This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/07/2020 at 04:05:40 (UTC).

JAMES KEARNEY VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2007 JAMES KEARNEY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR, CYNTHIA M. LEE, TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, PETER J. BUSCH, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, DAVID BALLATI, EVERETT HEWLETT, HAROLD E. KAHN, SUZANNE R. BOLANOS and STEPHEN M. MURPHY. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4055

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

PETER J. BUSCH

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

DAVID BALLATI

EVERETT HEWLETT

HAROLD E. KAHN

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

STEPHEN M. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEARNEY, JAMES

Defendants

FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.

FIRST AMERICAN OFFICE BUILDING

MIDSTATE MECHANICAL, INC.

JAMES H. PINKERTON CO.

BARNES HIND LABORATORIES, INC.

4 G PLUMBING & HEATING, INC.

PETER KIEWIT SONS, INC.

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

J.W. MCCLENAHAN COMPANY, INC.

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, 1

SUGDEN ENGINEERING CO. AND NOT THE CLAIMS STATED AGAINST ATLAS HEATING AND VENTILATING COMPANY, LTD.

SENTINAL MECHANICAL, INC.

R.F. MACDONALD CO.

THERMAL MECHANICAL, INC. (ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THERMAL MECHANICAL)

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

SERRA SHANROCK AND WENKS

DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

163 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 946103614

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

CLISHAM, SHARON L

Attorney at WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St 9Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 N Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

CORLESS, THOMAS C.

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

555 South Flower Street, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GLASPY & GLASPY, INC.

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCDANIEL, MARIETTA ELIZABETH

Attorney at SHEPPARD, MULLIN, RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941114106

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

COTTLE, SEAN ALLISTER

Attorney at HOGE, FENTON, JONES & APPEL, INC.

Sixty South Market Street, Suite 1400

San Jose, CA 951132396

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th Street #700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BISHOP, CHARLES STEWART

Attorney at CONNOR & BISHOP

44 Montgomery Street, Suite 1750

San Francisco, CA 94104

KRAUSE, NANDOR BURTON

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 945963759

BREALL, JOSEPH MICHAEL

Attorney at BREALL & BREALL, LLP

1255 Post Street, Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94109

BLUM, FRED M.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

O'HANLON, DANIEL JOSEPH

Attorney at KRONICK, MOSKOVITZ, TIEDEMANN & GIRARD

400 Capitol Mall, 27Th Flr

Sacramento, CA 95814

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 940613436

52 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Defendant Lamons Gasket Companys Demand for Jury Trial

DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 13951158) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

Answer of Defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation to Plaintiffs Complain

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14171338) FILED BY DEFENDANT LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

JOINDER BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPOR

JOINDER IN MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER BY DEFENDANTS AMCHEM PRODUCTS, INC. AND GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CO., PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15315962) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JUL-05-2007 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 612 (Fee:40.00)

Answer to Unverified First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16017649) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Notice of Motion and Motion by Joseph Bruno Sheet Metal for Expedited Summary Judgment, Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts and Supporting Memorandum

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19798172) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOSEPH BRUNO SHEET METAL CO., DBA STANDARD SHEET METAL & MARINE PLUMBING HEARING SET FOR JUL-31-2008 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:200.00)

Request for Dismissal (re: D.W. Nicholson Corporation only)

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE *PUNITIVE DAMAGES ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION (TRANSACTION ID # 27066298)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL (TRANSACTION ID # 33441701) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE JACK DYMOND COMPANY

Request for Dismissal of Cal-Air, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FALSE REPRESENTATION, STRICT LIABILITY AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES, AS TO DEFT CAL-AIR INC. ONLY (TRANSACTION ID # 37690104)

DEFENDANT MARCAL ASSOCIATES, LTD., F.K.A. MARELICH MECHANICAL?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS? EXPERTS NOT OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION, NOT DEPOSED, OR OFFERED SOLELY FOR GENERIC TESTIMONY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS NOT OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION, NOT DEPOSED, OR OFFERED SOLELY FOR GENERIC TESTIMONY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12] (TRANSACTION ID # 39469140) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARCAL ASSOCIATES, LTD.

amendment to complaint

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14514945) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOES 12 AND 1017 TO BE VALLEY SHEET METAL CO. PREVIOUSLY IDENTIFIED AS VALLEY SHEET METAL CO., A CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15629059) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEARNEY, JAMES

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANYa??S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL; WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26560956) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY, AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

Notice of Change of Firm Name

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FROM: VASQUEZ ESTRADA & DUMONT LLP, NOW TO: VASQUEZ ESTRADA & CONWAY LLP (TRANSACTION ID # 30702546) FILED BY ATTORNEY CONWAY, PATRICIA KANTOR

DEFENDANT D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS? EXPERTS NOT OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION, NOT DEPOSED, OR OFFERED SOLELY FOR GENERIC TESTIMONY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS NOT OFFERED FOR DEPOSITION, NOT DEPOSED, OR OFFERED SOLELY FOR GENERIC TESTIMONY [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12] (TRANSACTION ID # 39383996) FILED BY DEFENDANT D.W. NICHOLSON CORPORATION

DEFENDANT A&A MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING NUMBER OF DEFENSE ATTORNEYS AND DEFENSE COSTS [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING NUMBER OF DEFENSE ATTYS AND DEFENSE COSTS [MIL NO. 11] (TRANSACTION ID # 39391102) FILED BY DEFENDANT A&A MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT ADVOCATE MINES LTD'S ANSWERS IN ALL ACTIVE BRAYTON PURCELL CASES, SEVERING THE CASES AND FORMING AN ADVOCATE MINES LTD. GROUP FOR A DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

1,085 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2018
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar May-21-2018 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: LYNN O'MALLEY TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-07-2018. DISMISSAL FILED 4/13/18. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61915401)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-07-2017 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUN-07-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar Sep-07-2017 Continued To Jun-07-18 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 503; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: CYNTHIA M. LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDITIONAL PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANTS MECHANICAL ENGINEERING AND SHEET METAL COMPANY, INC., KEY AIR CONDITIONING CO., AND WEATHER SYSTEMS, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 60936181) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, JANE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES KEARNEY, DECEASED MURPHY, JANE AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES KEARNEY, DECEASED KEARNEY, MARGARET AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES KEARNEY, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANTS MECHANICAL ENGINEERING AND SHEET METAL COMPANY, INC., KEY AIR CONDITIONING CO., AND WEATHER SYSTEMS, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 60564983) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEARNEY, JAMES MURPHY, JANE AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO JAMES KEARNEY, DECEASED MURPHY, JANE AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES KEARNEY, DECEASED KEARNEY, MARGARET AS LEGAL HEIR OF JAMES KEARNEY, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTHE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: PLAINTIFFS SHALL RECOVER DAMAGES FROM DEFENDANTS MECHANICAL ENGINEERING & SHEET METAL COMPANY, INC., KEY AIR CONDITIONING CO., AND WEATHER SYSTEMS, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF: FOR JANE MURPHY $12,692.25 IN ECONOMIC DAMAGES, $250,000.00 IN NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES; FOR MARGARET KEARNEY, $200,000.00 IN NON-ECONOMIC DAMAGES, TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $462,692.25 (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketUNCONTESTED CALENDAR OF MAY-04-2017, APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS MECHANICAL ENGINEERING SHEET METAL COMPANY, INC., RICWIL PIPING SYSTEMS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, KEY AIR CONDITIONING CO., AND WEATHER SYSTEMS, INC. GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER. JUDGE: STEPHEN M. MURPHY, CLERK: A. MOK. PROCEEDINGS REPORTED BY: GISELLE CASEY CSR#8098. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR MAY-04-2017 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 514

    Read MoreRead Less
1,448 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13884989) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13814521) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOES 2 AND 1004 TO BE RAISER CONSTRUCTION CO., INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOES 3 AND 1005 TO BE HOWARD J. WHITE, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1006 TO BE GUITTARD CHOCOLATE CO. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1007 TO BE NORBEST, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13814272) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 4 AND 1008 TO BE CUPERTINO ELECTRIC, INC. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 AND 1009 TO BE JAMES H. PINKERTON CO. DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1010 TO BE B.T. AMERICAS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13814029) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 6 AND 1011 TO BE CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13735771) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1003 TO BE TYCO INTERNATIONAL (US) INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13733295) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 AND 1001 TO BE ENGSTRUM & NOURSE DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1002 TO BE UNOCAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEARNEY, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $335; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1207206F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF KEARNEY, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, 1 OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500; SEE ATTACHED LIST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less