Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 06:38:21 (UTC).

JAMES A. HODGE VS. TARA PATEL et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2009 JAMES A HODGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TARA PATEL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5024

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HODGE, JAMES A.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PATEL, VICKY

PATEL, TARA

DOES 1 TO 15

Cross Defendants

HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS

Novato, CA 94947

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

GLASPY, MARY KAY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GLASPY & GLASPY, INC.

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Avenue, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

TOMLIN, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L. FALLAT

999 Fifth Avenue, Ste 590

San Rafael, CA 94901

FALLAT, JOHN LYSTER

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN L. FALLAT

999 Fifth Avenue, Suite 590

San Rafael, CA 94901-2994

DRATH, JOHN MICHAEL

BREKHUS, PETER B

Attorney at BREKHUS LAW PARTNERS

1000 Drakes Landing Road

Greenbrae, CA 94904

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TONG, DARON DALE

Attorney at MILLER AND TONG, LLP

250 Montgomery St., Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY (Fee:660.00)

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY SERVED AUG-23-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON CROSS DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-27-2010 CONTINUED TO DEC-08-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, CROSS-DEFENDANT(S) AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. THE OCT-27-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY (Fee:330.00)

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR JAN-03-2011. DEC-08-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Arbitration

ASSIGNED TO ARBITRATION FOR MAR-07-2011. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration (C)

ARBITRATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-22-2011 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-14-2011 CONTINUED TO JAN-25-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS (Fee:40.00)

STIPULATION

STIPULATION (AMENDED)TO CONT TRIAL FILED BY HODGE, JAMES A. PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HODGE, JAMES A.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE MILLER FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2012
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1612127J022 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-16-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE ** AMENDED **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-14-2012 CONTINUED TO OCT-16-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHELLE MILLER FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-17-2012 CONTINUED TO AUG-14-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF MICHELE MILLER RE: DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-26-2012 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ON 3/23/12. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON MAY-17-2012 AT 2:00 PM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT HODGE, JAMES A. , INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA MARIN RENOVATIONS AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY ROES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY (Fee:660.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • DECLARATION OF DILLIGENCE, AS TO DEFT TARA PATEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF HODGE, JAMES A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HODGE, JAMES A. SERVED DEC-15-2009, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HODGE, JAMES A. SERVED DEC-15-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PATEL, VICKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF HODGE, JAMES A. AS TO DEFENDANT PATEL, TARA PATEL, VICKY DOES 1 TO 15 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-09-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-05-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-25-2010 (Fee:330.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASPY, MARY K.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tomlin, Timothy J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FALLAT JOHN L.