This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 05:12:29 (UTC).

JAMES WILLS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2009 JAMES WILLS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5308

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

LEAR SIEGLER DIVIERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

STUART-WESTERN, INC.

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC

DOES 1-8500

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION

SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY

BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD.

BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorney

MCCARTHY, KENNETH JAMES

Other Attorneys

POND, FRANK D

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to defendant CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, fka Viacom Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation only. Each party to bear its own

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43310796) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42653488)

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40008772) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT - MULTIPLE PARTIES

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32470918) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYG ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD. BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION) DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY FORD MOTOR COMPANY FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC GATKE CORPORATION GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. L.J. MILEY COMPANY LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS LEAR SIEGLER DIVIERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP. MAREMONT CORPORATION MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PNEUMO ABEX LLC RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. STANDCO, INC. STUART-WESTERN, INC. THE BUDD COMPANY U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES INC. UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY HOTSHOT BOILER COMPANY LENED CORPORATION

ANSWER OF ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST TO COMPLAINT FOR FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27744929) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:370.00)

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL, WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY?S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27476796) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL - WRONGFUL DEATH ? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27476796) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

DECLARATION OF JAMES WILLS UNDER CCP 377.32

DECLARATION OF JAMES WILLS UNDER CCP 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 26895929) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010 (Fee:370.00)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 43310796) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2012
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-23-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. DISMISSAL OF ACTION IS PENDING IN LEXISNEXIS. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42653488)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-26-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-23-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PENDING DISMISSAL TO BE ENTERED. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40008772) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-28-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-26-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR SET FOR 7/28/11 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR FILING OF A DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketREFERRED TO ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT MANAGER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • DocketJURY FEES, TRAN # W1611322J033, TAG # 028150 DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED (Fee:150.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27598576) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27476796) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27476796) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JAMES WILLS UNDER CCP 377.32 (TRANSACTION ID # 26895929) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLS, JAMES ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO FREDDIE WILLS, SR. DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less