This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:42:33 (UTC).

JAMES SOBBA VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2007 JAMES SOBBA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4066

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

DANA CORPORATION (NOW KNOWN AS DANA COMPANIES, LLC)

SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

ADVOCATE MINES LTD.

GRINNELL LLC

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

NISSAN TECHNICAL CTR NORTH AMERICA,INC.

CHRYSLER LLC FKA DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY LLC

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

TERRY CORPORATION OF CONNECTICUT

DOES 1-8500

SCHLAGE LOCK COMPANY

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

C AND H MOTOR PARTS, INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS , B, B-1, C, H, I

49 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison St, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

LEE, BARRY WILLIAM

Attorney at STEEFEL, LEVITT & WEISS

1 Embarcadero Center, 30Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St. - Ste. 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KELLEY, SHEILA D

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO, LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor, P. O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

15 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOBBA, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS , B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Lamons Gasket Companys Demand for Jury Trial

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14512648) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

Defendant Grinnell LLCs Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14662697) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14699491) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORP. (Fee:335.00)

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND AS TO DEFENDANT C AND H MOTOR PARTS, INC. (NO S.A.S.E., NO COPY PROVIDED) DEFAULT OF JUL-03-2007 SET ASIDE

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16585487) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Objection to Discovery Commissioner

OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 16618496) FILED BY DEFENDANT C AND H MOTOR PARTS, INC.

Defendant Peerless Industries, Inc.???s Declination Of Stipulation For Commissioner At Trial

DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.'S DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 18307709) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEERLESS HEATER COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO POWER BOILER SALES, INC., ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18800601) AS TO DEFENDANT POWER BOILERS SALES, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION ON FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLTF JAMES SOBBA (TRANSACTION ID # 20130077) FILED BY DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE #13

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE L. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE L. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 22644490) FILED BY DEFENDANT SPECIAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE #13

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 22958759) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO SUBMIT THE ATTACHED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE TO THE JURY VENIRE BEFORE VOIR DIRE

MOTION IN LIMINE # 6: TO SUBMIT THE ATTACHED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE TO THE JURY VENIRE BEFORE VOIR DIRE (TRANSACTION ID # 23814536) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC

DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE #10 REGARDING EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE

MOTION IN LIMINE # 10: REGARDING EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 23814536) FILED BY DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27955102) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

Request For Dismissal, on behalf of Viacom, Inc., et al., only.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 30660523) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM, INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to Goulds Pumps, Inc. only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34271142) AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO AUG-08-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOBBA, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40047120) AS TO DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 36772191) FILED BY DEFENDANT MOORE BROS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36680174) AS TO DEFENDANT MOORE BROS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-09-2011 CONTINUED TO APR-13-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 220 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-26-2011 CONTINUED TO FEB-09-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 220, PER THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-16-2010 TO JAN-26-2011 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 220 FOR STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER DIANA L. GONZALEZ, CSR #7935, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL, BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34271142) AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • SEPT. 29, 2010 ENTRY FOR ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LTD'S ANSWERS IN ALL ACTIVE BRAYTON PURCELL CASES, SEVERING THE CASES AND FORMING AN ADVOCATE MINES LTD. GROUP FOR A DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - APPLIES TO ALL THE CASES LISTED ON ATTACHED EXHIBIT A OF EACH DOCUMENT. (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LTD'S ANSWERS IN ALL ACTIVE BRAYTON PURCELL CASES, SEVERING THE CASES AND FORMING AN ADVOCATE MINES LTD. GROUP FOR A DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
242 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14570458) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 14512648) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14512648) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14512648) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14512648) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14504354) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE C AND H MOTOR PARTS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14496696) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOBBA, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SOBBA, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS , B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less