Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 18:59:08 (UTC).

J. WAYNE JOHNSON VS. BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2015 J WAYNE JOHNSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, A. JAMES ROBERTSON II, HAROLD E. KAHN, JOHN K. STEWART and MARY E. WISS. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7675

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

A. JAMES ROBERTSON II

HAROLD E. KAHN

JOHN K. STEWART

MARY E. WISS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

Defendants

BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

HUTCHENS, RALPH

PARENTI, DAVID

SHERIDAN, JOSEPH

SMITH, CHARLES

STELLINI, ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER, WALTER HERBERT

Attorney at WALKER, HAMILTON & KOENIG LLP

50 Francisco Street, Suite 460

San Francisco, CA 94133

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN, TORY E.

Attorney at HUNT JEPPSON & GRIFFIN LLP

1478 Stone Point Drive, Ste 100

Roseville,, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

Separately Bound Evidence in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Declaration of David Parenti in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF DAVID PARENTI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Declaration of Charles Smith in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment

DECLARATION OF CHARLES SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Declaration of Joseph Sheridan in Support of Motion for Summary Judgme

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH SHERIDAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Declaration of Arthur Stellini in Support of Motion for Summary Judgme

DECLARATION OF ARTHUR STELLINI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Declaration of Mark R. Velasquez in Support of Motion for Summary Judg

DECLARATION OF MARK R. VELASQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Fact in Support of Motion fo

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR HEARING SET FOR JAN-31-2017 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION [DENIED]

Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgme

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 17025069) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Response to Plaintiffs Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 17025068) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

Separately Bound Evidence In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defen

SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60081829) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

Declaration of Beau R. Burbidge In Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to

DECLARATION OF BEAU R. BURBIDGE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60081829) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

Plaintiffs Objections to Evidence Submitted In Support of Defendants M

OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60081829) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

Plaintiffs Response to Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts

RESPONSE TO SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS (TRANSACTION ID # 60081829) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Opposition to Defen

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 60081829) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

Declaration of Ralph Hutchens in Support of Motion for Summary Judgmen

DECLARATION OF RALPH HUTCHENS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16319014) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R9217308M009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R0217227M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4716B15R021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R4716B15M020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R0216816M006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Payment : EX PARTE MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B4916419E020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4716406R005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4716406R004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : R4716406M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT; Receipt Number : R4716406M002

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT'S AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 15298016) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 15280080) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT HEARING SET FOR NOV-09-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 15280080) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BRIAN E. HAMILTON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICTS NOTICE OF AMENDED MOTION AND AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION AND FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 15280080) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 15279028) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 15279028) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15279028) FILED BY DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT HEARING SET FOR NOV-09-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15251094) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE AS TO DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF JOHNSON, J. WAYNE AS TO DEFENDANT BROADMOOR POLICE PROTECTION DISTRICT SHERIDAN, JOSEPH HUTCHENS, RALPH PARENTI, DAVID SMITH, CHARLES STELLINI, ARTHUR DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-27-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-04-2016 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Broadmoor Police Protection District, A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant