This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/08/2017 at 06:56:38 (UTC).

JAMES BOYLE VS. PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 JAMES BOYLE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1200

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GARCIA, RONALD

BOYLE, CATHY

HAVILAND, BURTON

HOUGHTEN, KERN

MONK, BONNIE

PFAFF, DWIGHT

FLEMING, MICHELE

HOUGHTEN, ROBERT

WARD, PATRICIA

TYREE, DAVID

PENATZER, ERIKA

WITHE, JEFFERY

HUDDLESTON, ALLEN

SHIPP, DAVID

QUAN, BELINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAN LIVING TRUST

QUAN, EUGENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAN LIVING TRUST

JOHNSON, CARMELINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST

KEELAND, SCOTT

Defendants

ACRT, INC.

DOES 21 TO 30, INCLUSIVE

88 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CAUFIELD, JEFFREY L

Attorney at CAUFIELD & JAMES LLP

2851 Camino Real Del Rio, Ste 410

San Diego, CA 92108

ROYE, KENNETH P

P. O. Box 4982, 116 West 2Nd Street, #5

Chico, CA 959274982

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADDING BOYLE TO BUTTE FIRE COORDINATION PROCE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADDING BOYLE TO BUTTE FIRE COORDINATION PROCEEDING JCCP NO. 4853 (TRANSACTION ID # 100025741) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOYLE, JAMES BOYLE, CATHY BURKHARDT, HOWARD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BURKHARDT FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 25, 2012 BURKHARDT, JANDYRA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BURKHARDT FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 25, 2012 CABLE, ROBERT CABLE, COLLEEN CRUZ, MARY ESPINOZA, ANGELINA M DEISENROTH, TRACY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DEISENROTH TRUST CREATED DECEMBER 6, 2000 DEISENROTH, SCOTT INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DEISENROTH TRUST CREATED DECEMBER 6, 2000 DOZIER, DOMINIC FLEMING, PETER FLEMING, MICHELE HAVILAND, BURTON HAVILAND, VIOLA JOHNSON, TERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 20 2000 JOHNSON, CARMELINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 20 2000 JONES, JERRY E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERRY E. JONES AND DIANE R. JONES FAMILY TRUST DIANE, JONES R. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERRY E. JONES AND DIANE R. JONES FAMILY TRUST KALANGE, STEVEN KENYON, KENNETH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENNETH AND LAURA KENYON FAMILY TRUST DATED JANUARY 8 2009 KENYON, LAURA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENNETH AND LAURA KENYON FAMILY TRUST DATED JANUARY 8 2009 KEELAND, PAUL KEELAND, SCOTT KEELAND, DAVID LAWRENCE, HOWARD RAY LITTAU, DONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LITTAU REVOCABLE TRUST DATED APRIL 21 2005 LOLITA, LITTAU INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LITTAU REVOCABLE TRUST DATED APRIL 21 2005 LONG, ROBERT LONG, PHYLLIS MARTINEZ, DAVID ABUNDIS, JANET MILLER, JEFF NABER, MARA NICHOLSON, HOWARD BAILEY, ANTOINETTE PALMER, MICHAEL PALMER, JULIA PFAFF, DWIGHT PFAFF, KATHRYN POURTAU, DENNIS POWELL, JAMES POWELL, DEBBIE QUAN, EUGENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAN LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 26, 1998 QUAN, BELINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAN LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 26, 1998 REED, NANCY A PRESTON, WHITNEY SEABERG, CAROLINE SHIPP, DAVID SHIPP, NANCY STEFFEN, WILLIAM STEFFEN, NANCE TODD, ANN TODD, KARL TYREE, DAVID TYREE, SHIRLY WARRICK, DAVID WEINER, MARK INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ELIAS GREENBURG III TRUST WEINER, NANCY WEINER, SAMUEL WITHE, JEFFERY WHITE, RONALD CASTILLO, GREG CASTILLO, TINA DARK, DWAYNE DARK, TONI ELIZABETH DENNISTON, JOSHUA EL RANCHO LOMA SERENA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FLEMING, DAVID GIEBLEWICZ, CHRIS GIEBLEWICZ, CONRAD GARCIA, BRENDA GARCIA, RONALD HEART, CHARLES HEART, LINDA HAYRE, RUSSELL HAYRE, LEANNE HALE, BARBARA HALE, MARTIN HOUGHTEN, ROBERT HOUGHTEN, KERN HOUGHTEN, ELLIOT A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIANS AD LITEM KERN HOUGHTEN AND CAROL PALOMA HUDDLESTON, ALLEN HUDDLESTON, ELSIE KARCHES, WILLIAM KARCHES, LINDA LANGHAM, STEPHEN LUNDGREN, BRENDA MATHFALLU, AMAR MONK, RONALD MONK, BONNIE MORAN, TOM MORAN, JANET PENATZER, JAMES PENATZER, ERIKA SMITH, KATHLEEN SOITO, ANTHONY SULLIVAN, MORTON INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE TO THE MORTON A. SULLIVAN TRUST AGREEMENT DATED JUNE 18 2004 WABS, JOHN WABS, JOAN WARD, PATRICIA WESTLEY, LINDA AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10 TREES, INC. DOES 11 TO 20 ACRT, INC. DOES 21 TO 30, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-07-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-07-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-16-2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1017908F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADDING BOYLE TO BUTTE FIRE COORDINATION PROCEEDING JCCP NO. 4853 (TRANSACTION ID # 100025741) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BOYLE, JAMES BOYLE, CATHY BURKHARDT, HOWARD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BURKHARDT FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 25, 2012 BURKHARDT, JANDYRA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BURKHARDT FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 25, 2012 CABLE, ROBERT CABLE, COLLEEN CRUZ, MARY ESPINOZA, ANGELINA M DEISENROTH, TRACY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DEISENROTH TRUST CREATED DECEMBER 6, 2000 DEISENROTH, SCOTT INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE DEISENROTH TRUST CREATED DECEMBER 6, 2000 DOZIER, DOMINIC FLEMING, PETER FLEMING, MICHELE HAVILAND, BURTON HAVILAND, VIOLA JOHNSON, TERRY INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 20 2000 JOHNSON, CARMELINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE UNDER THE JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 20 2000 JONES, JERRY E INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERRY E. JONES AND DIANE R. JONES FAMILY TRUST DIANE, JONES R. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERRY E. JONES AND DIANE R. JONES FAMILY TRUST KALANGE, STEVEN KENYON, KENNETH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENNETH AND LAURA KENYON FAMILY TRUST DATED JANUARY 8 2009 KENYON, LAURA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENNETH AND LAURA KENYON FAMILY TRUST DATED JANUARY 8 2009 KEELAND, PAUL KEELAND, SCOTT KEELAND, DAVID LAWRENCE, HOWARD RAY LITTAU, DONALD INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LITTAU REVOCABLE TRUST DATED APRIL 21 2005 LOLITA, LITTAU INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LITTAU REVOCABLE TRUST DATED APRIL 21 2005 LONG, ROBERT LONG, PHYLLIS MARTINEZ, DAVID ABUNDIS, JANET MILLER, JEFF NABER, MARA NICHOLSON, HOWARD BAILEY, ANTOINETTE PALMER, MICHAEL PALMER, JULIA PFAFF, DWIGHT PFAFF, KATHRYN POURTAU, DENNIS POWELL, JAMES POWELL, DEBBIE QUAN, EUGENE INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAN LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 26, 1998 QUAN, BELINDA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE QUAN LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 26, 1998 REED, NANCY A PRESTON, WHITNEY SEABERG, CAROLINE SHIPP, DAVID SHIPP, NANCY STEFFEN, WILLIAM STEFFEN, NANCE TODD, ANN TODD, KARL TYREE, DAVID TYREE, SHIRLY WARRICK, DAVID WEINER, MARK INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE ELIAS GREENBURG III TRUST WEINER, NANCY WEINER, SAMUEL WITHE, JEFFERY WHITE, RONALD CASTILLO, GREG CASTILLO, TINA DARK, DWAYNE DARK, TONI ELIZABETH DENNISTON, JOSHUA EL RANCHO LOMA SERENA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FLEMING, DAVID GIEBLEWICZ, CHRIS GIEBLEWICZ, CONRAD GARCIA, BRENDA GARCIA, RONALD HEART, CHARLES HEART, LINDA HAYRE, RUSSELL HAYRE, LEANNE HALE, BARBARA HALE, MARTIN HOUGHTEN, ROBERT HOUGHTEN, KERN HOUGHTEN, ELLIOT A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIANS AD LITEM KERN HOUGHTEN AND CAROL PALOMA HUDDLESTON, ALLEN HUDDLESTON, ELSIE KARCHES, WILLIAM KARCHES, LINDA LANGHAM, STEPHEN LUNDGREN, BRENDA MATHFALLU, AMAR MONK, RONALD MONK, BONNIE MORAN, TOM MORAN, JANET PENATZER, JAMES PENATZER, ERIKA SMITH, KATHLEEN SOITO, ANTHONY SULLIVAN, MORTON INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE TO THE MORTON A. SULLIVAN TRUST AGREEMENT DATED JUNE 18 2004 WABS, JOHN WABS, JOAN WARD, PATRICIA WESTLEY, LINDA AS TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 TO 10 TREES, INC. DOES 11 TO 20 ACRT, INC. DOES 21 TO 30, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-07-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-07-2017 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-16-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACRT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caufield, Jeffery Laun

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roye, Kenneth Paul