This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:43:50 (UTC).

JACK STURGES VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2007 JACK STURGES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4161

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

FORCE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

CRANE CO.

SVI CORPORATION

RILEY POWER, INC.

TOGNOTTI TIRE AND BRAKE SERVICE

AMERICAN STANDARD INC. - AND NOT THE CLAIMS STATED AGAINST TRANE US. INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD, INC

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.

TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC.

FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., F/K/A ALLIEDSIGNAL, INC., SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING COMPANY

MAREMONT CORPORATION

GATKE CORPORATION

H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

97 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

POLLACK, DEAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

1901 Harrison Street,11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

MARTENS, DANIEL L.

Attorney at DAL SOGLIO & MARTENS LLP

222 North Sepulveda Blvd, Suite 2000

El Segundo, CA 90245

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

KOHN, DORINE R.

Poeschl & Kohn Llp, 825 Washington Street, Suite 301

Oakland, CA 94607

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

CAMPAGNE, INGRID A.

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94111

LOGAN, PETER BURTON

Attorney at LOGAN LAW GROUP, P.C.

750 Lindaro Street, Suite 145

San Rafael, CA 94901

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948-6169

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

WILSON, LANCE

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

135 Main Street, Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

THOMAS, ANTHONY S.

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

879 West 190Th Street, Suite 700

Gardena, CA 90248

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

RHOADES, RALPH

Attorney at PARTON SELL

750 Lindaro Street, Suite 140

San Rafael, CA 94901

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Defendant Tognotti Tire And Brake Services Answer To Plaintiffs Unveri

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15080600) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOGNOTTI TIRE AND BRAKE SERVICE (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal re Chevron Products Company

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 17640952) AS TO DEFENDANT CHEVRON PRODUCTS COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER VIA E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19266870) FILED BY DEFENDANT W.W. GRAINGER, INC.

Substitution of Attorney - Defendant ITT Corporation

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 22556165): HILLYARD, MARY KIRK SUBSTITUTED FOR OBERG, LISA L AS ATTORNEY FOR ITT CORPORATION FKA ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.

Dismissal as to defendant Colonial Sugar Refining Company, only.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33464581) AS TO DEFENDANT COLONIAL SUGAR REFINING COMPANY

Request for Dismissal with prejudice as to the complaint on behalf of defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34697296) AS TO DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES TO THOSE ACTUALLY INCURRED [MIL #46]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO LIMIT DAMAGES FOR MEDICAL EXPENSES TO THOSE ACTUALLY INCURRED [MIL #46] (TRANSACTION ID # 35298098) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ABSENCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVES AT TRIAL [MIL #52]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ABSENCE OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVES AT TRIAL [MIL #52] (TRANSACTION ID # 35298098) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

EXHIBITS E THROUGH J TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF, VIDEOTAPES PRODUCED BY, AND EXPERIMENTS CONDUCTED BY PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS, RICHARD HATFIELD, WILLIAM LONGO AND JOHN TEMPLIN [MIL #29]

EXHIBITS E THROUGH J TO THE DECLARATION OF PAUL LANNUS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF, VIDEOTAPES PRODUCED BY, AND EXPERIMENTS CONDUCTED BY PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS, RICHARD HATFIELD, WILLIAM LONGO AND JOHN TEMPLIN [MIL #29] (TRANSACTION ID # 35298098) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

Defendant General Motors Corporations Demand for Jury

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15047497) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15064464) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Peerless Industries, Inc.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23242671) AS TO DEFENDANT PEERLESS INDUSTRIES, INC.

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMP?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMP'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 25796256) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. HEARING SET FOR JUL-16-2009 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPT 612 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER L. ALESIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS LLC?S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO COMPEL THE FURTHER DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JACK STURGES

DECLARATION OF JENNIFER L. ALESIO IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS LLC'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO COMPEL THE FURTHER DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF JACK STURGES (TRANSACTION ID # 25948280) FILED BY PLAINTIFF STURGES, JACK

Defendant Santa Fe Braun Inc.s Answer to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury - Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27780857) FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN, INC. (Fee:370.00)

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE USE OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES SERVED IN OTHER ACTIONS

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE USE OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES SERVED IN OTHER ACTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 34289805) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO NON ORIGINAL EQUIPMENT FRICTION EXPOSURES BY VEHICLE MAKER OR VEHICLE MODEL [MIL #47]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO NON ORIGINAL EQUIPMENT FRICTION EXPOSURES BY VEHICLE MAKER OR VEHICLE MODEL [MIL #47] (TRANSACTION ID # 35298098) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

MOTION IN LIMINE FOR THE COURT TO PRE-CLEAR DEMONSTRATIVE AND PHYSICAL EVIDENCE [MIL #51]

MOTION IN LIMINE FOR THE COURT TO PRE-CLEAR DEMONSTRATIVE AND PHYSICAL EVIDENCE [MIL #51] (TRANSACTION ID # 35298098) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

462 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58550808)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. PLAINTIFF WILL PROCEED TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, BRENDA POSADA. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55559123) AS TO DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF APR-17-2014 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON NOV-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: CINDY GARIS, CSR#9402 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON DEC-19-2013 TO DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2014 AT 1:30PM DEPT. 503, PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, CHRIS HERSOM. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • TIME EXTENDED OR TOLLED TO OCT-07-2015 TIME TOLLED AS TO PLANT INSULATION ONLY PER CHART PROVIDED BY BRAYTON PURCELL. FILED BY PLAINTIFF STURGES, JACK

    Read MoreRead Less
553 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15064464) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15064464) FILED BY DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 15047497) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15047497) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.S DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14999935) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14999935) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14999174) FILED BY DEFENDANT AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF STURGES, JACK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STURGES, JACK AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TOSCO REFINING COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SVI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROJET-GENERAL CORPORATION is a litigant