This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/01/2016 at 10:51:21 (UTC).

ISAAC WILLIAMS et al VS. AMERICAN ASBESTOS CO., et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2004 ISAAC WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN ASBESTOS CO . This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2492

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2004

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

AMERICAN ASBESTOS CO.

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

UNIROYAL, INC.

GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC.

A.W. CHESTERTON CO.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

AQUA-CHEM, INC.

PEPBOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA ONLY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL,INC. FKA ALLIEDSIGNAL,INC.,SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE BENDIX CORPORATION

SIDNEY FACILITY MANAGEMENT, INC. FKA RICHARD KLINGER, INC. (HEREINAFTER "SIDNEY FACILITY")

AQUA-CHEM, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AKA CLEAVER-BROOKS

CSK AUTO, INC.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS BORG-WARNER CORPORATION

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BERRY, PHILLIP SAMUEL

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue, Po Box 16070

Oakland, CA 94610-0000

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

SHARP, GARY D

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

1111 Broadway 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at F0LEY & MANSFIED PLLP

1333 North California Blvd.,, Suite 690

Walnut, Creek, CA 94596

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

Attorney at JACKSON & WALLACE LLP

55 Francisco Street, 6Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

COSGROVE, PHILIP R.

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

550 Montgomery Street, Eighth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LYMAN, ROBERT JOSEPH

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

1901 Harrison Street, 11Th Fl, P.O. Box 119

Oakland, CA 94604

Other Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGE & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

HANLEY, DEAN A

Attorney at PAUL HANLEY & HARLEY LLP

1608 Fourth Street, Suite 300

Berkeley, CA 94710

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI & BLUM LLP

351 California Street,, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID & PRIEST LLP

101 Second St. Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

YAMATE, NOREEN Q.

Attorney at MCQUIAD BEDFORD & VAN ZANDT LLP

221 Main Street, 16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, ISAAC WILLIAMS, EVELYN AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN ASBESTOS CO., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AQUA-CHEM, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AKA CLEAVER-BROOKS DOES 1-800 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-15-2005 (Fee:292.50)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT E.D. BULLARD COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BURNS INTERNATIONAL SERVICES CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS BORG-WARNER CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT B.R. FUNSTEN & COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SIDNEY FACILITY MANAGEMENT, INC. FKA RICHARD KLINGER, INC. (HEREINAFTER "SIDNEY FACILITY") (Fee:289.20)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. (Fee:289.20)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2011
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2206210J024 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2011
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W1905C06J024 FORFEITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 16236605): SHARP, GARY D SUBSTITUTED FOR WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH AS ATTORNEY FOR THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14448016) AS TO DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14144173) AS TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC SURVIVOR TO A MERGER W/ FOSTER WHEELER LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13898102) AS TO DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC FKA GARLOCK, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITH POS VIA E-SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 13601503) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2006
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: COUNSEL APPEARED. CONFERENCE HELD. CASE SETTLED. TERMS WERE PLACED ON THE RECORD. COURT RETAINED JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON II; GENA EALES, CSR #9176 ; CLERK: C.LI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2006
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR DEC-11-2006 11:30 AM FOR DEPT 503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2006
  • ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-06-2006 CONTINUED TO DEC-11-2006 AT 11:30 AM IN 503.(D503)

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2004
  • OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • OBJECTION TO STIP OF HRG BY COMMISSIONER FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO. AS TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, ISAAC WILLIAMS, EVELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT A.W. CHESTERTON CO. (Fee:289.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION AS TO PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, ISAAC WILLIAMS, EVELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SEPCO CORPORATION (Fee:289.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT E.D. BULLARD COMPANY (Fee:289.20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2004
  • OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, ISAAC WILLIAMS, EVELYN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILLIAMS, ISAAC WILLIAMS, EVELYN AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN ASBESTOS CO., AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., AQUA-CHEM, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AKA CLEAVER-BROOKS DOES 1-800 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-15-2005 (Fee:292.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEPBOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CA. THE is a litigant

Latest cases where THORPE INSULATION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AQUA-CHEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY INC is a litigant