This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:12:58 (UTC).

JAMES CARGLE VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2007 JAMES CARGLE filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4092

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARGLE, JAMES

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DOES 1-8500

COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

LANDSEA HOLDING COMPANY

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC.

DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

ALBAY CONSTRUCTION CO.

SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

STORM, LUCINDA L

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LUCINDA L. STORM

610A Third Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

HAMBLETT, ROBERT MITCHELL

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

Two Embarcadero Ctr., # 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive,, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

310 Golden Shore, 4Th Floor, P.O. Box 22711

Long Beach, CA 90801

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at NIXON PEABODY LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at VASQUEZ & ESTRADACOURTHOUSE SQUARE

1000 Fourth St, Suite 700

San Rafael, CA 94901

OBERG, LISA L

Attorney at MCKENNA LONG & ALDRIDGE LLP

101 California St. 41St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BROWN, EUGENE

Attorney at FILICE, BROWN, EASSA & MCLEOD, LLP

1999 Harrison St. 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC TO COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14709475) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

CBS CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14764289) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 14764289) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Exhibit C to the Declaration of Kimberly Pile in Support of Defendant Plant Insulation Companys Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication

EXHIBIT C TO THE DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY PILE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 20607175) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DECLARATION OF HONG T. LE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATIONS REPLY BRIEF TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF HONG T. LE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATIONS REPLY BRIEF TO ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21606279) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORP.

Request for Dismissal [as to Defendant Lamons Gasket Company only]

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21747735) AS TO DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21812629) AS TO DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORP.

Motion In Limine No.:12 To Exclude Witnesses From The Courtroom

MOTION IN LIMINE #12 (TRANSACTION ID # 22046417) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

REQUEST FOR A DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC. ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 24059645) AS TO DEFENDANT UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

Answer To Complaint For Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14541063) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

Chevrons Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17877124) AS TO DEFENDANT CHEVRON PRODUCTS COMPANY

OBJECTION TO COURT COMMISSIONER ACTING AS JUDGE PRO TEMPORE AT TRIAL

OBJECTION TO HEARING BY COMMISSIONER/PRO TEM ACTING AS JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 18226815) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 21496419) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARGLE, JAMES

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. WEHR IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY?S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY D. WEHR IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY'S MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 21559010) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARGLE, JAMES

Motion In Limine No.: 9 To Apply Proposition 51, Based on the Accrual of Plaintiff?s Causes of Action

MOTION IN LIMINE #9 (TRANSACTION ID # 22046417) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OR EVIDENCE THAT A SINGLE FIBER OF ASBESTOS CAN CAUSE OR INCREASE THE RISK OF MESOTHELIOMA OR OTHER ASBESTOS DISEASE [MIL #33]

DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OR EVIDENCE THAT A SINGLE FIBER OF ASBESTOS CAN CAUSE OR INCREASE THE RISK OF MESOTHELIOMA OR OTHER ASBESTOS DISEASE [MIL #33] (TRANSACTION ID # 33182463) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT DR. RICHARD COHEN [MIL #28]

DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS EXPERT DR. RICHARD COHEN [MIL #28] (TRANSACTION ID # 33182463) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

MINUTES FOR OCTOBER 29, 2010 AT 2:30 PM

MINUTES FOR OCTOBER 29, 2010 AT 2:30 PM DEPT 611

243 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-10-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 6/27/14. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 55657437)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-03-2014 TO JUL-10-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-03-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: RVELUZ/EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-20-2013 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON DEC-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR OF DEC-11-2012 TO ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON JUN-20-2013 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO REPORT TO THE COURT HOW MUCH TIME TOLLED AND DATES IN WHICH THE 5-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATION HAS BEEN EXTENDED. OREN NOAH APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-15-2011 TO ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-13-2012 AT 1:45 PM IN DEPT. 503 FOR THE STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY AS TO THE ONLY REMAINING DEFENDANT, PLANT INSULATION. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY AND BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40374764) AS TO DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39160329) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36023109) AS TO DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
291 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14541063) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14511973) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANYS OBJECTION TO USE OF COMMISSIONER (TRANSACTION ID # 14511973) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 14511973) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14511973) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14496729) FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14486797) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARGLE, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CARGLE, JAMES AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DILLINGHAM CONSTRUCTION N.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DURABLA MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where OSCAR E. ERICKSON INC. is a litigant