Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 15:35:41 (UTC).

JADE MARTELL VS. WILLIAM JENKINS et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2009 JADE MARTELL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WILLIAM JENKINS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6252

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTELL, JADE

Defendants

THE COMBINED TRUST CERATED DECEMEBER 23 2002 BY RENEE L. JENKINS, A TRUST

THE COMBINED 2002 TRUST

JENKINS, WILLIAM

PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOLAN, CHRISTOPHER B.

Attorney at THE DOLAN LAW FIRM

1438 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

GASPARI, PAUL EDWARD

Attorney at TOBIN & TOBIN

500 Sansome Street, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3211

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE AS TO DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM THE COMBINED TRUST CERATED DECEMEBER 23 2002 BY RENEE L. JENKINS, A TRUST PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-14-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-18-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE SERVED APR-06-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-10-2009 ON DEFENDANT PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE SERVED APR-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-23-2009 ON DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE SERVED APR-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-23-2009 ON DEFENDANT THE COMBINED TRUST CERATED DECEMEBER 23 2002 BY RENEE L. JENKINS, A TRUST

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE COMBINED 2002 TRUST (Fee:1095.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-26-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 604. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-15-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-14-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2010
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-15-2010 VACATED - DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED 11/17/09 (604)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-26-2010 - DISMISSAL ON FILE (604)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE COMBINED 2002 TRUST ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON FEB-26-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 604. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAR-15-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON AUG-14-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION THE COMBINED 2002 TRUST (Fee:1095.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE SERVED APR-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-23-2009 ON DEFENDANT THE COMBINED TRUST CERATED DECEMEBER 23 2002 BY RENEE L. JENKINS, A TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE SERVED APR-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-23-2009 ON DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE SERVED APR-06-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-10-2009 ON DEFENDANT PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARTELL, JADE AS TO DEFENDANT JENKINS, WILLIAM THE COMBINED TRUST CERATED DECEMEBER 23 2002 BY RENEE L. JENKINS, A TRUST PROCARE PROFESSIONAL CARE MANAGEMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 50, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-14-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-18-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOLAN CHRISTOPHER B