This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/22/2022 at 06:47:49 (UTC).

JAMES E. OWENS VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2009 JAMES E OWENS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, SUZANNE R. BOLANOS, PANG LY, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, HAROLD E. KAHN and JAMES J. MCBRIDE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5341

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

SUZANNE R. BOLANOS

PANG LY

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

HAROLD E. KAHN

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

 

Party Details

Defendants

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

HENKEL CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS HENKEL LOCTITE CORPORATION, AND SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CERTAIN ASSETS OF THE FORMER DEXTER CORPORATION

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

LOCKHEED MARTIN CORPORATION

BUCYRUS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

LEAR SIEGLER DIVIERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY

HEXCEL CORPORATION

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

STUART-WESTERN, INC.

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

3M COMPANY

KIRTLAND ENTERPRISE GROUP, INC.

64 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

INTRIERI, MARK G

Attorney at CHAPMAN & INTRIERI, L.L.P.

2236 Mariner Square Drive, Third Floor

Alameda, CA 945011090

MARTENS, DANIEL L.

Attorney at DAL SOGLIO & MARTENS LLP

222 North Sepulveda Blvd, Suite 2000

El Segundo, CA 90245

STROTZ, PETER AUGUSTE

Attorney at KING & SPAULDING LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94105

GERAGHTY, MARK S

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

444 South Flower Street, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

ZACHER, PAUL GERHARDT

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP; ATTORNEYS AT LAW

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 949486169

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 941051126

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 W. 5Th Street #700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

351 California Street, Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

LEE, JENNIFER J.

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St

San Francisco, CA 94111

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

One Embarcadero Ctr, Ste 1800

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

ZAPALA, ALAN JOSEPH

Attorney at HERR & ZAPALA, LLP

152 N. 3Rd Street, Suite 500

San Jose, CA 95112

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 941112612

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

VACCHINA, LEONARDO J

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

RICH, ROBERT A.

Attorney at GORDON & REES, LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28363536) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:370.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT HEXCEL CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35878847) AS TO DEFENDANT HEXCEL CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42215459) AS TO DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS HENKEL LOCTITE CORPORATION, AND SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CERTAIN ASSETS OF THE FORMER DEXTER CORPORATION

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32236697) AS TO DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

Metropolitan Life Insurance Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28608637) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

Defendant Hexcel Corporation?s Answer to Complaint For Damages (Personal Injury ? Asbestos) And Request For Jury Trial

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28317332)REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HEXCEL CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44472861)

DECLARATION OF KAREN ST. ONGE IN SUPPORT OF HENKEL CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

DECLARATION OF KAREN ST. ONGE IN SUPPORT OF HENKEL CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR ITS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 37492652) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS HENKEL LOCTITE CORPORATION, AND SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CERTAIN ASSETS OF THE FORMER DEXTER CORPORATION

Notice of Change of Address and Telephone Number

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 28388162) FILED BY ATTORNEY MARTENS, DANIEL L.

Owens - The Epoxylilte Corp.s Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28236152) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE EPOXYLITE CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28334685) FILED BY DEFENDANT HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28336298) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:370.00)

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 28336298) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATIONS OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE / OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT OF A COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 32257971) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33014326) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY

PLAINTIFFa??S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GARDENA HOLDINGS, INC.a??S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT GARDENA HOLDINGS, INC.S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 37046426) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OWENS, JAMES E.

PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE DOCUMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS

OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE DOCUMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 37591647) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OWENS, JAMES E.

PLAINTIFF?S RESPONSE TO HENKEL CORPORATION?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION?S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE DOCUMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS

RESPONSE TO HENKEL CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE DOCUMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 37591647) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OWENS, JAMES E.

168 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56969645) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 46142937) AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 45594008) AS TO DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • HearingMatter(s): ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Off Calendar May-29-2012 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 503; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2012
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-31-2012. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44472861)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44007212) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SBM TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42651203) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketADDED TO CALENDAR FOR ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET FOR MAY-31-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 503

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 42215459) AS TO DEFENDANT HENKEL CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS HENKEL LOCTITE CORPORATION, AND SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CERTAIN ASSETS OF THE FORMER DEXTER CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
281 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R0209C01F010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28280771) FILED BY DEFENDANT YARWAY CORPORATION; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 28272424) FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B1009B30F032

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28236152) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE EPOXYLITE CORPORATION; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $370; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: B7409B20F010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28130324) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $370; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W3209901F004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OWENS, JAMES E. AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010; Fee: $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less