This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:16:45 (UTC).

JAMES KNIGHT et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2007 JAMES KNIGHT filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4035

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KNIGHT, MARY

KNIGHT, JAMES

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

HOPEMAN BROS., INC.

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

SQUARE D COMPANY

COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC F/K/A COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

Other

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BERTRAND, JEAN LYNNE

One Market Spear Street Tower, Thirty-Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

Other Attorney

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

KEELE, CHRISTOPHER A.

BRYDON, JOHN R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

NELSON, EVAN CRAIG

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI,MARTINI,EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Eaton Electrical Inc.s Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbesto

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13905892) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANYS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14193805) FILED BY DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Answer of Defendant to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal In

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14240004) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. MOSES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF THOMAS J. MOSES IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20361872) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF PEGAH SHETABI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF PEGAH SHETABI IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20478947) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

DECLARATION OF JON C. JAMES IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXHIBITS A ? D ATTACHED THERETO

DECLARATION OF JON C. JAMES IN SUPPORT OF GENERAL CABLE CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH EXHIBITS A D ATTACHED THERETO (TRANSACTION ID # 20500502) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANT GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE; AND DECLARATION OF JON C. JAMES WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO; [PROPOSED] ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE RE: DEFENDANT GENERAL CABLE CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS AND EVIDENCE; AND DECLARATION OF JON C. JAMES WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED THERETO; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 20500502) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL CABLE CORPORATION

PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 21343721) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANYS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 21343721) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATION OF JOHN B. GOLDSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION; PLAINTIFFS SEPARA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; DECLARATION OF JOHN B. GOLDSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION; PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS; PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANYS SEPARAT (TRANSACTION ID # 21343721) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY LEXIS-NEXIS E-SERVICE OF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 21387184) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY

DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY?S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS? EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' EVIDENCE OFFERED IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21453829) FILED BY DEFENDANT SQUARE D COMPANY

Reply Brief in Support of Eaton Electrical Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF EATON ELECTRICAL INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21523259) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

Reply Brief in Support of Rockwell Automation, Inc.?s Motion for Summary Judgment

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 21558183) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.

DECLARATION OF SPENCER SIGMON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL, INC.?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF SPENCER SIGMON IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT EATON ELECTRICAL, INC'S MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21599507) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 22126940) FILED BY DEFENDANT COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC

Request for Dismissal of Complaint With Prejudice - As to Defendant PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION Only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22408588) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

138 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41882411) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29163681) AS TO DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2108A08J045 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1901801250, WARRANT #38002829, DATED MAR-04-2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT FILED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 23220995) AS TO DEFENDANT IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., FKA DELAVAL STEAM TURBINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22408588) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22402733) AS TO DEFENDANT COOPER INDUSTRIES, LLC F/K/A COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-31-2008 - MATTER RESOLVED PER D206 ENTRY ON 10-28-08. (D220)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-28-2008 - OFF CALENDAR. MATTER IS RESOLVED PER PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AT TRIAL CALL. JUDGE: JAMES MCBRIDE; CLERK: DONNA LOK; REPORTER: SUSAN LEE, CSR #4280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • MASTER JURY ASBESTOS CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-27-2008 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS (CONTINUED) ON OCT-28-2008 AT 9:30 AM IN 206 FOR TRIAL ASSIGNMENT. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2008
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR OCT-27-2008 HELD AND CONTINUED TO OCT-31-2008 AT 10:30 AM IN 220. (D220)

    Read MoreRead Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 13974602) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 13974602) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13974602) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • EATON ELECTRICAL INC.S OBJECTION TO JUDGE PRO TEM AND OR COMMISSIONER ASSIGNMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 13905892) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13905892) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13890040) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13860103) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KNIGHT, JAMES KNIGHT, MARY AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-20-2007 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less