Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 12:24:40 (UTC).

J E L VS. SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC

Case Summary

On 08/21/2015 J E L filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7508

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON

Defendants

ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL

HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL

QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL

SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALMANZAN, PABLO A

Attorney at ALMANZAN / FINNEMAN

445 South Figueroa Street, Thirty-First Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

PANWALA, ASIT S

4 Embarcadero Ctr, Ste 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

GILBERT, KEVIN E

Attorney at LOZANO SMITH

2001 North Main, Ste 650

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-20-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-20-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-28-2015 (Fee:IFP)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15238055) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

PETITION OF APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ADRIANA LEON APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR J.E.L.) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-09-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-14-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293007) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-14-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL

Proof of Service

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293045), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-19-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL

DEFENDANTS SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, APOLINA QUESADA, GLO

NOTICE OF REMOVAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100008254) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:EXEMPT)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-20-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-20-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL FILED. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100008254) FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293045), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-19-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293007) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-14-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293006) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-14-2015, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15293004), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON SERVED OCT-09-2015, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (ADRIANA LEON APPOINTED AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR J.E.L.) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • FEE PAID ON APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL (TRANSACTION ID # 15251098) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15238055) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • FEE FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF L, J E A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS PARENT AND GUARDIAN ADRIANA LEON AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY QUESADA, APOLINAR AN INDIVIDUAL ANDRES-NEWMAN, GLORIA AN INDIVIDUAL HORNER, THEA AN INDIVIDUAL GAGE, CHRISTINE AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-20-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-20-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-28-2015 (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILBERT, KEVIN E