This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/30/2016 at 20:15:01 (UTC).

JAMES GRESHAM JR VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2003 JAMES GRESHAM JR filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1547

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2003

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRESHAM JR, JAMES

Defendants and Cross Defendants

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

ASBESTOS CORPORATION, LTD.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE LLC

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS AS PRODUCTS SUCCESSORS TO EIS BRAKE PARTS

RICH-TEX, INC.

GERNAL MOTORS CORPORATION

DOES 1-8500

BOLLENBACHER & KELTON (SUED HEREIN AS DOE 5 AND 1001)

THE FLINTKOTE COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (GPC)

84 LUMBER COMPANY, A LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

LACEY AUTOMOTIVE PARTS CO.

84 LUMBER COMPANY

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

BERNARD, RANDALL K

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER LLP

525 Market St., 17Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105-2722

SINUNU, JAMES NAJEEB

HUTCHINSON, THOMAS H

Attorney at GRACE GENSON COSGROVE & SCHIRM

444 South Flower St., #1100

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2912

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second St. Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St, Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at F0LEY & MANSFIED PLLP

1333 North California Blvd.,, Suite 690

Walnut, Creek, CA 94596

CORDERY, THEODORE THOMAS

Attorney at IMAI TADLOCK KEENEY & CORDERY LLP

185 Berry Street, # 4300

San Francisco, CA 94107

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO

310 Golden Shore, Fourth Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801

GOETZ, ANDY J.

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO

310 Golden Shore,, Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-4246

JUDY, J. LAWRENCE

Attorney at FREEBURG, JUDY & NETTELS

600 South Lake Ave, Ste 500

Pasadena, CA 91106-3907

CURLIANO, JASON J

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

383 4Th Streeft, 3Rd Fl

Oakland, CA 94607

Other Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BEERS, DAVID BOOTH

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

901 New York Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

HENRY, KAREN A

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second Street #1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

KELLY, DANIEL J.

Attorney at HAIGHT,BROWN & BONESTEEL, LLP

100 Bush St. 27Th Fl.

San Francisco, CA 94104-3902

WALLACE, JOHN ROBERT

CLEMMENSEN, HEATHER D.

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119, 1901 Harrison St., 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94604

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRESHAM JR, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-17-2004 (Fee:224.50)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE JAMES HARDIE BUILDING PRODUCTS INC.,

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE FLINTKOTE COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANITE ROCK COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY,INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT,INC. (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL --ELECTRONICALLY FILED FID# 2299176-- FILED BY DEFENDANT GERNAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Fee:261.20)

STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS AND ORDER ---COMM. HEWLETT FILED BY

STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS AND ORDER ---COMM. HEWLETT FILED BY DEFENSE COUNSEL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE LLC (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC. (Fee:261.20)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC. AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I

ANSWER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT GATKE CORPORATION (Fee:261.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JAMES HARDIE BUILDING PRODUCTS INC., (Fee:261.20)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24849795) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 18235481) AS TO DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16987434) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16982219) AS TO DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16322664) AS TO DEFENDANT HAYWARD LUMBER CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • DocketREFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $107.50 FOR TRANSACTION B8806A27J044 (JURY FEES), PAYABLE TO BRAYTON, DOC #1900733976, TRUST TAG #31416, WARRANT #38001019, DATED SEP-07-2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR JUL-05-2007 - OFF CALENDAR. BRAYTON 378 & 391 (LEAD #408890, LOPEZ VS. ASBESTOS DEFTS), ALL MATTERS RESOLVED, PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS WITHDRAWN,NOT REPORTED. (DEPT 514, JUDGE THOMAS MELLON JR, CLERK BARBARA HING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • DocketTRIAL CONCLUDED IN 11 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2007
  • DocketASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-03-2007 CONTINUED TO JUL-05-2007 AT 9:00 AM IN 514 FOR TRIAL. SEE MINUTES FOR BOTH BRAYTON GROUP 378/391 UNDER LEAD CASE 408890 WILIAM LOPEZ V ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS. (D514, JUDGE THOMAS J. MELLON, JR., REORTER: R.BALIAN #5220, CLERK VICK MACK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2007
  • Docket(BRAYTON 378 CONSOL/W BRAYTON 391) ASBESTOS JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-02-2007 CONTINUED TO JUL-03-2007 AT 10:00 AM IN 514, FOR SETTLING OF JURY INSTRUCTIONS. DEFENDANT AMCORD IN CASE NO. 437438 JOHN DI BELLA (BRAYTON GROUP 378) AND CASE NO.445025 HENRY LEWIS (BRAYTON GROUP 391) HAS RESOLVED. BRAYTON GROUP 391 HAS RESOLVED IN ITS ENTIRETY. SEE MINUTES FOR BOTH BRAYTON GROUPS 378/391 UNDER LEAD CASE 408890 WILLIAM LOPEZ V. ASB DEFTS. JUDGE THOMAS J. MELLON, JR., CLERK: V. MACK, REPORTER: BOB BALIAN CSR 5220

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2003
  • DocketOBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT,INC. (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY,INC. (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2003
  • DocketDECLINATION OF STIPULATION OF COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANITE ROCK COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANITE ROCK COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE FLINTKOTE COMPANY (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:221.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE JAMES HARDIE BUILDING PRODUCTS INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF GRESHAM JR, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B*P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B,C,H,I DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-17-2004 (Fee:224.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GERNEAL MOTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RICH-TEX, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PLANT INSULATION, LLC, DBA/AKA PLANT INSULATION COMPANY, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FLINTKOTE CO THE is a litigant