This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/11/2016 at 13:50:12 (UTC).

INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2012 INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CLUB ONE, INC , A CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0205

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL

DOES 1 TO 10

MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL

CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAPPIA, EDWARD P.

Attorney at THE ZAPPIA LAW FIRM

333 S. Hope Street, Suite 3600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

PARTON,III, JAMES

Attorney at PARTON/ SELL/ RHOADES, A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

750 Lindaro St Ste 140

San Rafael, CA 94901

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-19-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-19-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-04-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-04-2012 ON DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-05-2012 ON DEFENDANT MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-04-2012 ON DEFENDANT MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-04-2012 ON DEFENDANT KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL (Fee:1640.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING MOTION AND PERMITTING THE FILING OF CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS UNDER SEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER STAY THE APPEAL PENDING COMPLETION OF A SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, STAYING THE APPEAL FOR 60 DAYS, ETAL (A138866 DIV 2)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLTF, ERICA INGHAM ONLY, ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS.

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-18-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

ORDER

ORDER LIFTING COA'S 11/21/13 ORDER, DISCHARGING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PREVIOUSLY ISSUED AND DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AS MOOT (A138866 DIV 2)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER LIFTING COA'S 11/21/13 ORDER, DISCHARGING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PREVIOUSLY ISSUED AND DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AS MOOT (A138866 DIV 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-18-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLTF, ERICA INGHAM ONLY, ALL PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR OWN ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO FURTHER STAY THE APPEAL PENDING COMPLETION OF A SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, STAYING THE APPEAL FOR 60 DAYS, ETAL (A138866 DIV 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS PUTATIVE CLASS ACTION FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING MOTION AND PERMITTING THE FILING OF CONFIDENTIAL PORTIONS OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTS UNDER SEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2013
  • DocketMINI MINUTES FOR NOV-21-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-17-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON SEP-19-2012 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL (Fee:1640.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-04-2012 ON DEFENDANT KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-04-2012 ON DEFENDANT MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-05-2012 ON DEFENDANT MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED APR-24-2012, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE MAY-04-2012 ON DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION MCBRIDE, BILL AN INDIVIDUAL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE AN INDIVIDUAL KIRKMAN, CINDY INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-19-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-19-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-04-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:NOV-21-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn To Seal
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, November 21, 2013, Line 20: Defendant CLUB ONE, INC.'S Motion To SealGranted, for good cause shown. No opposition filed. The Court will sign the proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion and Permitting the Filing of Confidential Portions of Settlement Agreements Under Seal. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/MJM


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:SEP-16-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO File Second Amended Complt
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Monday, September 16, 2013, Line 10, PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO File Second Amended ComplaintGranted, in part. Within 10 days, Plaintiff may file and serve her Second Amended Complaint. The response to admission by Defendant Club One demonstrates that Defendants may have terminated Plaintiff in retaliation for her request for a pregnancy accommodation. California has a strong policy in favor of granting leave to amend that dictates Plaintiff should be permitted to plead her new cause of action. Discovery is reopened for the limited purpose of permitting all parties to conduct discovery as to the new cause of action. Defendants' request to shorten the statutory notice time on a motion for summary adjudication is denied; the Court may not do this without all parties' consent. CCP 437c(a) . Plaintiff's request for the Second Amended Complaint be "deemed" filed and served is denied. Plaintiff must actually file and serve her Second Amended Complaint. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:AUG-16-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO File Second Amended Complt
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, August 16, 2013, Line 4, PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS similarly situated's MOTION FOR LEAVE TO File Second Amended complaint.Continued on the Court's own motion to September 16, 2013. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JUN-17-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO To Amend The First Amended Complt
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, June 17, 2013, Line 10, PLAINTIFF INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO To Amend The First Amended CompltHearing required. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether the Court of Appeal's stay of the trial affects this Court's jurisdiction to hear Plaintiff's motion. =302/mjm


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:JUN-05-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn To Compel Compliance With Depo Subpoenas
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, June 5, 2013, Line 27, DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC.'s Motion To Compel Compliance With Deposition Subpoenas.Grant in parted, and denied in part Defendant's motion to compel Kevin Ingham to comply with the document demands attached to the deposition subpoena. Within 2 days, Mr. Ingham shall produce documents, without objection, as to nos. 1-2, 5, 8, 11-12, 15, 18, 21, 22, 23, limited in timeframe to finances for October 2011. Plaintiff has put both her and her husband's finances at issue during this time period by her response to Form Interrogatory no. 212.3. Denied as to nos. 3, 4, 6, 7, 9, 10, 13, 14, 16, 17, 19, 20, 24.The court will not provide a court reporter for this discovery hearing. If any party wishes a reporter, the parties must meet and confer and agree on a single reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/MJM)


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:MAY-24-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Mtn To Compel Further Responses From Pltf Tp Req Admission And Form Interoggs
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, May 24, 2013, Line 4, DEFENDANT CLUB ONE, INC.'S Motion To Compel Further Responses From Plaintiff To Request Admission And Form InterrogatoriesPro Tem Judge David McDonald, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem has not issued a tentative ruling on this motion. Each party is required to bring a proposed order to the hearing. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:MAY-17-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, May 17, 2013, Line 10, DEFENDANTs CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION, BILL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE MCBRIDE and CINDY KIRKMAN's MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION.Defendant Club One, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of the First Cause of Action in Plaintiff's Complaint is granted. Plaintiff is required to exhaust her administrative remedies under Labor Code u00A7 98.7 before filing suit for a violation of Labor Code u00A7 1102.5 and failed to do so. See Campbell v. Regents of the University of California (2005) 35 Cal.4th 311; Ferretti v. Pfizer Inc. (N.D.Cal. 2012) 855 F.Supp.2d 1017. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and is in compliance with Code of Civ. Pro. section 437c(g) and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/RAK)


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:MAY-02-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses From Plaintiff To Request For Admission, Form And Special Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents And Request For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, May 2, 2013, Line 3, DEFENDANTS CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION, BILL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE MCBRIDE, CINDY KIRKMAN'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses From Plaintiff To Request For Admission, Form And Special Interrogatories, And Request For Production Of Documents And Request For Monetary SanctionsOff calendar per request of moving party. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******0205
Case Title:INGHAM, ERICA ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS VS. CLUB ONE, INC., A CORPORATION et al
Court Date:APR-12-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Judgment On The Pleadings
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, April 12, 2013, Line 12, DEFENDANTS CLUB ONE, INC., BILL MCBRIDE, ADRIENNE MCBRIDE AND CINDY KIRKMAN'S MOTION For Judgment On The Pleadings.OFF CALENDAR PER STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES. =(302/MJM)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Club One LLC; DBA : Frog's Fitness is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZAPPIA, EDWARD P