This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/07/2016 at 14:37:21 (UTC).

INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION VS. ALAN KWOK LEUNG MAN et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2006 INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALAN KWOK LEUNG MAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2339

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION

Defendants

MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIX, LLOYD DOUGLAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF DIX & ASSOCIATES

216 S. Louise St. 2Nd Floor

Glendale, CA 91205

LOVE, FRANKLIN J

SCHULTZ, LISA L.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT

COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-15-2006 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-17-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-31-2006 (Fee:165.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR AUG-22-2006 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON AUG-22-2006 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-25-2006 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-15-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-25-2006 CONTINUED TO DEC-06-2006 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). OCT-25-2006 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN $1,600.00 PRINCIPAL, $48.21 INTEREST, $220.90 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,869.11, SEE SCANNED DOC ( MAILED)

ORDER THAT HEARING IS OFF CALENDAR

PRE-TRIAL CALENDAR SWEEP, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR OF DEC-06-2006, OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT ON FILE AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: DIX, LLOYD DOUGLAS SUBSTITUTED FOR SCHULTZ, LISA L. AS ATTORNEY FOR INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR AUG-25-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

*** ERROR - MISSING DATA - OrderTitle ***'

REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECL

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $1,433.02 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $496.34 INTEREST, $145.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100003732) FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN $1,107.43 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,107.43, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION

Proof of Service by first class mail

PROOF OF SERVICE ON APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005507) FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION SERVED AUG-20-2015, MAIL ON DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN PROCESS COMPLETED BY DEFAULT SECTION. WRIT MAY ISSUE ON SEP-25-2015 IF NO MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON APPLICATION AND NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100005507) FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION SERVED AUG-20-2015, MAIL ON DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN PROCESS COMPLETED BY DEFAULT SECTION. WRIT MAY ISSUE ON SEP-25-2015 IF NO MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC. 683.110 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN $1,107.43 PRINCIPAL, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,107.43, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT ALL FURTHER PROCESSING TO BE DONE BY DEFAULT SECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100003732) FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $1,433.02 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $496.34 INTEREST, $145.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 100003732) FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT REJECTED, E-FILING REJECT, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-25-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2006
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $220.90 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2006
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION SERVED MAY-19-2006, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-25-2006 IN DEPARTMENT 212 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE SEP-15-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE ON AUG-22-2006 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ADDED TO PROOF OF SERVICE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR AUG-22-2006 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT WITHIN SMALL CLAIMS JURISDICTIONAL LIMIT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, ALAN KWOK LEUNG AKA KWOK LEUNG MAN AKA KWOK L. MAN DOES 1-10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-15-2006 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-17-2006 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-31-2006 (Fee:165.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******2339
Case Title:INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION VS. ALAN KWOK LEUNG MAN et al
Court Date:AUG-25-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Monday, August 25, 2014, Line 1,PLAINTIFF INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION's HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION. Granted. Defendant has established that all of his earnings are necessary for his support. (CCP sec. 487.020(b).) Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EHG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERNATIONAL COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF LISA L. SCHULTZ - SCHULTZ, LISA L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIX LLOYD DOUGLAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVE, FRANKLIN J