLAINTIFF: CONCURRENTLY WITH PAYMENT OF THIS JUDGMENT. PLAINTIFF SHALL RETURN TO DEFENDANT AT HIS REQUEST ALL OF THE MATERIALS USED TO FABRICATE THE CUSTOM CABINETS AND DRAWERS THAT ARE SUBJECT OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-29-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-29-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-29-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL.APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED (SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORIGINAL SUBPOENA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $55.89) SERVED MAR-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $55.89) SERVED MAR-11-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT KULIKOV, ALEX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • DocketSUBPOENA DUCES TECUM ISSUED TO SERGIO LOPEZ-36704 BURDICK ST. NEWARK CA 94560

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $7,289.32 FILED BY ZBORALSKE, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT KULIKOV, ALEX DOMUS DESIGN GROUP LLC ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-29-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less