This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 16:19:49 (UTC).

JAMES VARGA VS. TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 JAMES VARGA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN, CURTIS KARNOW, GARRETT L. WONG and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4337

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

CURTIS KARNOW

GARRETT L. WONG

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

VARGA, JAMES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

QUINLAN, LISA H

Attorney at THE QUINLAN LAW FIRM LLC

233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

MURPHY, JAMES ANTHONY

Attorney at MURPHY PEARSON BRADLEY & FEENEY

88 Kearny Street, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941085530

SULLIVAN, KENNETH M

Attorney at THE QUINLAN LAW FIRM, LLC

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2210

Chicago, IL 60606

SCHMITT, ERIC T.

Attorney at THE QUINLAN LAW FIRM, LLC

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2210

Chicago, IL 60606

MAY, MATTHEW M.

Attorney at THE QUINLAN LAW FIRM, LLC

233 S. Wacker Drive,, Suite 2210

Chicago, IL 60606

QUINLAN, WILLIAM J.

Attorney at THE QUINLAN LAW FIRM, LLC

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2210

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GORTON, KELLY M

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94111

ROSENFELD, JAMES

Attorney at DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE, LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 21St Floor

New York, NY 100201104

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.S REQUEST REGARDING OPPOSITI

CROSS-COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.S REQUEST REGARDING OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT JAMES VARGAS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63023964) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFEND

OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT JAMES VARGAS DEMURRER TO THE SECOND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63001719) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAI

REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 62768033) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES

CROSS-DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE REQUE

REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FROM CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100043025) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES

Cross-Defendants Notice of Hearing on Demurrer and Demurrer to Second

DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62954045) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT VARGA, JAMES HEARING SET FOR MAR-08-2019 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 304

Declaration of Kelly M. Gorton in support of Opposition to James Varga

DECLARATION OF KELLY M. GORTON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO JAMES VARGA DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62743892) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFEND

OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT JAMES VARGA'S DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 62249025) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

Cross-Complainant Twitch Interactive, Incs Opposition to James Varga D

OPPOSITION TO JAMES VARGA DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62743892) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

CROSS-COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFEND

OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANT JAMES VARGA'S MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 62249025) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

Order Granting Complex Designation and for Single Assignment

ORDER GRANTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION AND FOR SINGLE ASSIGNMENT TO JUDGE CURTIS KARNOW FOR ALL PURPOSES. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR AUG-23-2018 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 304. SEP-12-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Pay Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fee

NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY WILLIAM J. QUINLAN TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY JUN-26-2019

ORDER

ORDER (1) SUSTAINING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND VARGA DEMURRER TO TWITCH CROSS COMPLAINT AND (2) GRANTING VARGA MOTION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES IN TWITCH CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION #62475652)

ORDER

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3 (TRANSACTION 62796338)

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY WILLIAM J. QUINLAN FILED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING (TRANSACTION #63096591)

Plaintiffs Exhibit List for Bifurcated Trial

PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST FOR BIFURCATED TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 63643285) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES

Answer to Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61983568) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

MINUTES FOR MAR-08-2019 2:00 PM

MINUTES FOR MAR-08-2019 2:00 PM

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER FOR DECEMBER 19, 2019 (TRANSACTION #64546435)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS HELD ON DEC-19-2019 MATTER IS SET FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-19-2020 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 611. JUDGE CURTIS E.A. KARNOW, CLERK DANIAL LEMIRE, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (BY STIPULATION OF PARTIES) HEARING SET FOR DEC-19-2019 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 611

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64458986) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL STATEMENT OF DECISION (LIMITATIONS OF LIABILITY CAUSE) (TRANSACTION #64411597)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER COURT PROPOSED JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION #64361427)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION (LIMITATION OF LIABILITY) (TRANSACTION ID # 64324404) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B7119A01S005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DECISION PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION (LIMITATIONS OF LIABILITY CLAUSE) (TRANSACTION #64252375)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFFS CLOSING BRIEF FOR BIFURCATED TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 64230140) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 61953055) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 61953055) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC. (Fee:$30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61953055) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC. HEARING SET FOR MAY-16-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING (TRANSACTION ID # 100035749) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5218413F014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING (TRANSACTION ID # 100035032) FILED BY DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61797148), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES SERVED FEB-21-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018214F021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VARGA, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC. AKA TWITCH. TV, INC. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.