This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 09:50:41 (UTC).

ISABEL FOLEY VS. UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 ISABEL FOLEY filed an Other lawsuit against UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, HAROLD E. KAHN and GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4373

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

HAROLD E. KAHN

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOLEY, ISABEL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC

UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMALLETTS, SONYA L.

Attorney at MINNIS & SMALLETS LLP

369 Pine St Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

ANTUNUCCI, BARBARA I

Attorney at CONSTANGY, BROOKS, SMITH & PROPHETE, LLP

351 California, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

SCHLEMMER, MICHAEL D.

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100066059)

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION RE: CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-17-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (610)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR APR-15-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-19-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.s Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100047141) FILED BY DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100046232) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100042797) AS TO DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs Motion

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041699) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL

Notice of Motion and Motion in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Amend

MOTION - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100041699) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL HEARING SET FOR AUG-13-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041409) FILED BY DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041201) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

Notice of Unavailability of Barbara Antonucci

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ANTUNUCCI, BARBARA I ON JUN-14-2018 THROUGH JUN-25-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 61930274) FILED BY DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Defendant Uber Technologies, Inc.s Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034000) FILED BY DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033962), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033962), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

Answer Of Defendants Randstad Professionals Us, LLC And Randstad North

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61826507) FILED BY DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL AS TO DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W6618A16S008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918712R021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918712M020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018709F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R8018702J001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4718329F023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518329F009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1018215F020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-17-2019 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 3/15/19. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100066059)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100041201) FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040593) FILED BY DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF ANTUNUCCI, BARBARA I ON JUN-14-2018 THROUGH JUN-25-2018 (TRANSACTION ID # 61930274) FILED BY DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034000) FILED BY DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033962), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033962), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100033962), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL SERVED FEB-20-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61826507) FILED BY DEFENDANT RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Fee:$900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, ISABEL AS TO DEFENDANT UBER TECHNOLOGIES, INC. RANDSTAD PROFESSIONALS US, LLC RANDSTAD NORTH AMERICA, INC. DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.