This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:38:50 (UTC).

IXC HOLDING, INC. VS. ONEROOF INC.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 IXC HOLDING, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ONEROOF INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3064

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX

3221 20Th Street

San Francisco, CA 94110

Defendant

ONEROOF INC.

256 Lake Drive

Kensington, CA 94708

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-05-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $4,652.97 FILED BY IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX AS TO DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-13-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC. $4,652.97 PRINCIPAL, $60.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,712.97 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX AS TO DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC. $4,652.97 PRINCIPAL, $60.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $4,712.97 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-13-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAR-13-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAR-13-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL. APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFF WAS REPRESENTED BY THERESA A. ZABIT--CONTRACTS MANAGER. DEFENDANT WAS REPRESENTED BY ERIC SPECTOR--CEO. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • SC-103 - FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME (FILED PURSUANT TO LITIGANT'S REQUEST) FILED BY PLAINTIFF IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED FEB-05-2013, COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED SERVED ON DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX AS TO DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC. (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $4,652.97 FILED BY IXC HOLDING, INC. D.B.A. TELEKENEX AS TO DEFENDANT ONEROOF INC. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-13-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less