This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/23/2022 at 08:01:25 (UTC).

JAMES S. NELSON VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2009 JAMES S NELSON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, JOHN K. STEWART, HAROLD E. KAHN and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5320

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

JOHN K. STEWART

HAROLD E. KAHN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NELSON, JAMES S.

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 8500

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC,, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. AS SII TO C.F. BRAUN, INC.

U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY

3M COMPANY

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.

LEAR SIEGLER DIVIERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION

38 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorneys

POND, FRANK D

SHELDON, CHARLES T

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

DUFFY, JOSEPH

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Other Attorneys

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

LOVE, MARK A

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 28014816) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC,, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Defendant 3M Companys Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 43262712) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 31779457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

General Electric Companys Answer to Complaint for Damages and Jury Demand (Asbestos)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27989772) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC?S DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 28290794) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

Request for Dismissal as to defendant ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC. only.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40715658) AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

NOTICE OF ORDERS OF REHABILITATION OF ATLANTIC MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AND STAY OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ORDERS OF REHABILITATION OF ATLANTIC MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND CENTENNIAL INSURANCE COMPANY, AND STAY OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 33791567) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

ORDER

ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40417302) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2015
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015, DISMISSAL ON FILE. ANDREW CHEW APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (877)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Jun-18-2015 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56811669) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • DocketTIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO NOV-16-2017 (TOLLED 5-YEAR DATE FOR DEFENDANT RPI COMPANY, CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NELSON, JAMES S.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-11-2014 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-18-2015 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 503. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. EVANTHIA SPANOS APPEARING FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: TARA WILLIAMS, CSR#13428 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE Off Calendar Dec-11-2014 Continued To Jun-18-15 At 01:30 P.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56392500)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • DocketREMOVED FROM DEPT 220 ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-10-2014. ASSIGNED TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IN DEPT. 503 ON DEC-11-2014 AT 1:30 PM AS TO DEFENDANT RPI ONLY. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Jul-10-2014 Case Settled - Set For Crc 3.1385 Hrg On Dec-11-14 At 01:30 P.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-05-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-10-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTY. OREN NOAH. JUDGE: TERI JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B4909B10F005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27989772) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27980738) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R0209B06F005

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27910635) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27910635) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $370; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1209827F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NELSON, JAMES S. AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDAANTS DOES 1 TO 8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less