This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 18:49:27 (UTC).

JAMES T. WEEG et al VS. WALTER GIBEAU et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2012 JAMES T WEEG filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WALTER GIBEAU. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5883

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

WEEG, JAMES T.

WEEG, JENNIFER

WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST

WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST

DOES 1 THROUGH 40

JENNIFER M. WEEG INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE TIMOTHY AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST

JAMES T. WEEG, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE TIMOTHY AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GIBEAU, WALTER

WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST

DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NICOL LISA

NICOL, LISA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LISA NICOL

44 Montgomery St, Ste 3850

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SPRAGUE, ROBERT PHILIP

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT SPRAGUE

3701 Sacramento Street, Suite 292

San Francisco, CA 94118

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL OR SELF-REPRESENTED CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) SET FOR JUN-18-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE AS TO TRUSTEE DEFENDANT(S). NOTE: CROSS DEFENDANT(S) HAVE YET TO ANSWER IN THEIR CAPACITY AS TRUSTEES. THE MAY-15-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

RESPONSE TO OSC RE BRINGING CROSS COMPLAINT AT ISSUE FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE , SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-17-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-23-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 SERVED DEC-13-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-20-2012 ON DEFENDANT GIBEAU, WALTER

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT JAMES T. WEEG, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE TIMOTHY AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 JENNIFER M. WEEG INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE TIMOTHY AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF SPRAGUE, ROBERT PHILIP ON JUL-05-2013 THROUGH JUL-21-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT GIBEAU, WALTER WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-24-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-24-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR DEC-24-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE OCT-23-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU'S MOTION OF DEFENDANT FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE THE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. CCP 366.3 APPLIES TO PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM/ACTION WHICH ARISES OUT OF DECEDENT'S ORAL PROMISE TO MAKE A TESTAMENTARY DISTRIBUTION FROM HIS ESTATE. PLAINTIFFS FAILED TO BRING THEIR CLAIM WITHIN ONE YEAR OF DEATH. JUDGE: HARRY M. DORFMAN, CLERK: MARS GOODMAN, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-09-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-17-2013 CONTINUED TO OCT-23-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-03-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-10-2013 CONTINUED TO MAY-15-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: NICOL, LISA SUBSTITUTED FOR NICOL, LISA AS ATTORNEY FOR WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: NICOL, LISA SUBSTITUTED FOR NICOL, LISA AS ATTORNEY FOR WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 3.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT JAMES T. WEEG, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE TIMOTHY AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 JENNIFER M. WEEG INDIVIDUALLY AND AS CO TRUSTEE OF THE TIMOTHY AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 DOES 1 THROUGH 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALTER GIBEAU, EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALBERT V. GIBEAU, DICEASED, AND WALTER GIBEAU SUCCESSOR OF THE ALBERT V. GIBEAU REVOCABLE TRUST (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 SERVED DEC-13-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-20-2012 ON DEFENDANT GIBEAU, WALTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WEEG, JAMES T. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 WEEG, JENNIFER M. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEES OF THE JAMES TIMOTHY WEEG AND JENNIFER M. WEEG 1992 FAMILY TRUST DATED DECEMBER 16, 1992 AS TO DEFENDANT GIBEAU, WALTER DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-10-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-07-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-26-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less