This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:19:17 (UTC).

JAMES L COPE et al VS. ALBAY CONSTRUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2007 JAMES L COPE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALBAY CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4039

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COPE, JUANITA P

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANY

CROWN,CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

RILEY POWER, INC.

ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

MONTEREY MECHANICAL

RILEY POWER, INC., ERRONEOUSLY NAMED AS DB RILEY, INC. AND RILEY STOKER CORPORATION

REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALBAY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

PARKER HANNIFIN CORP.

HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.

THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLAPPER, JACK KENT

Attorney at CLAPPER, PATTI, SCHWEIZER & MASONMARINA OFFICE PLAZA

2330 Marinship Way, Suite 140

Sausalito, CA 94965

Defendant Attorneys

ESTRADA, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth Street, Ste. 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

MURRAY, JAMES G.

Attorney at PRINDLE DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

Other Attorneys

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market Street, 17Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94105

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

100 Pringle Ave. Ste. 750

Walnut Creek, CA 945960000

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero Center #2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BRUNI, CHRISTOPHE B.

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI,LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT TIMECS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14755454) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14803181) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.???S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14817643) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.???S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14818521) FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

Cope Fluor PLEADING Answer to Complaint Plural 05-08-07.PDF

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14871070) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Def. ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, formerly known as ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.s Ob

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 14878485) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC, FORMERLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

Proof of Service By Electronic Transmission Re: Defendant A.W. Chester

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION RE: DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - (ASBESTOS) (TRANSACTION ID # 15001261) FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

Def. DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONS Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complai

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15059858) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Thorpe Insulation Companys Answer To Plaintiffs Complaint Fo

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15485260) FILED BY DEFENDANT THORPE INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal (defendant Georgia-Pacific)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17960889) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18037511) AS TO DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Complaint - As to Defendant PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION Only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18226778) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORP.

COPE DWOP as to FLuor

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT . EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 18609540) AS TO DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION

CONTINUING EXHIBIT D OF A-G TO THE DECLARATION OF TODD M. THACKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - Cope SFSC 274039

CONTINUING EXHIBIT D OF A-G TO THE DECLARATION OF TODD M. THACKER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - COPE SFSC 274039 (TRANSACTION ID # 19857596) FILED BY DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant TIMEC only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20444471) AS TO DEFENDANT TIMEC CO., INC.

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20774254) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

Request for Dismissal as to defendant Foster Wheeler LLC only. Each party to bear its own costs.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21202795) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

Request for Dismissal, With prejudice, of Complaint, as to defendant Asbestos Corp. Ltd., only. Each party to bear its own cost.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25536050) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 26062115) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 25674935) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 25536050) AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24332493) AS TO DEFENDANT DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23441139) AS TO DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23097792) AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22673518) AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21589084) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 RE 20708 FOR TRANSACTION R0908421J048 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO CLAPPER PATTI SCHWEIZER & MASON, DOC #1901434784, WARRANT #38002332, DATED SEP-17-2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21431859) AS TO DEFENDANT DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14749271) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14699167) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORP. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14637721) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14534492) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALBAY CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14534492) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS ALBAY CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14513261) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 15 TO BE A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 16 TO BE DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14511222) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF COPE, JAMES L COPE, JUANITA P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COPE, JAMES L COPE, JUANITA P AS TO DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION INC ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD CAL-STREAM SUPPLY CROWN,CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY DOES ONE THROUGH SEVENTY-FIVE INCLUSIVE ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS-SEE ATTACHED SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-19-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less